Brown Clark v. Meads et al
Plaintiff: Lillie Brown Clark
Defendant: Daniel Meads, Robert Morgan, Aaron Lewellyn, Steven Judd, Michael Swindell, Kenneth Bishop, Joel Lunsford, Tommy S. Wooten, II, Doug Doughtie, John and Jane Doe 1-20 and ABC corporation 1-4
Case Number: 4:2021cv00097
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Northern Division case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 2:21-CV-34-FL. No further filing shall be made in 4:21-CV-97-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/26/2021. (Collins, S.)
July 26, 2021 Notice to Counsel. This case should have been filed in the Northern Division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Collins, S.)
July 26, 2021 Intradistrict Transfer to Northern Division. New Case Number 2:21-cv-34-FL. (Collins, S.)
July 24, 2021 Filing 19 Notice filed by Lillie Brown Clark Cover Sheet. (Daniels, Harry) Modified on 7/26/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
July 24, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Harry M. Daniels on behalf of Lillie Brown Clark. (Daniels, Harry)
July 23, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #17 Notice of Special Appearance. Wrong division noted on this document. In addition, this document does not comply with the signature requirements for Local Counsel as well. Counsel is directed to refile this document complying fully with Local Civil Rule 83.1. (Collins, S.) Modified on 7/23/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Harry M. Daniels on behalf of Lillie Brown Clark. (Daniels, Harry)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lillie Brown Clark (Daniels, Harry)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lillie Brown Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dare County Arrest Warrants for Andrew Brown, Jr., #2 Exhibit Autopsy Report of Andrew Brown Jr., #3 Exhibit Pasquotank County Sheriff's Office Use of Force Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Daniels, Harry)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Latrisha Cherry-Lassiter on behalf of Lillie Brown Clark. (Collins, S.)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance Attorney Latrisha Cherry-Lassiter. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/21/2021.A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Attorney Latrisha Cherry-Lassiter at 1851 West Eharinghous St #136, Elizabeth City, NC 27909 (Collins, S.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Chance D. Lynch on behalf of Lillie Brown Clark. (Collins, S.)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance Attorney Chance D. Lynch. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/21/2021.A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Chance D. Lynch, Attorney At Law, 1015A Roanoke Ave, Ste. A, Roanoke Rapids, NC 27870 (Collins, S.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance regarding #5 Proposed Notice of Appearance by Attorney Latrisha Cherry-Lassiter filed by Lillie Brown Clark. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, S.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance regarding #4 Proposed Notice of Appearance by Attorney Chance D. Lynch filed by Lillie Brown Clark. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, S.)
July 19, 2021 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #10 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance, #9 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 Local Civil Rules of Practice and Procedure. (Collins, S.)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #10 ** MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Appearance - Signed, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, S.) Modified on 7/19/2021 (Collins, S.).
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Document: Proposed Notice of Appearance by Attorney Latrisha Cherry-Lassiter. (Collins, S.) Modified on 7/16/2021 to indicate this document is not properly signed. (Collins, S.).
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 Document: Proposed Notice of Appearance by Attorney Chance D. Lynch. (Collins, S.)
July 16, 2021 Notice to Counsel. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, service of any court generated document (i.e., orders, notices, etc.) will only be made on the attorney(s) registered in CM/ECF. It is the responsibility of the law firm's electronic users to notify and serve allother firm members appearing in the case who are not receiving electronic notification. Co-counsel shall serve any notices on attorneys not registered in CM/ECF. (Collins, S.)
July 16, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #6 Motion for Leave to File Manually. This document list attorney Chance D. Lynch as the moving party however is signed by attorney L. Chantel Cherry-Lassiter. Counsel shall refile. (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Ripley Eagles Rand on behalf of Doug Doughtie, Steven Judd, Joel Lunsford, Kenneth Bishop, Michael Swindell, Tommy S. Wooten, II. (Rand, Ripley)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Geis on behalf of Doug Doughtie, Steven Judd, Joel Lunsford, Kenneth Bishop, Michael Swindell, Tommy S. Wooten, II. (Geis, Christopher)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 **Amended and refiled at #15 ** COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Lillie Brown Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Daniels, Harry) Modified on 7/23/2021 (Collins, S.).
July 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit" is not a sufficient description). Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Lillie Brown Clark. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel: No summons provided for issuance or waiver of service filed. (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. This document advises the court that counsel is entering a special appearance in association with local counsel, however local counsel has not filed Notice of appearance. This document does not comply with the signature requirements for Local Counsel as well. Counsel is directed to refile this complaint complying fully with Local Civil Rule 83.1 and to provide a copy of this notice to attorneys Chantel Cherry-Lassiter and Chance D. Lynch, who are directed to file their Notices of Appearance with this court. (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and(c). Counsel should also indicate the case number on pleadings. (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Collins, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown Clark v. Meads et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Brown Clark
Represented By: Harry M. Daniels
Represented By: Chance D. Lynch
Represented By: Latrisha Cherry-Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Meads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Lewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Judd
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Ripley Eagles Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Swindell
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Ripley Eagles Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Bishop
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Ripley Eagles Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Lunsford
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Ripley Eagles Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy S. Wooten, II
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Ripley Eagles Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Doughtie
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Ripley Eagles Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC corporation 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?