American General Life Insurance Company v. Ruiz et al
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: DOES 1-10, John R. Hultin, Phillip Mark Parott, Kathryn Midyette Ruiz, Joseph L. Varga, Donald E. Pontiff, Barry S. Mills and Ronald A. Pontiff
Case Number: 4:2019cv00142
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by American General Life Insurance Company. John R. Hultin waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Barry S. Mills waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Phillip Mark Parott waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Donald E. Pontiff waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Ronald A. Pontiff waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Herrmann, L.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John R. Hultin, Barry S. Mills, Phillip Mark Parott, Donald E. Pontiff, Ronald A. Pontiff, Kathryn Midyette Ruiz, Joseph L. Varga. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Edwards, S.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Notice filed by American General Life Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Filing of Summons in a Civil Action. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Melcher, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by American General Life Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Filing of Summons in a Civil Action. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by American General Life Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Filing of Summons is a Civil Action. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by American General Life Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Filing of Summons in a Civil Action. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by American General Life Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, of Filing Summons in a Civil Action. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey W. Melcher on behalf of American General Life Insurance Company. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent SAFG Retirement Services, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Life Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. (AIG), Corporate Parent AGC Life Insurance Company for American General Life Insurance Company. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all the subsequent attachments documents. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
October 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
October 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-21] Financial Disclosure Statement - The financial disclosure statement is a stand alone document. Counsel is directed to refile using the event "Other-Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement". (Rudd, D.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Interpleader and For Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5131306.), filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Life Insurance Application - Part A, #2 Exhibit B- Life Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit C- Change of Beneficiary form, #4 Exhibit D- Letter dated 4/7/09 to Melvin J. Pontiff, Jr. #5 Exhibit E- Letter dated 4/8/09 to Melvin J. Pontiff, Jr., #6 Exhibit F- Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G- Letter dated 4/1/19 regarding death of Melvin Pontiff, Jr., #8 Exhibit H- Correspondence to American General Life Insurance Company, #9 Exhibit I- Letters of Administration, #10 Exhibit J- Correspondence to AIG with documents, #11 Exhibit K- Letter to AIG dated 5/8/19, #12 Exhibit L- Correspondence, #13 Exhibit M- Proof of Death - Claimant's Statement, #14 Exhibit N- Proof of Death - Claimant's Statement, #15 Exhibit O- Proof of Death - Claimant's Statement, #16 Exhibit P- Correspondence and other documents, #17 Exhibit Q- Proof of Death - Claimant's Statement, #18 Exhibit R- Proof of Death - Claimant's Statement, #19 Exhibit S- Proof of Death - Claimant's Statement, #20 Exhibit T- Proof of Death - Claimant's Statement, #21 Supplement Corporate Disclosure, #22 Civil Cover Sheet) (Melcher, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/7/2019 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. Ruiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Hultin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Mark Parott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Midyette Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Pontiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Pontiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?