Squires v. Department of the Navy
Petitioner: Larry Squires
Respondent: Department of the Navy
Case Number: 4:2020cv00020
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER filed granting motion #15 ; denying as moot #18 ; The motion is granted to the extent that this petition and all filings are transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. Each side shall bear its own costs. ISSUED AS A MANDATE: January 29, 2020. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 666819 [NL] [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:41 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot Petitioner's motions to extend time to file brief #13 and #14 filed by Petitioner Larry Squires. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 656850 [CAB] [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:21 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION of Respondent Navy Dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction or, in the alternative, transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina [Consent: opposed]. Service: 12/16/2019 by email, US mail. 656778 [19-2383] [Jimmy McBirney] [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:22 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 3 paper copies of the Informal Opening Brief #17 received from Petitioner Larry Squires. 659037 [CJF] [Entered: 12/27/2019 10:36 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION of Petitioner Larry Squires to waive the requirements regarding the brief (Motion to Exceed Page Limitations) [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 12/16/2019 by clerk. 656867 [CAB] [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:38 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 FILED from Petitioner Larry Squires. Title: INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF. Service: 12/16/2019 by clerk. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) 656865 [CAB] [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:36 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION of Petitioner Larry Squires, 3rd Motion for Extension of Time to File Informal Brief [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 12/05/2019 by clerk. 654418 [CAB] [Entered: 12/05/2019 04:22 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION of Petitioner Larry Squires, 2nd Motion for Extension of Time to File Informal Brief [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 11/19/2019 by clerk. 650528 [CAB] [Entered: 11/19/2019 01:06 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief #11 filed by Petitioner Larry Squires. The informal opening brief is due 11/25/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 649577 [CAB] [Entered: 11/15/2019 09:45 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 9 filed by Petitioner Larry Squires. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 643391 [CAB] [Entered: 10/21/2019 12:25 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: certificate of interest Docket No. #6 , ERROR: The certificate of interest is incomplete. CORRECTION: Please complete all required sections in future filings. The certificate of interest is not required for a pro se party so no corrected version is needed. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. 640272 [MMA] [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:23 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on January 29, 2020.] (Rudd, D.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION of Petitioner Larry Squires requesting an extension of time of 45 days to file the Petitioner's informal brief. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 10/21/2019 by clerk. 643403 [CAB] [Entered: 10/21/2019 12:41 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Jimmy S. McBirney as principal counsel for Respondent Navy. Service: 09/26/2019 by email, US mail. 638440 [19-2383] [Jimmy McBirney] [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:24 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION of Petitioner Larry Squires for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 10/21/2019 by clerk. 643380 [CAB] [Entered: 10/21/2019 11:58 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on January 29, 2020.] *Document is unavailable. (Rudd, D.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Statement Concerning Discrimination pursuant to Fed. Cir. R. 15(c) for Petitioner Larry Squires. Service: 10/04/2019 by clerk. 640270 [MMA] [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:17 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on January 29, 2020.] (Rudd, D.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Petitioner Larry Squires. Service: 10/04/2019 by clerk. 640269 [MMA] [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:14 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 filed by Petitioner Larry Squires. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 637365 [LMS] [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:14 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Certified list received. Service: 09/12/2019 by US mail. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. 635158 [SJ] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:46 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] (Rudd, D.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION of Petitioner Larry Squires for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 09/10/2019 by clerk. 634265 [SJ] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:47 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 1/29/2020.] *Document is unavailable. (Rudd, D.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/03/2019. 634259 Fee/IFP due on 09/24/2019. 15(c) due on 09/24/2019. Entry of Appearance due 09/24/2019. Certified List due on 10/21/2019. [SJ] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:36 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on January 29, 2020.] (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Squires v. Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?