Preciose et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: |
Susan Preciose and Richard Preciose |
Defendant: |
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv00192 |
Filed: |
October 8, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Eastern Division Office |
County: |
CRAVEN |
Presiding Judge: |
Malcolm J. Howard |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting 60 , 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard G. Paxton withdrawn from the representation of Plaintiff Susan Preciose. Plaintiff Richard Preciose's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal 70 is granted and any clai ms he may have against State Farm are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff Susan Preciose's Motion to Amend her Complaint 63 to add Alexander J. Garcia is denied. Further, the parties shall confer regarding settlement and inform the court within 30 days of this order, whether an agreement has been reached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 1/11/2017. (Foell, S.)(order mailed to pro se plaintiff)
|
September 16, 2016 |
Filing
56
ORDER granting 55 Motion to Reschedule Telephonic Conference. The conference currently set for 10:00 am on 9/19/16 is reset for 9:00 am on 9/19/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 9/15/2016. (Foell, S.)(order emailed to case manager/BG)
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
53
ORDER referring this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr., for a court-hosted settlement conference. The conference will be conducted at a time and place selected by Judge Jones upon notice to the parties. Defendants Motion t o Enforce Settlement and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs 36 and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 40 are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If appropriate, the parties may refile said motions upon conclusion of the court-hosted settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 8/24/2016. (Foell, S.)
|
August 15, 2016 |
Filing
50
ORDER granting 49 Motion for counsel Richard Paxton to Appear Telephonically for Status Conference set in this Court on August 16, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 8/12/2016. (Lee, L.)
|
June 23, 2015 |
Filing
28
ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant's 20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 6/22/2015. (Foell, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?