Thompson v. Pitt County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Edward Thompson
Defendant: Pitt County Detention Center, Officer Byrum and Sgt. McKinney
Case Number: 4:2019cv00114
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maurice Edward Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The court ORDERS Plaintiff to submit a properly completed application on or before October 4, 2019. Plaintiff is warned that failure to file a properly completed in forma pauperis application as ordered herein may result in denial of his application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/10/2019. (A certified copy of this order with blank in forma pauperis application sent via US mail to Maurice Edward Thompson, 761 Third Street, Ayden, NC 28573.) (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Maurice Edward Thompson. (Rudd, D.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Maurice Edward Thompson. (Rudd, D.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Maurice Edward Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Pitt County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitt County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Byrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Edward Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?