Brown v. Knox
Plaintiff: Calvin Earl Brown
Defendant: Jennifer Knox
Case Number: 4:2019cv00108
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 US Court of Appeals Case Number 19-2011 (Emily Borneisen, Case Manager) as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Foell, S.)
September 16, 2019 Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4th Circuit Court of Appeals regarding #13 Notice of Appeal (Foell, S.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #13 Notice of Appeal. (Foell, S.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appeal filed by Calvin Earl Brown as to #10 Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Tripp, S.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Reconsideration. The court CAUTIONS plaintiff that any motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis presenting claims on the same basis as the instant lawsuit and plaintiff's prior lawsuit may be dismissed summarily as repetitive and vexatious, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/11/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Calvin Earl Brown, 31 Cherry Lane, Chocowinity, NC 27817.) (Collins, S.)
September 5, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #11 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding #10 Judgment, #9 Order on Memorandum and Recommendations. (Collins, S.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding #10 Judgment, #9 Order on Memorandum and Recommendations filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the court's order entered August 26, 2019, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that this action is dismissed. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/26/2019. (Collins, S.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #6 Order and Memorandum and Recommendations. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The clerk of court is directed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/26/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Calvin Earl Brown, 31 Cherry Lane, Chocowinity, NC 27817.) (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #6 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Earl Brown, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #6 Order and Memorandum and Recommendations by Calvin Earl Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Knox filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Collins, S.)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Earl Brown, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Earl Brown. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 8/8/2019. (A certified copy of this Order and M&R was sent via US mail to Calvin Earl Brown, 31 Cherry Lane,Chocowinity, NC 27817.) (Collins, S.)
August 5, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents in Support, #2 Exhibit Earnings Statement, #3 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 7/30/2019. (Collins, S.)
July 30, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Rudd, D.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Rudd, D.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (wrong form), filed by Calvin Earl Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Earl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?