Modlin v. U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs
Plaintiff: Howard C. Modlin, Jr.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00074
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs for service on the US Attorney. Summons issued at intake. (Stouch, L.)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to plaintiff regarding summonses. Copy sent to Howard C. Modlin, Jr. via P. O. Box 7, Pinetown, NC 27865 with pro se guide. (Stouch, L.)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs. Copy sent via US Mail to Howard C. Modlin, Jr., P. O. Box 7, Pinetown, NC 27865 for service. (Stouch, L.)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GRN002174.), filed by Howard C. Modlin, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Hugh D. Cox dated 10/19/2017 to Janesville Central Evidence Center, #2 Exhibit Lab Results, #3 Exhibit Letter dated 7/30/2018 from Harold Modlin to Dept. of Veteran Affairs, #4 Exhibit Letter from Department of Veterans Affairs, #5 Exhibit Claim form, #6 Exhibit Letter dated 2/18/2018 from Howard Modlin, Jr. to the Dept. of Veterans Affairs, #7 Exhibit Letter dated 9/24/2018 from Howard Modlin, Jr. to the U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stouch, L.)
May 31, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number GRN002174. (Stouch, L.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Howard C. Modlin, Jr. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/14/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Howard C. Modlin, Jr. at P. O. Box 7, Pinetown, NC 27865. (Stouch, L.)
May 14, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Case also referred for frivolity review. (Love, L.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Howard C. Modlin, Jr. (Rudd, D.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Howard C. Modlin, Jr. (Rudd, D.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Howard C. Modlin, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letter from Hugh D. Cox dated 10/19/2017 to Janesville Central Evidence Center, #3 Exhibit Lab Results, #4 Exhibit Letter dated 7/30/2018 from Harold Modlin to Dept. of Veteran Affairs, #5 Exhibit Letter from Department of Veterans Affairs, #6 Exhibit Claim form, #7 Exhibit Letter dated 2/18/2018 from Howard Modlin, Jr. to the Dept. of Veterans Affairs, #8 Exhibit Letter dated 9/24/2018 from Howard Modlin, Jr. to the U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modlin v. U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard C. Modlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?