Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 5.905 Acres, +/-, in Halifax Co., NC, PIN 0402060, des. as Tract 2 & Tract 3 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497 of Public Records of Said Co.; & PIN 0402059, des. as Tract 1 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497 et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Cheryl McWilliams, 5.905 Acres, +/-, in Halifax Co., NC, PIN 0402060, des. as Tract 2 & Tract 3 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497 of Public Records of Said Co.; & PIN 0402059, des. as Tract 1 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497, Gloria Almyra Brown and Ingrid McWilliams
Case Number: 4:2018cv00184
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Stouch, L.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding Certificate of Service by Publication for Cheryl McWilliams and Ingrid McWilliams. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 14, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 4:18-CV-184-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/14/2018. (Schline, K.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Sherrod Banks on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Banks, Sherrod)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Danielle Barbour Wilson on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Wilson, Danielle)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support regarding #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 Appendix to the Statement of Facts regarding #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Project Director Brian Wright, #2 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Land Agent Jeffrey Arrington) (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of Material Facts regarding #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC (Kitchin, Henry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4721667.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1a - Depiction of Pittman Property, #3 Exhibit 1b - Depiction of Pittman Property, #4 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #5 Exhibit 3 - Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #6 Exhibit 4a - Plat of Pittman Easements, #7 Exhibit 4b - Plat of Pittman Easements, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #10 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 5.905 Acres, +/-, in Halifax Co., NC, PIN 0402060, des. as Tract 2 & Tract 3 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497 of Public Records of Said Co.; & PIN 0402059, des. as Tract 1 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Barbour Wilson
Represented By: Sherrod Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.905 Acres, +/-, in Halifax Co., NC, PIN 0402060, des. as Tract 2 & Tract 3 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497 of Public Records of Said Co.; & PIN 0402059, des. as Tract 1 Recorded in B. 407, P. 497
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Almyra Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?