Robinson v. East Carolina University et al
Plaintiff: Barbara L. Robinson
Defendant: East Carolina University, John Mark Williams, Mark D. Iannettoni, Jody Cook and MAGMutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2017cv00112
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PITT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the court's order entered May 6, 2020, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/7/2020. (Collins, S.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 113 Motion to Modify Case Management Order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/16/2019. (Collins, S.)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 111 MOTION Modify Case Managment Order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/23/2019. (Collins, S.)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER - The court GRANTS defendant MagMutual's motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. 78 . The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART ECU defendants' motions to dismiss 73 and GRANTS the parti es' motions to seal 39 47 82 . Plaintiff's amended motion for preliminary injunction 36 is DENIED. Plaintiff's seventh claim for defamation, as alleged in the amended complaint, against defendant Williams in his individual capacity, is allowed to proceed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4)(A), a responsive pleading from Defendant Williams is due fourteen days hereof. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/3/2018. (Collins, S.)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Seal [DE63]. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/12/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer MAGMutual Insurance Company answer due 10/17/2017. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/1/2017. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. East Carolina University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara L. Robinson
Represented By: Mary-Ann Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Carolina University
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mark Williams
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Olga E. Vysotskaya De Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Iannettoni
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Cook
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGMutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan A. Berkelhammer
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?