Board of Law Examiners v. West Publishing Corporation et al Featured Case

North Carolina Board of Law Examiners alleges that BAR/BRI, owned by West Publishing Corp. and The Thomson Corp., engaged in wholesale copying and distribution of copyrighted questions that have appeared on North Carolina bar examinations.

Plaintiff: Board of Law Examiners
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation and The Thomson Corporation
Amicus: NC Press Association, Inc., NC Press Foundation, Inc., NC Open Gov't Coalition, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv00210
Filed: June 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2008 Filing 29
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Board of Law Examiners (Olive, Susan)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28
ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before February 20, 2008. Counsel served by NEF. Signed by Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 1/24/2008. (Deputy Clerk - DH, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26
ORDER AS TO SETTLEMENT - Parties Stipulation of dismissal is due by January 21, 2008. Counsel served by NEF. Signed by Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 12/10/2007. (Deputy Clerk - DH, )
December 6, 2007 Filing 25
NOTICE by Board of Law Examiners, West Publishing Corporation, The Thomson Corporation of Anticipated Dismissal and Request for Stay (Olive, Susan)
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Counsel served electronically. Signed by Judge David W. Daniel on 10/25/2007. (Deputy Clerk - DH, )
October 23, 2007 Filing 22
RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae and Request for Time to Respond Substantively if Motion to File Brief is Granted filed by Board of Law Examiners. (Olive, Susan)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due by 11/1/2007. Counsel served electronically. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 10/16/2007. (Deputy Clerk - DH, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 10/4/2007. cys served electronically. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 8/28/2007. (Deputy Clerk - DH, )
August 10, 2007 Filing 13
Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by West Publishing Corporation, The Thomson Corporation. (Morrow, John)
July 26, 2007 Filing 11
NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Morrow, Jr on behalf of West Publishing Corporation, The Thomson Corporation (Morrow, John)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint West Publishing Corporation answer due 8/10/2007; The Thomson Corporation answer due 8/10/2007.. Signed by Clerk of Court on 7/5/07. (Deputy Clerk - BRB, )
June 14, 2007 Filing 6
Summons Issued as to West Publishing Corporation. (Deputy Clerk - BRB, )
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. Judge James C. Dever, III no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings should reflect the revised case number 5:07-cv-210-BO. Signed by Clerk of Court on 6/12/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
June 8, 2007 Filing 3
FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Board of Law Examiners. (Olive, Susan)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Law Examiners v. West Publishing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Law Examiners
Represented By: Susan Freya Olive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Represented By: John F. Morrow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Thomson Corporation
Represented By: John F. Morrow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NC Press Association, Inc., NC Press Foundation, Inc., NC Open Gov't Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?