United States of America v. Ledbetter, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Russell Ledbetter, Catherine Ledbetter and Sun Trust Commercial Credit Services
Case Number: 4:2015cv00136
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Default judgment is entered against Russell Ledbetter as to Counts II and III of the amended complaint. As to Count II, the United States tax liens attach to the real property known as 2. N. Pettigrew Street, Raleigh, North Carolin a, and are hereby foreclosed. As to Count III, the United States tax liens attach to the real property known as 5521 Old Weaver Trail, Creedmoor, North Carolina, and are hereby foreclosed. The real properties will be sold pursuant to the orders of sale. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 5/17/2017. (Edwards, S.)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 41 Motion Entry of Default and Entry of Orders of Sale. This denial is without prejudice to the parties right to file a motion for consent judgment seeking similar relief. Counsel are instructed to include the full case number on future submissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 3/7/2017. (Herrmann, L.)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Court grants plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against defendant Russell Ledbetter as to Count I of the Complaint. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 8/8/2016. (Herrmann, L.)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Default Judgment as to Count I against Russell Ledbetter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/4/2016. (Herrmann, L.)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Entry of Default - The undersigned finds that entry of default is appropriate as to Defendant Russell Ledbetter. The court cannot so find, however, as to Defendant Sun Trust Commercial Credi t Services. Plaintiff's request for entry of default [DE-13] is GRANTED solely as to Defendant Russell Ledbetter. It is DENIED without prejudice as to Defendant Sun Trust Commercial Credit Services. This denial is without prejudice to Plaintiff to file a renewed motion for entry of default within 30 days. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 11/30/2015. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ledbetter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Ledbetter
Represented By: Gary J. Rickner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Trust Commercial Credit Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan D. Carroll(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?