Myrick v. Atkinson, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Joeroam Myrick
Defendant: Cleveland Atkinson, Jr. and Edgecombe County
Case Number: 4:2020cv00139
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Cleveland Atkinson, Jr. answer due 9/16/2020. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/18/2020. (Collins, S.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Cleveland Atkinson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Adams, Mary)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. This type of motion must indicate prior consultation with opposing counsel and the views of opposing counsel. Counsel is directed to refile this motion adhering to this requirement. (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #7 ** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Cleveland Atkinson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Adams, Mary) Modified on 8/18/2020 (Collins, S.).
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary Craven Adams on behalf of Cleveland Atkinson, Jr.. (Adams, Mary)
July 17, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cleveland Atkinson, Jr., Edgecombe County. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Edgecombe County) (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Alvin L. Pittman on behalf of Joeroam Myrick. (Pittman, Alvin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Joeroam Myrick (Pittman, Alvin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cleveland Atkinson, Jr., Edgecombe County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5522625.), filed by Joeroam Myrick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to Cleveland Atkinson Jr. as Sheriff of Edgecombe County, #2 Proposed Summons to Edgecombe County, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pittman, Alvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myrick v. Atkinson, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Atkinson, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Craven Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgecombe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joeroam Myrick
Represented By: Alvin L. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?