Williams v. Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Sarah Williams
Defendant: Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated d/b/a Vidant Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2020cv00111
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/6/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated. (Dewberry, Kaitlin)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated answer due 8/5/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/17/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 17, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer) (Dewberry, Kaitlin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina for Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated. (Dewberry, Kaitlin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Brett A. Carpenter on behalf of Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated. (Carpenter, Brett)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Kaitlin C. Dewberry on behalf of Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated. (Dewberry, Kaitlin)
June 26, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
June 19, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL079146 (Rodriguez, M.)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
June 19, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Payment of the civil filing fee is due upon case initiation. Payments can be, made in the form of cash, checks) or credit cards and paid at the clerk's off1ce during regular business hours. Credit card payments can be made over the telephone to the clerk's office during regular business hours. Also, Pay.gov is an additional credit card option that allows the filer to pay filing fee contemporaneously with the case opening in CM/ECF. (See Section V.D(l)(a) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual). (Rudd, D.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sarah Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Fong, Wilson)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wilson F. Fong on behalf of Sarah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Fong, Wilson)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated d/b/a Vidant Medical Center (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Sarah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Fong, Wilson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Williams
Represented By: Wilson F. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Incorporated d/b/a Vidant Medical Center
Represented By: Brett A. Carpenter
Represented By: Kaitlin C. Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?