Mallory Electric Company v. M.A. Mortenson Company et al
Plaintiff: Mallory Electric Company
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and M.A. Mortenson Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00184
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/23/2020. (Waddell, K.)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company, M.A. Mortenson Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Hester, Clay)
October 22, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including November 23, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #4 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/22/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Sutton Hester on behalf of All Defendants. (Hester, Clay)
October 22, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
October 22, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Waddell, K.)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Hester, Clay)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Hester, Clay)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by M.A. Mortenson Company identifying Corporate Parent Mortenson Construction Holdings, Inc. for M.A. Mortenson Company. (Hester, Clay)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Federal Insurance Company, M.A. Mortenson Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hester, Clay) Modified on 10/22/2020 to correct event (Hockaday, A.).
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Mallory Electric Company served on Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America on October 2, 2020. (Strickland, Jason)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Mallory Electric Company served on Federal Insurance Company on October 2, 2020. (Strickland, Jason)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Mallory Electric Company served on M.A. Mortenson Company on October 2, 2020. (Strickland, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, M.A. Mortenson Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5645623.), filed by Mallory Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to M.A. Mortenson Company, #4 Proposed Summons to Federal Insurance Company, #5 Proposed Summons to Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. of America) (Strickland, Jason) Modified on 9/29/2020 to reflect that the complaint was corrected. (Rudd, D.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Mallory Electric Company (Strickland, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Trent Strickland on behalf of Mallory Electric Company. (Strickland, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 SEE CORRECTED COMPLAINT AT DE #4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5645623.), filed by Mallory Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to M.A. Mortenson Company, #4 Proposed Summons to Federal Insurance Company, #5 Proposed Summons to Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. of America) (Strickland, Jason) Modified on 9/29/2020 to reflect that corrected complaint with signature was filed at DE #4 . (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallory Electric Company v. M.A. Mortenson Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Clay Sutton Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Clay Sutton Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. Mortenson Company
Represented By: Clay Sutton Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory Electric Company
Represented By: Jason Trent Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?