Sound Rivers, Inc. et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al

Plaintiff: Sound Rivers, Inc. and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Greg Sheehan
Case Number: 4:2018cv00097
Filed: May 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 52 Motion Clarification regarding 51 Order on Motion to Remand to Agency. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/18/2019. (Sellers, N.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Remand to Federal Highway Administration for Endangered Species Act consultation with the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. All pending deadlines are hereby stayed pending completion of ESA consultation. FHWA shall file a status report four months from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/10/2019. (Sellers, N.)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Reconsideration of Scheduling order and for Alternative Scheduling Order. The "Scheduling Order" dated October 27, 2018 (ECF No. 34) is hereby VACATED. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/17/2018. (Sellers, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sound Rivers, Inc. et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sound Rivers, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberley Hunter
Represented By: Ramona H. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Kimberley Hunter
Represented By: Ramona H. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Alison C. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sheehan
Represented By: Alison C. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?