Taylor v. Dogwood State Bank
Plaintiff: Chiquita Taylor
Defendant: Dogwood State Bank
Case Number: 4:2020cv00070
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Dogwood State Bank (Branch, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by John Ellison Branch, III on behalf of Dogwood State Bank. (Branch, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew D. Brown on behalf of Dogwood State Bank. (Brown, Andrew)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon S. Neuman on behalf of Dogwood State Bank. (Neuman, Brandon)
May 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL078466 (Rodriguez, M.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Chiquita Taylor. Dogwood State Bank waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/4/2020. (Fong, Wilson)
May 5, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dogwood State Bank. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Chiquita Taylor (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fong, Wilson)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wilson F. Fong on behalf of Chiquita Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fong, Wilson)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dogwood State Bank (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Chiquita Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Fong, Wilson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Dogwood State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dogwood State Bank
Represented By: John Ellison Branch, III
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Andrew D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiquita Taylor
Represented By: Wilson F. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?