Lehmann v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Charles Lehmann
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2022cv00060
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 7/1/22. (Collins, S.)
July 12, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service on US Attorney as to Kilolo Kijakazi served on 7/5/2022, answer due 9/3/2022. (Collins, S.)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 7/5/22. (Collins, S.)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 US Marshals Service Forms) (Waddell, K.)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Charles Lehmann. (Waddell, K.)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 6/15/2022. (Waddell, K.)
June 15, 2022 Remark - Filed-stamped copies of #4 order, summonses, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statement forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service, along with USM-285 forms. (Waddell, K.)
June 14, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
June 14, 2022 Notice of Social Security Case Filing (Collins, S.)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Charles Lehmann (Hall, Charlotte)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Charles Lehmann. (Hall, Charlotte)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Charles Lehmann. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehmann v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lehmann
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?