Santos v. McAleenan et al

Plaintiff: Nelson Rafael Santos
Defendant: Acting Director Mark Koumans, Denise M Frazier, Acting Secretary Kevin K McAleenan, Kevin K McAleenan and Mark Koumans
Case Number: 4:2019cv00087
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including September 26, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/8/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
August 8, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other pleading responsive to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other pleading responsive to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Denise M Frazier, Mark Koumans, Kevin K McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Warlick, Lori)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori B. Warlick on behalf of Denise M Frazier, Mark Koumans, Kevin K McAleenan. (Warlick, Lori)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Denise M Frazier, Mark Koumans, Kevin K McAleenan, U.S. Attorney General and US Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by Nelson Rafael Santos regarding #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- LPR Card, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- N-400 Receipt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- N-400 Biometrics Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- N-400 Interview Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E- N-652, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F- N-14, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G- N-14 Response) (Lukanich, Allison)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel is directed to refile the exhibits (pages 9 - 19) should be filed as separate pdfs attached to the main document and a description given for each exhibit. See Section V.E.1(d) of he CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26I2055D.), filed by Nelson Rafael Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lukanich, Allison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nelson Rafael Santos (Lukanich, Allison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice filed by Nelson Rafael Santos Financial Disclosure. (Lukanich, Allison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Allison Lukanich on behalf of Nelson Rafael Santos. (Lukanich, Allison)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4977090.), filed by Nelson Rafael Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G) (Lukanich, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Rafael Santos
Represented By: Allison Lukanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Mark Koumans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise M Frazier
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?