Aytch v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brenda Kaye Aytch
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00094
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 8/11/2020. (Tripp, S.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 Process Receipt and Return served on US Attorney General on 7/16/20. (Collins, S.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service on US Attorney as to Andrew Saul served on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Collins, S.)
June 25, 2020 Remark - Certified copy of Order #7 and file-stamped copies of summonses, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statement forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 forms. (Collins, S.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Collins, S.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Brenda Kaye Aytch. (Collins, S.)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint and issue the Summonses prepared by Plaintiff. The United States Marshal shall serve the Summons and Complaint on the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 6/25/2020. (Collins, S.)
June 25, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brenda Kaye Aytch. (Piemonte, George)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED TO PARTICULARIZE the application no later than July 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 6/3/2020. (Collins, S.)
June 3, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #4 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 **AMENDED AT #6 ** Corrected MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brenda Kaye Aytch. (Piemonte, George) Modified on 6/25/2020 (Collins, S.).
June 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Brenda Kaye Aytch (Piemonte, George)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by George C. Piemonte on behalf of Brenda Kaye Aytch. (Piemonte, George)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #4 ** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Brenda Kaye Aytch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summonses, #4 285 Forms) (Piemonte, George) Modified on 6/3/2020 (Collins, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aytch v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Kaye Aytch
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?