Edwartoski et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Eric Edwartoski, Amy Edwartoski and April Edwartoski
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00160
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 20 Proposed Order regarding #19 Second MOTION to Stay filed by April Edwartoski, Eric Edwartoski. (Collins, Wesley)
December 21, 2021 Filing 19 Second MOTION to Stay filed by April Edwartoski, Eric Edwartoski. (Collins, Wesley)
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Amy Edwartoski, Eric Edwartoski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Copy of Policy) (Collins, Wesley) Modified on 12/2/2021 to label exhibit. (Collins, S.)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 First Motion to Amend/Correct. It is ordered that Plaintiffs may amend their complaint to correct the name of Plaintiff April Edwartoski. Plaintiffs shall docket their proposed amended complaint within 5 days of the date of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/19/2021. (Collins, S.)
November 18, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #14 First MOTION to Amend/Correct. (Collins, S.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Order regarding #14 First MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Amy Edwartoski, Eric Edwartoski. (Collins, Wesley)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Amy Edwartoski, Eric Edwartoski. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit exhibit to amended complaint, #3 Amended complaint with markup) (Collins, Wesley)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay until December 31, 2021. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/2/2021. (Castania, M)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting stay) (Lewis, J.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
November 1, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #11 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Castania, M)
October 28, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Amy Edwartoski (Collins, Wesley)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Eric Edwartoski (Collins, Wesley)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Wesley A. Collins on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Collins, Wesley)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Wesley A. Collins of Harvel and Collins, P.A. at 1107 Bridges Street, Morehead City, NC 28557 mailed via US Mail on October 27, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Diane K. Pappayliou on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Pappayliou, Diane)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Craven County Superior Court, case number 21 CVS 1256. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6288491), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Craven County pleadings served, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Lewis, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwartoski et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Edwartoski
Represented By: Wesley A. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Edwartoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Edwartoski
Represented By: Wesley A. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Diane K. Pappayliou
Represented By: Shelley Walters Coleman
Represented By: J. Scott Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?