Smith v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Charles W. Smith, Jr.
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00119
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2019. (Stouch, L.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Freeman, Mason)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Charles W. Smith, Jr (Duke, W.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by W. Gregory Duke on behalf of Charles W. Smith, Jr. (Duke, W.)
August 29, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Nationwide General Insurance Company answer due 10/2/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/29/2019. Copy sent to Plaintiff's Counsel W. Gregory Duke, Attorney at Law at 119 W. Fourth Street, Greenville, NC 27858 mailed via US Mail. (Stouch, L.)
August 29, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Freeman, Mason)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel W. Gregory Duke, Attorney at Law at 119 W. Fourth Street, Greenville, NC 27858 mailed via US Mail on August 26, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Freeman, Mason)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mason E. Freeman on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Freeman, Mason)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide General Insurance Company from Lenoir County Superior Court, case number 19-cvs-666. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5077089), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court File) (Freeman, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: W. Gregory Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Mason E. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?