Antonio et al v. Cissna et al
Plaintiff: Jacinto Perez Acosta and Camelia Guerrero Antonio
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Director L Frank Cissna
Case Number: 4:2018cv00131
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants shall have up to and including October 2, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' cause of action under the Freedom of Information Act. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
August 30, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by L Frank Cissna, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Warlick, Lori) Modified on 8/30/2018 - changed to the correct event. (Sellers, N.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori B. Warlick on behalf of L Frank Cissna, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Warlick, Lori)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed by US Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of North Carolina filed by Camelia Guerrero Antonio, Jacinto Perez Acosta as to L Frank Cissna served on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Hinnant, Christopher)
July 30, 2018 Case transferred in from Northern Division on 07/30/2018. Old Case Number 2:18-cv-35. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to L Frank Cissna, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel is reminded to print summonses and effect service. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as an Eastern Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 4:18-CV-131-D. No further filing shall be made in 2:18-CV-35-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/30/2018. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2018 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Eastern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil coversheet and proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(c), except for the initial filing, all pleadings, motions, discovery, notices, memoranda and other papers filed with the clerk of court shall bear the case number assigned by the clerk. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Hinnant on behalf of Jacinto Perez Acosta, Camelia Guerrero Antonio. (Hinnant, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jacinto Perez Acosta, Camelia Guerrero Antonio (Hinnant, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4597312.), filed by Camelia Guerrero Antonio, Jacinto Perez Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons USAG Summons, #3 Proposed Summons USAO Summons, #4 Proposed Summons USCIS Summons) (Hinnant, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio et al v. Cissna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinto Perez Acosta
Represented By: Christopher M. Hinnant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camelia Guerrero Antonio
Represented By: Christopher M. Hinnant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L Frank Cissna
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?