Johnson v. Dove
Plaintiff: Shirley Ardoin Johnson
Defendant: Faith Yvette Dove
Case Number: 4:2020cv00180
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Herrmann, L.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/16/2020. (Herrmann, L.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Faith Yvette Dove. (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including October 23, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
October 2, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Herrmann, L.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Complaint filed by Faith Yvette Dove. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stanfield, Kevin)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Shirley Ardoin Johnson (Collins, Wesley)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Wesley A. Collins on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Collins, Wesley)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Wesley A. Collins of Harvell and Collins, P.A. at 1107 Bridges Street, Morehead City, NC 28557 mailed via US Mail on September 28, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Faith Yvette Dove. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplement Removal Cover Sheet - Flattened (Stanfield, Kevin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Sophia V. Blair on behalf of Faith Yvette Dove. (Blair, Sophia)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Faith Yvette Dove (Stanfield, Kevin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin J. Stanfield on behalf of Faith Yvette Dove. (Stanfield, Kevin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Faith Yvette Dove from Carteret County Civil Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 767. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5639948), filed by Faith Yvette Dove. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint in Federal Action filed by Dove, #4 Exhibit C - Retirement Plan, #5 Exhibit D - Retirement Account Statement, #6 Exhibit E - Tax Statement for Louisianan Property, #7 Exhibit F - Tax Statement for North Carolina Property, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Appeal for Estate Action, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Removal Cover Sheet) (Stanfield, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Ardoin Johnson
Represented By: Wesley A. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Yvette Dove
Represented By: Sophia V. Blair
Represented By: Kevin J. Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?