Greene et al v. 4520 Corp Inc et al
Plaintiff: Janet Hales Greene and Elsie Collier Hales
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc., Covil Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Crane Co., 4520 Corp Inc, Daniel International Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Ametek, Inc., General Electric Company, Howden North America Inc., The William Powell Company, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Hercules LLC, Armstrong International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, The Dow Chemical Company, Viacomcbs Inc., Union Carbide Corporation and Champlain Cable Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00074
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 7/7/2021. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 97 Financial Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump, Inc. (Drayton, Amy)
July 2, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #97 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. The deputy clerk will flatten the document. No need to refile at this time. (Waddell, K.)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/1/2021. (Waddell, K.)
July 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Viking Pump, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Waddell, K.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 95 Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Viking Pump, Inc.. (Drayton, Amy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance filed by Amy C. Drayton on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc.. (Drayton, Amy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 93 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy Peck on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.. (Peck, Timothy)
June 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #91 Answer to Complaint. All counsel appearing on behalf of a party should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance in accordance with this Rule. (Waddell, K.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 92 Financial Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc. (Peck, Timothy)
June 28, 2021 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Peck, Timothy)
June 28, 2021 Filing 90 Financial Disclosure Statement by Viacomcbs Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
June 28, 2021 Filing 89 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of Viacomcbs Inc.. (Techman, Jennifer)
June 28, 2021 Filing 88 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Viacomcbs Inc.. (Techman, Jennifer)
June 28, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #60 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Waddell, K.)
June 27, 2021 Filing 87 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 27, 2021 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Champlain Cable Corporation. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 27, 2021 Filing 85 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Ametek, Inc.. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 25, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #80 Answer to Complaint, #82 Answer to Complaint and #84 Answer to Complaint. Counsel are reminded that pursuant to the court's local rules, all counsel appearing on behalf of a party must file a notice of appearance. See Local Civil Rules 5.2(a) and 83.1(e). (Waddell, K.)
June 25, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to 4520 Corp Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Waddell, K.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 84 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 83 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hercules LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ashland Global Holdings Inc. for Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 82 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Champlain Cable Corporation. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 81 Financial Disclosure Statement by Champlain Cable Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CC Acquisition Corp. for Champlain Cable Corporation. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ametek, Inc.. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 79 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ametek, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 78 Financial Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
June 24, 2021 Filing 77 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
June 24, 2021 Filing 76 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
June 24, 2021 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter A. Santos on behalf of FMC Corporation. (Santos, Peter)
June 24, 2021 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Brooks Jones on behalf of FMC Corporation. (Jones, Kelly)
June 24, 2021 Filing 73 Financial Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation (Jones, Kelly)
June 24, 2021 Filing 72 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by FMC Corporation. (Jones, Kelly)
June 24, 2021 Filing 71 Financial Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Inc. (Hawkins, Eric)
June 23, 2021 Filing 70 Financial Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
June 23, 2021 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
June 23, 2021 Filing 68 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
June 23, 2021 Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Flowserve US Inc.. (Hawkins, Eric)
June 23, 2021 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric T. Hawkins on behalf of Flowserve US Inc.. (Hawkins, Eric)
June 22, 2021 Filing 65 Financial Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Mather, Emily)
June 22, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crane Co.. (Mather, Emily)
June 22, 2021 Filing 63 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily Mather on behalf of Crane Co.. (Mather, Emily)
June 22, 2021 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance filed by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Crane Co.. (Reschly, Marla)
June 22, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #60 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Pursuant to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II Practice Preferences, counsel shall also email proposed orders in a word processing format to Documents_Judge_Myers@nced.uscourts.gov. (Waddell, K.)
June 21, 2021 Filing 61 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jordan Blumenfeld-James on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically filed by Janet Hales Greene, Elsie Collier Hales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Credit Card Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Refund of Duplicative Filing Fees) (Graham, William)
June 21, 2021 Filing 59 Financial Disclosure Statement by The William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
June 21, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - The document filed at #43 appears to be a duplicate of that filed at #42 , which does not include a financial disclosure statement. Counsel is directed to file a financial disclosure statement as to Defendant The William Powell Company. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Waddell, K.)
June 21, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to 4520 Corp Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Waddell, K.)
June 18, 2021 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Starr on behalf of Grinnell LLC. (Starr, William)
June 18, 2021 Filing 57 Financial Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 18, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Grinnell LLC. (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 18, 2021 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy E. Tomlin on behalf of Grinnell LLC. (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Larry Walters on behalf of 4520 Corp Inc. (Walters, Jason)
June 17, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by 4520 Corp Inc. (Walters, Jason)
June 17, 2021 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Starr on behalf of Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Starr, William)
June 17, 2021 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Starr on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Starr, William)
June 17, 2021 Filing 50 Financial Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps Incorporated (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy E. Tomlin on behalf of Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 47 Financial Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy E. Tomlin on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by The William Powell Company. (Oakley, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 43 CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #59 Financial Disclosure Statement by The William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance filed by David B. Oakley on behalf of The William Powell Company. (Oakley, David)
June 16, 2021 Filing 41 Amended Financial Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc. (Coltrain, Keith)
June 15, 2021 Filing 40 Financial Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc. (Coltrain, Keith)
June 15, 2021 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.. (Coltrain, Keith)
June 15, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance filed by Keith E. Coltrain on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.. (Coltrain, Keith)
June 15, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #40 Financial Disclosure Statement. Question two was answered as "yes" but no parent corporations were identified. Counsel is directed to correct and refile this form. (Waddell, K.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Barton Major on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
June 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #28 Answer to Complaint. Counsel is reminded that in accordance with Section IV.D.1 of the CM/ECF Policy and Procedures Manual, the document must contain the electronic signature of the CM/ECF user under whose log-in and password the document was submitted. No need to refile at this time. (Waddell, K.)
June 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding docket entries #12 through #26 . Pursuant to the court's local rules, all counsel appearing on behalf of a party must file a notice of appearance. See Local Civil Rules 5.2(a) and 83.1(e). The docket in this case reflects that Christopher B. Major has not made an appearance in this case. Counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance in in accordance with these Rules. (Waddell, K.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 36 Financial Disclosure Statement by Howden North America Inc. (Frankel, Shannon)
June 11, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Curtis J. Shipley on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Shipley, Curtis)
June 11, 2021 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Scottie Forbes Lee on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Lee, Scottie)
June 11, 2021 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Packer, Leslie)
June 11, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 31 Financial Disclosure Statement by Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Covil Corporation. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance filed by Shannon Strickland Frankel on behalf of Howden North America Inc.. (Frankel, Shannon)
June 11, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Howden North America Inc.. (Weaver, Brandon)
June 11, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon Michael Weaver on behalf of Howden North America Inc.. (Weaver, Brandon)
June 11, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Scott E. Frick on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Frick, Scott)
June 11, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by William David Conner on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Conner, William)
June 11, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Moffatt G. McDonald on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (McDonald, Moffatt)
June 11, 2021 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Dow Chemical Company (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by The Dow Chemical Company. (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc. (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Daniel International Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Flowserve US Inc. (Waddell, K.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 Notice filed by Janet Hales Greene, Elsie Collier Hales regarding #1 Complaint, Re-issued Summons for FlowServe. (Graham, William)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to 4520 Corp Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ametek, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Champlain Cable Corporation, Covil Corporation, Crane Co., Daniel International Corporation, FMC Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Grinnell LLC, Hercules LLC, Howden North America Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The William Powell Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Viacomcbs Inc., Viking Pump, Inc. (Waddell, K.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 Notice filed by Janet Hales Greene, Elsie Collier Hales regarding #1 Complaint, Summons to be re-issued. (Graham, William)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #8 . Notice filed by Janet Hales Greene, Elsie Collier Hales regarding #1 Complaint, Updated Summons to be Re-Issued. (Graham, William)
May 18, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #8 Notice regarding Summons to be re-issued. No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed as to Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Waddell, K.)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Waddell, K.)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Redesignating Division to the Eastern Division. The Honorable Richard E. Myers II, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 4:21-CV-74-M. No further filing shall be made in 5:21-CV-222-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/14/2021. (Waddell, K.)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Elsie Collier Hales (Graham, William)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Janet Hales Greene (Graham, William)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by William M. Graham on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Graham, William)
May 14, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-2] Financial Disclosure Statement, [1-3] Financial Disclosure Statement. The Financial Disclosure statement is a stand alone document therefore Counsel is directed to refile the Financial Disclosure Statements using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement. (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Eastern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2021 Case transferred in from Western Division Division on 05/14/2021; former case number: 5:21-cv-222-M. (Waddell, K.)
May 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6042513.), filed by Elsie Collier Hales, Janet Hales Greene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure, #3 Disclosure, #4 Proposed Summons all Defendants) (Graham, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene et al v. 4520 Corp Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Amy C. Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covil Corporation
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Scottie Forbes Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Emily Mather
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4520 Corp Inc
Represented By: Jason Larry Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Eric T. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden North America Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Michael Weaver
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: David B. Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules LLC
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International Inc
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Brooks Jones
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Cable Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Hales Greene
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Collier Hales
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?