National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A. et al v. Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy Brown and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Royale Yacht Finishing, LLC and Jeremy Rodamaker
Case Number: 4:2019cv00112
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Summonses Issued as to Jeremy Rodamaker, Royale Yacht Finishing, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Royale Yacht Finishing, LLC, Jeremy Rodamaker by Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract Terms, #2 Exhibit B - Contract Work Order, #3 Exhibit C - Original Complaint, #4 Proposed Summons to TP Defendant Rodamaker, #5 Proposed Summons to TP Defendant Royale) (Evans, Don)
August 21, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
August 21, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #7 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiffs, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including September 25, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/21/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
August 21, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Order regarding #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, by Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc.. (Collins, Wesley)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc.. (Collins, Wesley)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Wesley A. Collins on behalf of Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc.. (Collins, Wesley)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Summons & Complaint filed by Timothy Brown, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A. served on Tate Lawrence on August 14, 2019. (Stancliff, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Michael Stancliff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Stancliff, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
August 12, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A. (Stancliff, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5057811.), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A., Timothy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Stancliff, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A. et al v. Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Brown
Represented By: Steven Michael Stancliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A.
Represented By: Steven Michael Stancliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jarrett Bay Boatworks, Inc.
Represented By: Don T. Evans, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Royale Yacht Finishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jeremy Rodamaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?