United States of America v. $23,940.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $23,940.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 4:2020cv00023
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by United States of America Notification of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Executed as to Antwan Marshane Smith, #2 Exhibit B - Service Executed as to Shalisha Sharan Smith, #3 Exhibit C - Service Executed as to Hunter Marie Peterson, #4 Exhibit D - Service Attempted as to Brittany Alexis Holland) (Fesak, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date March 15, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement Certification Report) (Fesak, Matthew)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 USM 285 Form - Funds in USMS custody on 2/18/2020. (Stouch, L.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT of of Arrest and Notice in Rem issued. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/10/2020. (Stouch, L.)
February 10, 2020 Remark - #3 Notice referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court. (Stouch, L.)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of United States of America. (Fesak, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $23,940.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Task Force Agent Everett Butler, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $23,940.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $23,940.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?