Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 4.77 Acres, More or Less, in Halifax County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 1201209 et al
Plaintiff: |
Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC |
Defendant: |
4.77 Acres, More or Less, in Halifax County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 1201209, Henry Faulcon, Franklin Faulcon, Ecca Faulcon, Jr., William Hawkins, William Lucious Hawkins, Jr., Vicky Head, Micky Head and All Unknown Owners |
Case Number: |
4:2018cv00021 |
Filed: |
February 6, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Eastern Division Office |
County: |
HALIFAX |
Presiding Judge: |
Terrence W. Boyle |
Nature of Suit: |
Land Condemnation |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 717 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 18, 2023 |
Filing
90
ORDER - Following a hearing on July 6, 2023, the Court granted entry of final judgment in this matter and its order was entered on the Court's docket on July 7, 2023. [DE 86]. It appearing that plaintiff has complied with its obligations outlined in paragraphs two through five and ten of the Court's order, see [DE 87 - 82], the Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/18/2023. (Stouch, L.)
|
July 7, 2023 |
Filing
86
ORDER on Pending Motions and Granting FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/6/2023. (Stouch, L.)
|
May 16, 2023 |
Filing
75
ORDER LIFTING STAY. The Court will hold a hearing on Thursday, July 6, 2023, at 2:00 p.rn. at the United States Courthouse at Elizabeth City, North Carolina. Plaintiff should take whatever steps are necessary to be prepared to reduce this matter to judgment at that time. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/15/2023. (Stouch, L.)
|
August 26, 2021 |
Filing
51
ORDER STAYING CASE - Plaintiff is directed to file a status report not later than December 1, 2021, and to provide additional status updates as needed every sixty (60) days thereafter. Plaintiff shall further notify the Court within ten (10) days of FERC's entry of an order amending plaintiff's Certificate of Public Necessity and Convenience and provide an update as to how plaintiff believes this case should proceed to disposition. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/26/2021. (Sellers, N.)
|
January 28, 2019 |
Filing
44
ORDER STAYING CASE. The stay will expire on March 1, 2019, subject to further order of the Court. A status hearing will be conducted prior to the expiration of the stay and will be set by separate notice. Signed by Chief US Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/25/2019. (Stouch, L.)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and denying as moot 14 Motion for Expedited Hearing. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/16/2018. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important information. Copy emailed to Clerk's Office Financial Department. (Stouch, L.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 4.77 Acres, More or Less, in Halifax County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 1201209 et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC |
Represented By: |
Sherrod Banks |
Represented By: |
Richard D. Holzheimer |
Represented By: |
Henry L. Kitchin, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Danielle Barbour Wilson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: 4.77 Acres, More or Less, in Halifax County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 1201209 |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Henry Faulcon |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Franklin Faulcon |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ecca Faulcon, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: William Hawkins |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: William Lucious Hawkins, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Vicky Head |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Micky Head |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: All Unknown Owners |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?