AR Textiles, Ltd. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: AR Textiles, Ltd.
Defendant: John Hackney Agency, Inc. and The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00073
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by AR Textiles, Ltd. as to All Defendants. (Frost, Joseph)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael P. Baniak on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Baniak, Michael)
May 19, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (Waddell, K.)
May 19, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time #9 #11 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including June 21, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/19/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by John Hackney Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dixon, Joshua)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Wallace Dixon on behalf of John Hackney Agency, Inc.. (Dixon, Joshua)
May 19, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Waddell, K.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gallagher, Skylar)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew W. Buckmiller on behalf of AR Textiles, Ltd.. (Buckmiller, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by AR Textiles, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent AR International Ltd. for AR Textiles, Ltd.. (Frost, Joseph)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Z. Frost on behalf of AR Textiles, Ltd.. (Frost, Joseph)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' Counsel, Matthew W. Buckmiller & Joseph Z. Frost of Buckmiller, Boyette & Frost, PLLC at 4700 Six Forks Road, Suite 150,Raleigh, NC 27609 and Counsel for Defendant John Hackney Agency, Inc. Josh Dixon of Gordon & Rees LLP at 421 Fayetteville Street, Suite 330, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on May 13, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Vanore, Andrew)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew A. Vanore, III on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Vanore, Andrew)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Skylar Gallagher on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Gallagher, Skylar)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Martin County Superior Court, case number 21 CVS 104. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6041879), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Vanore, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AR Textiles, Ltd. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AR Textiles, Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Represented By: Matthew W. Buckmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hackney Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Wallace Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew A. Vanore, III
Represented By: Skylar Gallagher
Represented By: Michael P. Baniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?