Willis v. Jones County Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Willis
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Elections and Jones County Board of Elections
Case Number: 4:2020cv00230
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #15 Corrected Amended Complaint, #14 Amended Complaint. North Carolina State Board of Elections answer due 2/18/2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/13/2021. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Daniel J. Willis, 105 Cherry Street, Trenton, NC 28585.) (Collins, S.)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #15 Amended Complaint filed by North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Steed, Terence)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #15 Amended Complaint. (Collins, S.)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corrective Document AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jones County Board of Elections, North Carolina State Board of Elections filed by Daniel J. Willis. (Collins, S.)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jones County Board of Elections, North Carolina State Board of Elections, filed by Daniel J. Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 correspondence to Senator Lazzara, #2 Exhibit correspondence to Cornell Brooks, #3 Exhibit 505 - Reassignment order in 7:95-mc-17, #4 Exhibit 791 - corresponce to Atty Royster, #5 Exhibit 911 - copy of Affidavit of Charles Jones, #6 Exhibit 61 - Correspondence from Jones County Public Schools, #7 Exhibit 21- correspondence from US EPA, #8 Exhibit 444 - letter from NAACP to Mr. Willis, #9 Exhibit 5 - copy of town minutes, #10 Exhibit 9990 - copy of order denying motion, #11 Exhibit 89 - copy of discrimination complaint, #12 Exhibit 71 -External discrimination complaint form, #13 Exhibit 206 - article, #14 Exhibit 111 - copy of 160A-34, #15 Exhibit 311 - copy of general assembly session 2007, #16 Exhibit 4 A-1 - charter amendment, #17 Exhibit 4 - Proposed change, #18 Exhibit 12 - denial of tie-ins to public sewage system, #19 Exhibit 88 - letter to attorney Francis, #20 Exhibit VI - letter to US Department of Justice, #21 Exhibit 7 - The state of inclusion article, #22 Exhibit 8- article Access to Government Services, #23 Exhibit 12 - letter Jones County Schools to Mr. Willis, #24 Exhibit 700 - letter to Director of Civil Rights, #25 Exhibit 200- letter from USDOT, #26 Exhibit 666 - Discimination complaint, #27 Exhibit 1010 - letter to Mayor Spivey, #28 Exhibit 9191 - letter from CleanWater, #29 Exhibit 22011 - letter to Charles Francis, #30 Exhibit 0101 - copy of motion to expedite) (Collins, S.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Steed, Terence)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina State Board of Elections (Cox, Paul)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Cox on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Cox, Paul)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Second Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/22/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Daniel J. Willis, 105 Cherry Street, Trenton, NC 28585.) (Collins, S.)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND MOTION to Expedite filed by Daniel J. Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Text Order denying motion) (Collins, S.)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #9 SECOND MOTION to Expedite. (Collins, S.)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding Motion to Expedite #7 . Plaintiff fails to offer either a factual or legal basis for expedited proceedings in this matter. Accordingly, his motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/15/2020. (A copy of this Text Order was sent via US mail to Daniel J. Willis, 105 Cherry Street, Trenton, NC 28585.) (Collins, S.)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #7 MOTION to Expedite. (Collins, S.)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to North Carolina State Board of Elections. Summons issued at intake counter and returned to plaintiff for process. (Collins, S.)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite filed by Daniel J. Willis. (Collins, S.)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proof of Service (of unissued summons) filed by Daniel J. Willis served on Jones County Board of Elections on 12/10/20. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/11/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Daniel J. Willis, 105 Cherry Street, Trenton, NC 28585.) (Collins, S.)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order **DISREGARD** NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Daniel J. Willis. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) Modified on 12/11/2020 (Collins, S.).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order **DISREGARD** NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.) Modified on 12/11/2020 (Collins, S.).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order **DISREGARD** NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. The Pro Se Plaintiff should file a Cover Sheet as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) Modified on 12/11/2020 (Collins, S.).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice - Civil Action Cover Sheet filed by Daniel J. Willis regarding #1 Complaint. (Pro se plaintiff filed via the clerk's office drop box on the afternoon of 12/10/2020) (Tripp, S.)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Daniel J. Willis. (Pro se plaintiff filed via the clerk's office drop box on the afternoon of 12/10/2020) (Tripp, S.)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Daniel J. Willis. (Pro se plaintiff filed via the clerk's office drop box on the afternoon of 12/10/2020) (Tripp, S.)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jones County Board of Elections, North Carolina State Board of Elections (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number NEW0001103.), filed by Daniel J. Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Town Minutes, #2 Exhibit Letter dated 7/26/2004) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Jones County Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones County Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?