Sorensson v. Ditech Financial LLC/GreenTree
Plaintiff: Karolina Sorensson
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC/GreenTree
Case Number: 4:2017cv00067
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CARTERET
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Ditech's motions to dismiss [D.E. 18] (4:17-CV-67-D), [D.E. 12] (4:18-CV-42-D) are GRANTED, and Sorensson's motions to cancel foreclosure [D.E. 26] (4:17-CV-67-D), [D.E. 15] (4:18-CV-42-D) are DENIED. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/17/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Amendment or Additional Findings of Facts based on Rule 52(b), MOTION for a trial, MOTION for the pro bono panel to review the case. The court ORDERS the service deadline to be extended until December 4, 2017. Not lat er than October 13, 2017, Sorensson is DIRECTED to submit a newsummons to the clerk that complies with North Carolina law and the Federal Ru1es of Civil Procedure. Once Sorrenson files a new summons, the clerk is DIRECTED to issue the summons prepared by Sorennson. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/3/2017. Sent to Karolina Sorensson 615 Flybridge Lane Beaufort, NC 28516 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 9 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/15/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorensson v. Ditech Financial LLC/GreenTree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karolina Sorensson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC/GreenTree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?