Nordan, et al v. Blackwater Security, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Richard P. Nordan, as Ancillary Administrator for the separate Estates of Stephen S. Helvenston, Mike R. Teague, Jerko Gerald Zovko and Wesley J. K. Batalona, filed a wrongful death and fraudulent misrepresentation action against defendants Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC, Blackwater Lodge and Training Center, Inc., Justin L. McQuown and Thomas Powell. Plaintiff alleged that defendants Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC and Blackwater Lodge and Training Center, Inc. sent the decedents on a security mission without providing them with the protections, tools and information that defendants had represented would be provided to allow them to perform their job.

Plaintiff: Richard P. Nordan, Estate of Stephen S. Helvenston, Estate of Mike R. Teague, Estate of Jerko Gerald Zovko and Estate of Wesley J.K. Batalona
Defendant: Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC, Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc. and Justin L. McQuown
Case Number: 5:2005cv00048
Filed: January 24, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45
ORDER of USCA on Bill of Costs. (Deputy Clerk - DR, ) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Deputy Clerk - DR, ).
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42
Published Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals. APPEAL DISMISSED; PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS DENIED; MOTION TO STRIKE DENIED AS MOOT. (Deputy Clerk - DR, )
January 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41
ORDER of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal filed by Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC,, Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc., 38 Notice of Appeal filed by Justin L. McQuown, - THE COURT GRANTS THE MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION. (Deputy Clerk, LL)
December 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40
ORDER of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal filed by Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC,, Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc.,, 38 Notice of Appeal filed by Justin L. McQuown - THE COURT CONSOLIDATES THE ABOVE CASES FOR FURTHER APPELLATE ACTION. (Deputy Clerk, LL)
September 28, 2005 Filing 39
Order the court consolidates these cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument signed by Patricia S. Connor. (rp)
September 9, 2005 Filing 38
Notice of appeal by Justin L. McQuown (rp)
August 30, 2005 Filing 37
Notice of appeal by Blackwater Lodge & T, Blackwater Security (rp)
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36
Judgment for Estate of Batalona, Estate of Zovko, Estate of Teague, Estate of Helvenston, Richard P. Nordan against Justin L. McQuown, Blackwater Lodge & T, Blackwater Security IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the court GRANTS plaintiff's motion to remand, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Where the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action, the court DENIES AS MOOT defendants' motions to dismiss brought under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b). This case is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of Wake Co. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on the Clerk of Superior Court of Wake Co signed by Cheif Judge Louise W. Flanagan, USDJ. cys dist. (dr)
July 1, 2005 Filing 34
Reply by Blackwater Security, Blackwater Lodge & Training to response to plf's objection to def's clarification of removal notice & objection to plf's argument on subsequent authority. (dr)
June 28, 2005 Filing 33
Response by Richard P. Nordan in opposition to [32-1] Notice of Subsequently Decided Authority and Objection to Clarification of Removal Notice. 1c: Chief Judge Flanagan. (ll)
June 20, 2005 Filing 32
Document filed by defendant Blackwater Security, defendant Blackwater Lodge & Training titled: Notice of Subsequently Decided Authority and Clarification of Removal Notice. 1c: to Chief Judge Flanagan (dr)
April 12, 2005 Filing 31
Notice of voluntary dismissal. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(i), Plf voluntarily dismisses the above-captioned action against def. Thomas Powell *ONLY* without prejudice. (dr)
March 21, 2005 Filing 30
Document filed by defendant Blackwater Security, defendant Blackwater Lodge & Training Center titled: Opposition to plf's objections to evidence on the motion to remand. (dr)
March 17, 2005 Filing 29
Reply by Richard P. Nordan, Estate of Helvenston, Estate of Teague, Estate of Zovko, Estate of Batalona to response to [12-1] motion to remand. (dr)
March 11, 2005 Filing 26
Reply by Justin L. McQuown to response to [8-1] motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P. (dr)
March 7, 2005 Filing 24
Declaration of David V. Jackson Re: [21-1] opposition memorandum. (dr)
February 22, 2005 Filing 19
Memorandum by Richard P. Nordan, Estate of Helvenston, Estate of Teague, Estate of Zovko, Estate of Batalona in opposition to [8-1] motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P. (dr)
February 11, 2005 Filing 15
Notice of attorney appearance pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 for Richard P. Nordan, Estate of Helvenston, Estate of Teague, Estate of Zovko, Estate of Batalona by Daniel J. Callahan, Brian J. McCormack, and Marc P. Miles (dr)
February 3, 2005 Filing 11
Response by Justin L. McQuown to [3-1] motion to dissolve ex parte state court orders permitting notice of deposition. 1c: to Cheif Judge Flanagan. (dr)
February 1, 2005 Filing 9
Memorandum by Justin L. McQuown in support of [8-1] motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P. (dr)
January 31, 2005 Filing 6
Memorandum by Blackwater Security, Blackwater Lodge & T in support of [5-1] motion to dismiss to Rule 12(b)(6) & 9(b) of the F.R.C.P. w/attachments. (dr)
January 26, 2005 Filing 4
Memorandum by Blackwater Security, Blackwater Lodge & T, Justin L. McQuown, Thomas Powell in support of [3-1] to dissolve ex parte state court orders permitting notice of deposition. (dr)
January 24, 2005 Filing 2
Notice of attorney appearance for Blackwater Security, Blackwater Lodge & Training by Fred Fielding, Barbara Van Gelder, Margaret A. Ryan and Scott M. McCaleb of Washington, DC. (ll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordan, et al v. Blackwater Security, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Nordan
Represented By: David F. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Stephen S. Helvenston
Represented By: David F. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Mike R. Teague
Represented By: David F. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jerko Gerald Zovko
Represented By: David F. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Wesley J.K. Batalona
Represented By: David F. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackwater Security Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackwater Lodge & Training Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin L. McQuown
Represented By: Patricia L. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?