North Carolina Green Party et al v. North Carolina State Board of Elections
Plaintiff: North Carolina Green Party, Tony Ndege, Matthew Hoh, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Worrell, Samantha Spence, Aaron Mohammed and Michael Trudeau
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Intervenor Defendant: DSCC and North Carolina Democratic Party
Case Number: 4:2022cv00078
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Brian S Meyers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:22-CV-276-D-BM. No further filing shall be made in 4:22-CV-78-D-BM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/18/2022. (Sellers, N.)
July 18, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Dever III in Raleigh: Status Conference held on 7/18/2022. Counsel for both parties present. Court hears from parties regarding complaint. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant are directed to meet and confer today regarding a proposed briefing schedule for the expected Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The proposed schedule should be submitted by 12:00 pm tomorrow, July 19, 2022. (Court Reporter Amy Condon) (Sellers, N.)
July 18, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Narendra K. Ghosh on behalf of DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 18, 2022 Intradistrict Transfer to Western Division. New case number 5:22-cv-276-D. (Sellers, N.)
July 17, 2022 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION to Intervene filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 17, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Executive Director Report, #2 Exhibit B -- Report on NCGP Petition, #3 Exhibit C -- Jones Declaration, #4 Exhibit D -- Abuceiwicz Letter, #5 Exhibit E -- Proposed Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum) (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 17, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Pooyan Ordoubadi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael Trudeau (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Samantha Worrell (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Samantha Spence (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by K. Ryan Parker (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tony Ndege (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Aaron Mohammed (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Matthew Hoh (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Steed, Terence)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Hearings - Status Conference set for 7/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/15/2022. (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to North Carolina State Board of Elections. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Samantha Worrell. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2022 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western Division. The Clerk will enter an order to redesignate the division. (Sellers, N.)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Samantha Worrell (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Pooyan Ordoubadi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6635904.), filed by Samantha Worrell, Tony Ndege, Samantha Spence, North Carolina Green Party, Aaron Mohammed, Matthew Hoh, K. Ryan Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter: Rose Roby to NCSBE Investigator Matthew Martucci June 29, 2022, #2 Exhibit 2 NCGP Response to NCSBE Investigator David Richards June 16, 2022, #3 Exhibit 3 NCGP Response to NCSBE Attorney Candace Marshall June 22, 2022, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons) (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Carolina Green Party et al v. North Carolina State Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Green Party
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ndege
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hoh
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Ryan Parker
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Worrell
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Spence
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mohammed
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Trudeau
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DSCC
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: North Carolina Democratic Party
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?