Dykstra et al v. Temple et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC and Glen Dykstra
Defendant: Calvin Williams, Sally L. Temple, Miki Williams, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 and Jack M. Temple
Case Number: 4:2018cv00145
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CRAVEN
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting the Second Motion for Extension of Time #33 filed by Defendants Jack M. Temple and Sally L. Temple. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants shall have up to and including October 29, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 and to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/3/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
October 2, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #33 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #31 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED. (Collins, S.)
October 2, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #33 Motion to Amend/Correct, #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Counsel is reminded of Local Rule 10.1 (a) which specifies the format of pleadings which states that all pleadings, motions, discovery procedures, memoranda, and other papers filed with the clerk of court shall be double-spaced on single-sided, standard letter size (8 1/2 x 11) paper, with all typed matter appearing in at least 11 point font size with a one inch margin on all sides. No action on the part of counsel is required. (Collins, S.)
October 2, 2018 Filing 33 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #31 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED filed by Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple. (Rattelade, Heather) Modified on 10/3/2018 to correct event type (Hockaday, A.).
October 1, 2018 Filing 32 Proposed Order regarding #31 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple. (Rattelade, Heather)
October 1, 2018 Filing 31 **Disregard - Amended filing at #33 ** Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple. (Rattelade, Heather) Modified on 10/2/2018 (Collins, S.).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Calvin Williams and Miki Williams answer due 11/7/2018. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/25/2018. (Collins, S.)
September 24, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S.)
September 24, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marianne Dykstra Sept 24 2018) (Boltz, Russ)
September 21, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Calvin Williams and Miki Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edwards, S.)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/13/2018. (Tripp, S.)
September 11, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Collins, S.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marianne Dykstra) (Boltz, Russ)
September 10, 2018 Motion No Longer Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court: #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Tripp, S.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Default of Defendants Calvin Williams and Miki Williams and Certificate of Service by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC (Boltz, Russ)
September 10, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Boltz, Russ)
September 10, 2018 Remark - #23 RESPONSE in Opposition referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court. (Tripp, S.)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #23 Response in Opposition to Motion - Counsel's signature line does not comply with Section IV.D.1 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. The signature line should read "/s/ Mario A. Krueger" and "/s/ Russ E. Boltz." Additionally, A Certificate of Service should accompany this filing. Counsel is directed to refile. (Tripp, S.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 23 *CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #24 * RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Boltz, Russ) Modified on 9/10/2018 (Tripp, S.).
September 10, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Tripp, S.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple (Rattelade, Heather)
September 10, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Heather L. Rattelade on behalf of Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple. (Rattelade, Heather)
September 10, 2018 Filing 20 Proposed Order regarding #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple. (Rattelade, Heather)
September 10, 2018 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple. (Rattelade, Heather)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Russ E. Boltz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Boltz, Russ)
August 27, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #15 Summons Returned Executed, #14 Summons Returned Executed, #16 Summons Returned Executed, #17 Summons Returned Executed. In future filings, counsel should include the division and correct case number. The case number should read 4:18-cv-145-FL. No action by counsel required. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neuse Breeze, LLC, Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra. Jack M. Temple served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/9/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neuse Breeze, LLC, Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra. Sally L. Temple served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/9/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neuse Breeze, LLC, Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra. Calvin Williams served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neuse Breeze, LLC, Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra. Miki Williams served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Mario A. Krueger on behalf of Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Clerk, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 Notice to Attorney General of North Carolina of RICO Action filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Clerk, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
August 21, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Collins, S.)
August 21, 2018 Motion No Longer Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever, III: regarding #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Collins, S.)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. Chief Judge James C. Dever, III no longer assigned to case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 4:18-CV-145-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/21/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Paper Documents pending ECF training. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/20/2018. Sent to Tommy A. Kellis, Mario Kruger, and Russ E. Boltz Carolina Law Group, L.L.C. at 1723 South Glenburnie Road New Bern, NC 28562 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to File. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Paper Documents pending ECF training filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Facebook comment and response, #2 Affidavit of Marianne Dykstra, #3 Affidavit of Callie Attum, #4 Affidavit of Brittany Hartsell, #5 Affidavit of April Pokora) (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 Summonses Issued at intake as to Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple, Calvin Williams, Miki Williams. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Marianne Dykstra. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Glen Dykstra. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Attorney Russ E. Boltz for Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra, Neuse Breeze, LLC. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Jack M. Temple, Sally L. Temple, Calvin Williams, Miki Williams, filed by Neuse Breeze, LLC, Glen Dykstra, Marianne Dykstra. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number NEW000936.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sellers, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykstra et al v. Temple et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Dykstra
Represented By: Russ E. Boltz
Represented By: Mario A. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neuse Breeze, LLC
Represented By: Russ E. Boltz
Represented By: Mario A. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Dykstra
Represented By: Russ E. Boltz
Represented By: Mario A. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally L. Temple
Represented By: Heather L. Rattelade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miki Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack M. Temple
Represented By: Heather L. Rattelade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?