Stanley v. Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stan C. Stanley
Defendant: Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00030
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Ann)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Smith, Ann)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Smith, Ann)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Ann)
March 28, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including April 29, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/28/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
March 27, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead. (Love, L.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead filed by Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Ann)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Universal Cable Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altice USA, Inc. for Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Smith, Ann)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Sidney O. Minter on behalf of Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Minter, Sidney)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann Herlocker Smith on behalf of Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.. (Smith, Ann)
March 8, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin Robert Eisner on behalf of Stan C. Stanley. (Eisner, Benjamin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stan C. Stanley (Rogers, Ciara)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of Stan C. Stanley. (Rogers, Ciara)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Universal Cable Holdings, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
March 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
March 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Stan C. Stanley. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
March 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description) No further action is need. (Rudd, D.)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Cable Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Suddenlink ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4851601.), filed by Stan C. Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Charge of Discrimination EEOC Form 5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rogers, Ciara) Modified on 3/1/2019 to describe exhibit (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Cable Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney O. Minter
Represented By: Ann Herlocker Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan C. Stanley
Represented By: Ciara L. Rogers
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Eisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?