Lopez v. Blain et al
Plaintiff: Julianna Lopez
Defendant: Paul E Blain, David L. Blain and Caroline W. Blain
Case Number: 4:2021cv00021
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate, #11 Memorandum in Support filed by Julianna Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Taylor, John)
April 28, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate, #11 Memorandum in Support. (Waddell, K.)
April 28, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #16 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including May 14, 2021, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate #10 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/28/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laura E. Dean terminated as counsel of record for David L. Blain and Caroline W. Blain. Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 4/13/2021. (Waddell, K.)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dean, Laura)
April 12, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Waddell, K.)
April 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate, #11 Memorandum in Support filed by Julianna Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Taylor, John)
April 7, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate, #11 Memorandum in Support . (Waddell, K.)
April 7, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #13 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including April 30, 2021, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss or in alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate #10 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/7/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain (Harris, Jason)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate filed by Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain. (Harris, Jason)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or in alternative: Motion to Strike, Answer and Motion to Consolidate filed by Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain. (Harris, Jason)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Levi A. Huston on behalf of Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain. (Huston, Levi)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Laura E. Dean on behalf of Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain. (Dean, Laura)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason R. Harris on behalf of Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain. (Harris, Jason)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Zaytoun on behalf of Julianna Lopez. (Zaytoun, Robert)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Taylor on behalf of Julianna Lopez. (Taylor, John)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew David Ballew on behalf of Julianna Lopez. (Ballew, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
March 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caroline W. Blain, David L. Blain, Paul E Blain. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 7, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is to file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Julianna Lopez (Taylor, John)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (in Admiralty) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5913221.), filed by Julianna Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Paul Blain, #4 Proposed Summons David Blain, #5 Proposed Summons Caroline Blain) (Taylor, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Blain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Blain
Represented By: Laura E. Dean
Represented By: Levi A. Huston
Represented By: Jason R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline W. Blain
Represented By: Laura E. Dean
Represented By: Levi A. Huston
Represented By: Jason R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianna Lopez
Represented By: John R. Taylor
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Represented By: Robert E. Zaytoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?