Doe v. East Carolina University et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Kathleen Flanagan, Heidi Bonner, Christina Ragone, John Bellflower, Jr., Mandy Messerli, Lynn Roeder, Bret Wilson, Caitlin Butler, Patrick Skipper, Tamika Wordlow, East Carolina University, Cecil Staton, Jr. and Virginia Hardy
Case Number: 4:2018cv00137
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: LENOIR
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support regarding #34 MOTION for Entry of a Preservation Order filed by John Bellflower, Jr, Heidi Bonner, Caitlin Butler, East Carolina University, Kathleen Flanagan, Virginia Hardy, Mandy Messerli, Christina Ragone, Lynn Roeder, Patrick Skipper, Cecil Staton, Jr, Bret Wilson, Tamika Wordlow. (Hartzog, Dan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Entry of a Preservation Order filed by John Bellflower, Jr, Heidi Bonner, Caitlin Butler, East Carolina University, Kathleen Flanagan, Virginia Hardy, Mandy Messerli, Christina Ragone, Lynn Roeder, Patrick Skipper, Cecil Staton, Jr, Bret Wilson, Tamika Wordlow. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Katherine Barber-Jones) (Hartzog, Dan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by John Doe. All Defendants. (Gorycki, Kara)
September 20, 2018 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine Barber-Jones on behalf of All Defendants. (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
September 20, 2018 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Dan M. Hartzog on behalf of All Defendants. (Hartzog, Dan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr on behalf of John Bellflower, Jr, Heidi Bonner, Caitlin Butler, East Carolina University, Kathleen Flanagan, Virginia Hardy, Mandy Messerli, Christina Ragone, Lynn Roeder, Patrick Skipper, Cecil Staton, Jr, Bret Wilson, Tamika Wordlow substituting for Catherine Faith Jordan. (Hartzog, Dan)
August 31, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond #29 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendants shall have up to and including October 23, 2018, within which to respond to the Motion to Proceed Anonymously #6 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/31/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
August 30, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION To Proceed Anonymously and For Leave to File a Protective Order. (Sellers, N.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION To Proceed Anonymously and For Leave to File a Protective Order filed by John Bellflower, Jr, Heidi Bonner, Caitlin Butler, East Carolina University, Kathleen Flanagan, Virginia Hardy, Mandy Messerli, Christina Ragone, Lynn Roeder, Patrick Skipper, Cecil Staton, Jr, Bret Wilson, Tamika Wordlow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time) (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 28 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tamika Wordlow (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 27 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bret Wilson (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 26 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cecil Staton, Jr (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by Patrick Skipper (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lynn Roeder (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Christina Ragone (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Mandy Messerli (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Virginia Hardy (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kathleen Flanagan (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by East Carolina University (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Caitlin Butler (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Heidi Bonner (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by John Bellflower, Jr (Jordan, Catherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine Faith Jordan on behalf of All Defendants. (Jordan, Catherine)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel is directed to print summonses and effect service. (Stouch, L.)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER provisionally granting #6 Motion To Proceed Anonymously and For Leave to File a Protective Order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on defendants when effecting service of the complaint and summons pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Defendants shall have twenty-one days from the date of service of this order to file a response to plaintiffs motion to proceed anonymously. After the filing of defendants' response, the Court will take up plaintiffs motion again and enter a final ruling on plaintiff'srequests. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/23/2018. (Stouch, L.)
August 21, 2018 Motion Submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #6 MOTION To Proceed Anonymously and For Leave to File a Protective Order. (Stouch, L.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 Proposed Order regarding #6 MOTION To Proceed Anonymously and For Leave to File a Protective Order filed by John Doe. (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Stouch, L.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Andrew T. Miltenberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miltenberg, Andrew)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kara L. Gorycki on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gorycki, Kara)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 Notice filed by John Doe regarding #1 Complaint,,, Civil Cover Sheet. (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 13, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Proposed Summonses and #3 Notice of Appearance - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summonses and notice of appearance prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #6 MOTION To Proceed Anonymously and For Leave to File a Protective Order filed by John Doe. (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 Declaration of Kara Gorycki in Support of Motion by John Doe (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION To Proceed Anonymously and For Leave to File a Protective Order filed by John Doe. (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Matthew S. Sullivan on behalf of John Doe. (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Matthew S. Sullivan on behalf of John Doe. (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. Sullivan on behalf of John Doe. (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by John Doe (Sullivan, Matthew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4612612.), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Bret Wilson, #2 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Caitlin Butler, #3 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Cecil Staton, Jr., #4 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Christina Ragone, #5 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - East Carolina University, #6 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Heidi S. Bonner, #7 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - John Bellflower, Jr., #8 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Kathleen Flanagan, #9 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Lynn Roeder, #10 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Mandy Messerli, #11 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Patrick Skipper, #12 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Tamika Wordlow, #13 Proposed Summons Civil Summons - Virginia Hardy) (Sullivan, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. East Carolina University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Flanagan
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Bonner
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Ragone
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bellflower, Jr.
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Messerli
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Roeder
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Wilson
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlin Butler
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Skipper
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamika Wordlow
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Carolina University
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Staton, Jr.
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Hardy
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Matthew S. Sullivan
Represented By: Kara L. Gorycki
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?