United States of America v. Pender
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Darryl L. Pender
Case Number: 4:2016cv00276
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PITT
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DEFAULT JUDGMENT - against Defendant for failure of answer and in favor of Plaintiff, United States of America, against Defendant in the amount of $3,664.50, including interest as of September 22, 2017, and accruing thereafter at the daily rate of $0.07 from September 22, 2017 to the date of judgment,together with present and future costs and disbursements incurred by Plaintiff in this action; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that interest after date of entry of this judgment shall be at the applicable judgment rate of 1.41%. in favor of United States of America against Darryl L. Pender. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/19/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Entry of Default against Darryl L. Pender. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/12/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion Extend time to Serve Summons and Re-Issue Summons. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/12/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 7 Motion for Entry of Default without prejudice to renew within 30 days. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/12/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl L. Pender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?