Talley v. Folwell et al
Plaintiff: Patsy Talley
Defendant: Dale Folwell, State of NC, Dep't of State Treasurer Retirement Systems Division, Teachers & State Employees Retirement System, Lentz Brewer, John Ebbighausen, Vernon Gammon, Dirk German, Barbara Gibson, Linda Gunter, Oliver Holley, Greg Patterson, Margaret Reader, Joshua Smith, Catherine Truitt and Jeffrey Winstead
Case Number: 4:2022cv00027
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Lentz Brewer, Dep't of State Treasurer Retirement Systems Division, John Ebbighausen, Dale Folwell, Vernon Gammon, Dirk German, Barbara Gibson, Linda Gunter, Oliver Holley, Greg Patterson, Margaret Reader, Joshua Smith, State of NC, Teachers & State Employees Retirement System, Catherine Truitt, Jeffrey Winstead. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Murphy, Katherine)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lentz Brewer (Murphy, Katherine)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lentz Brewer, Dep't of State Treasurer Retirement Systems Division, John Ebbighausen, Dale Folwell, Vernon Gammon, Dirk German, Barbara Gibson, Linda Gunter, Oliver Holley, Greg Patterson, Margaret Reader, Joshua Smith, State of NC, Teachers & State Employees Retirement System, Catherine Truitt, Jeffrey Winstead (Murphy, Katherine)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine A. Murphy on behalf of All Defendants. (Murphy, Katherine)
May 17, 2022 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
May 17, 2022 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #8 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including June 22, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/17/2022. (Hockaday, A.)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 Notice filed by Patsy Talley regarding #1 Complaint Omitted Exhibits 1 - 4 to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DE 1-1 Board of Trustees, #2 Exhibit DE 1-2 Letter from D to P 03.19.2019, #3 Exhibit DE 1-3 Ds List of Overpayments, #4 Exhibit DE 1-4 OAH Order of Dismissal) (Bateman, Valerie)
March 22, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Patsy Talley. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
March 22, 2022 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by June K. Allison on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Allison, June)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Valerie L. Bateman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bateman, Valerie)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6485521.), filed by Patsy Talley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bateman, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talley v. Folwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Talley
Represented By: June K. Allison
Represented By: Valerie L. Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Folwell
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of NC
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep't of State Treasurer Retirement Systems Division
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers & State Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lentz Brewer
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ebbighausen
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Gammon
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk German
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Gibson
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Gunter
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Holley
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Patterson
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Reader
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Smith
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Truitt
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Winstead
Represented By: Katherine A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?