Lulu Enterprises, Inc. v. N-F Newsite, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Lulu Enterprises, Inc. complains that defendants' HULU mark and domain name unfairly trade upon the goodwill that Lulu has established in its LULU name and marks.

Plaintiff: Lulu Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: N-F Newsite, LLC and Hulu Tech, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv00347
Filed: September 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2007 Filing 123 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC. (O'Toole, Leslie)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SCHEDULING ORDER: The court has considered the Discovery Plan filed by the parties on December 10, 2007. Except as modified, the Discovery Plan is APPROVED AND ORDERED. All discovery shall be completed by September 1, 2008, and all potentially dispositive motions shall be filed by October 1, 2008. Signed by Judge James C. Dever, III on 12/20/2007. Counsel should review the Scheduling Order for additional critical deadlines. (Deputy Clerk - JRH )
December 10, 2007 Filing 121 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC. (Segars, Thomas)
October 24, 2007 Filing 120 REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. The Rule 26(f) planning meeting must occur by November 25, 2007. Within fourteen days after the meeting, the discovery plan must be submitted to the Court and mandatory initial disclosures must be made. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Seal Document. Upon consideration of the record and the parties' positions and pursuant to the provisions of Local Civil Rule 79.2, EDNC, it is ordered that Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction be sealed.Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 10/23/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
October 22, 2007 Filing 118 Memorandum in Support re 117 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
October 22, 2007 Filing 117 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Declaration of Hal Poret; denying 107 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Survey and Focus Group Declarations; granting 109 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Declaration of Kent Van Liere; and denying 111 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Survey and Expert Testimony under Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharm. Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993). The Court has also considered Plaintiff's objections to Defendant's alleged withholding of information and assertions of attorney-client privilege, and Plaintiff's objections are overruled. Signed by Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/19/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
October 16, 2007 Filing 115 Minute Entry for Motions Hearing held before Judge Terrence W. Boyle on October 16, 2007. The Court shall prepare a written order.(Court Reporter: Donna Tomawski) (Deputy Clerk: Julie Richards Hurley) (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
October 15, 2007 Filing 114 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC of Filing Marti Declaration Exhibits 5, 7, 8, and 10 (Silver, Hayden)
October 15, 2007 Filing 113 Declaration re 111 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Surveys and Expert Testimony Under Daubert by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
October 15, 2007 Filing 112 Memorandum in Support re 111 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Surveys and Expert Testimony Under Daubert filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Cases) (Silver, Hayden)
October 15, 2007 Filing 111 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Surveys and Expert Testimony Under Daubert by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
October 15, 2007 Filing 110 Memorandum in Opposition re 109 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Kent Van Liere in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
October 12, 2007 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Kent Van Liere in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Segars, Thomas)
October 12, 2007 Filing 108 Memorandum in Support re 107 MOTION in Limine filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4) (Silver, Hayden)
October 12, 2007 Filing 107 MOTION in Limine by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
October 11, 2007 Filing 106 Declaration re 100 Reply to Response to Motion by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
October 11, 2007 Filing 105 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 100 Reply to Response to Motion Appendix A, Parts 14, 15, 16, 17 and 18 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A- Part15 of 18# 2 Appendix A - Part 16 of 18# 3 Appendix A - Part 17 of 18# 4 Appendix A - Part 18 of 18) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 11, 2007 Filing 104 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 100 Reply to Response to Motion Appendix B (Silver, Hayden)
October 11, 2007 Filing 103 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 100 Reply to Response to Motion Appendix A Parts 10, 11, 12, 13 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Part 11 of 18# 2 Appendix A - Part 12 of 18# 3 Appendix A - Part 13 of 18) (Silver, Hayden)
October 11, 2007 Filing 102 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 100 Reply to Response to Motion Appendix A Parts 6, 7, 8, 9 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Part 7 of 18# 2 Appendix A - Part 8 of 18# 3 Appendix A - Part 9 of 18) (Silver, Hayden)
October 11, 2007 Filing 101 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 100 Reply to Response to Motion Appendix A - Parts 2, 3, 4, 5 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Part 3 of 18# 2 Appendix A - Part 4 of 18# 3 Appendix A - Part 5 of 18) (Silver, Hayden)
October 11, 2007 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Part 1 of 18) (Silver, Hayden)
October 11, 2007 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lulu Enterprises, Inc. re 96 Reply to Response to Motion (Amended) (Segars, Thomas)
October 11, 2007 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Hal L. Poret in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit A (2 of 2)# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Text of Proposed Order) (Segars, Thomas)
October 11, 2007 Filing 97 NOTICE by Lulu Enterprises, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing (Segars, Thomas)
October 11, 2007 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Segars, Thomas)
October 9, 2007 Filing 95 SEALED Document: Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Lulu Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction, including Exhibits A through BB. (Leslie C. O'Toole). (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
October 9, 2007 Filing 94 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Part 33-34 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-34) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 93 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 29-32 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-30# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-31# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-32) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 92 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) E, F, G, and H (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit E-2# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit F# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit G# 4 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit H) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 91 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 25-28 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-26# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-27# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-28) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 21-24 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-22# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-23# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-24) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 89 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 17-20 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-18# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-19# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-20) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 88 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 13-16 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-14# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-15# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-16) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 87 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 85 Memorandum in Opposition, Appendix A (Exhibits 8 and 9) and Appendix B (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Exhibit 8 of 9# 2 Appendix A - Exhibit 9-1 of 9# 3 Appendix A - Exhibit 9-2 of 9# 4 Appendix B) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 86 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 9-12 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-10# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-11# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-12) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 85 Memorandum in Opposition re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Exhibit 1 of 9# 2 Appendix A - Exhibit 2# 3 Appendix A- Exhibit 3 of 9# 4 Appendix A - Exhibit 4 of 9# 5 Appendix A - Exhibit 5 of 9# 6 Appendix A - Exhibit 6 of 9) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 84 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 5-8 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-6# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-7# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-8) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 83 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) D Parts 1-4 of 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-2# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-3# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit D-4) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 82 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) C (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 81 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) B Parts 15-18 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-16# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-17# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-18) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 80 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) B Parts 11-14 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-12# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-13# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-14) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 79 Declaration re 41 Notice-(other) Jason Kilar by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 78 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) B Parts 6-10 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-7# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-8# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-9# 4 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-10) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) B Parts 1-5 of 18 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-2# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-3# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-4# 4 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit B-5) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 76 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 75 Declaration Exhibits (Sullins) A (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit A-2# 2 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit A-3# 3 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit A-4# 4 Exhibit Sullins Exhibit A-5) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 75 Declaration re 41 Notice-(other) of Lauren L. Sullins by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 74 Declaration re 41 Notice-(other) of Erich Joachimsthaler with Exhibits A-B by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 73 NOTICE by Lulu Enterprises, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing (O'Toole, Leslie)
October 9, 2007 Filing 72 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 73-74 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 74) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 71 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 69-72 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 69-2# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 70# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 71# 4 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 72) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 70 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 65-68 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 66# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 67# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 68-1# 4 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 68-2) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 69 Memorandum in Support re 68 MOTION to Seal Document 56 Notice-(other) filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 68 MOTION to Seal Document 56 Notice-(other) by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 67 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 61-64 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 62# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 63# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 64-1# 4 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 64-2) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 66 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 57-60 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 58# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 59# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 60) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 65 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 53-56 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 54# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 55# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 56) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 64 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 49-52 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 50# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 51# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 52) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 63 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 45-48 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 46# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 47-1# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 47-2# 4 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 48) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 62 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 41-44 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 42# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 43# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 44) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 61 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 37-40 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 38# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 39# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 40) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 60 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 33-36 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 34# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 35# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 36) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 59 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 29-32 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 30# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 31# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 32) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 58 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 25-28 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 26# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 27# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 28) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 21-24 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 22# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 23# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 24) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 56 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 41 Notice-(other) Notice of Manual Filing - Supplemental Confidential Declaration of Jason Kilar (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 55 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 17-20 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 18# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 19# 3 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 20) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 54 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibit (Marti) 66 -- Notice of Manual Filing (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 53 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 13-16 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti 14# 2 Exhibit Marti 15# 3 Exhibit Marti 16) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 52 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 42 Declaration Exhibits (Ford) Parts 26-29 of 29 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 27 of 29# 2 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 28 of 29# 3 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 29 of 29) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 42 Declaration Exhibits (Ford) Parts 21-25 of 29 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 22 of 29# 2 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 23 of 29# 3 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 24 of 29# 4 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 25 of 29) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 50 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 9-12 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti 10# 2 Exhibit Marti 11# 3 Exhibit Marti 12) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 49 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 42 Declaration Exhibits (Ford) Parts 16-20 of 29 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 17 of 29# 2 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 18 of 29# 3 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 19 of 29# 4 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 20 of 29) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 48 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 5-8 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti 6# 2 Exhibit Marti 7# 3 Exhibit Marti 8) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 47 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 42 Declaration Exhibits (Ford) Parts 11-15 of 29 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 12 of 29# 2 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 13 of 29# 3 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 14 of 29# 4 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 15 of 29) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 46 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 44 Declaration Exhibits (Marti) 1-4 of 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 2# 2 Exhibit Marti Exhibit 3# 3 Exhibit Marti 4) (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 45 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 42 Declaration Exhibits (Ford) Parts 6-10 of 29 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 7 of 29# 2 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 8 of 29# 3 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 9 of 29# 4 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 10 of 29) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 44 Declaration re 41 Notice-(other) Daniel H. Marti by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Cooke, Betsy)
October 9, 2007 Filing 43 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC re 42 Declaration Exhibits (Ford) Parts 1-5 of 29 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 2 of 29# 2 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 3 of 29# 3 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 4 of 29# 4 Exhibit Ford Exhibits Part 5 of 29) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 42 Declaration re 41 Notice-(other) of Gerald Ford by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ford Declaration Part 2 of 3# 2 Ford Declaration Part 3 of 3) (Silver, Hayden)
October 9, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC of Filing Documents in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Silver, Hayden)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CONSENT ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Plaintiff and Defendant shall each be allowed to file a memorandum of law in support or in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction not to exceed forty pages in length, excluding the certificate of service page. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 10/4/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
October 3, 2007 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Memoranda in Support and in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
October 1, 2007 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER regarding 36 the Joint Motion for Entry of a Consent Protective Order: The court APPROVES and ADOPTS the proposed consent protective order, but strikes paragraph 9 of that order. Paragraph 9 shall read as directed by the Court in the text of the Order. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 9/28/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 26, 2007 Motion Submitted: 36 Joint MOTION for Protective Order SUBMITTED to Chambers. Courtesy copies provided. (Deputy Clerk - JRH )
September 25, 2007 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
September 21, 2007 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery, Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery and Affidavit of Robert Young served on N-F Newsite, LLC on September 12, 2007, filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Segars, Thomas)
September 21, 2007 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on N-F Newsite, LLC on September 10, 2007, filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Segars, Thomas)
September 18, 2007 Filing 33 NOTICE by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC re 32 Notice-(other) Notice of Filing Exhibits to Joint Plan for Expedited Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Discovery Requests# 2 Exhibit Defendant's Discovery Requests) (Silver, Hayden)
September 18, 2007 Filing 32 NOTICE by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC Joint Plan for Expedited Discovery (Silver, Hayden)
September 14, 2007 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction: The hearing will take place before Judge James C. Dever III on Tuesday, October 16, 2007, beginning at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1 - 7th Floor, Terry G. Sanford Federal Building, Raleigh, NC. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Modify Court's Order. It is ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Modify Order is GRANTED; the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is CANCELLED and all deadlines set forth in the Court's Order of 9/12/2007 are VACATED. All discovery necessary for determination of the motion will be completed no later than 10/5/2007. The parties will submit to the Court a motion-related discovery plan no later than 9/18/2007. Each party will serve its primary brief on the motion no later than 10/9/2007. Reply briefs may be served by 10/11/2007. The Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 10/16/2007 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 9/14/2007. PLEASE REVIEW ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 21 Defendant N-F Newsite, LLC's 21 Motion to Seal Document. It is ORDERED that pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 79.2, the Confidential Disclosure be sealed. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 9/14/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Betsy Cooke and Hayden J. Silver, III terminated as counsel for Hulu Tech, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 9/14/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 14, 2007 Filing 27 NOTICE by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC re 26 Joint MOTION to Set Aside 16 Order,, Notice of Filing Proposed Order (Silver, Hayden)
September 13, 2007 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Set Aside 16 Order,, by Lulu Enterprises, Inc., N-F Newsite, LLC. (Silver, Hayden)
September 13, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE by N-F Newsite, LLC of Manual Filing (Silver, Hayden)
September 13, 2007 Filing 24 Proposed Order re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Segars, Thomas)
September 13, 2007 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Appendix) (Silver, Hayden)
September 13, 2007 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hulu Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
September 13, 2007 Filing 21 MOTION to Seal Document by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silver, Hayden)
September 13, 2007 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district counsel Sara Maurer Filed by local counsel Hayden J. Silver, III on behalf of N-F Newsite, LLC (Silver, Hayden)
September 13, 2007 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district counsel William H. Brewster Filed by local counsel Hayden J. Silver, III on behalf of N-F Newsite, LLC (Silver, Hayden)
September 12, 2007 Filing 18 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N-F Newsite, LLC. (Cooke, Betsy)
September 12, 2007 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: The hearing on the plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order will take place on 9/19/2007, beginning at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 1 - 7th Floor, Terry G. Sanford Federal Building, Raleigh, NC. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendants shall file a response to plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery not later than 5:00 p.m. on September 13, 2007. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed temporary restraining order not later than 5:00 p.m. on September 13, 2007. Defendants may file a response in opposition to plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order not later than 5:00 p.m. on September 14, 2007. Plaintiff may file a reply not later than noon on September 17, 2007. The court will hold a hearing on the plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order on September 19, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 9/12/2007. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 11, 2007 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Cooke on behalf of N-F Newsite, LLC, Hulu Tech, Inc. (Cooke, Betsy)
September 11, 2007 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayden J. Silver, III on behalf of N-F Newsite, LLC, Hulu Tech, Inc. (Silver, Hayden)
September 10, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE by Lulu Enterprises, Inc. re 7 Memorandum in Support, 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 9 Memorandum in Support, 10 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery, 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 11 Memorandum in Support, 12 Affidavit Notice of Mailing (Segars, Thomas)
September 10, 2007 Motion Submitted: 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order SUBMITTED to Chambers. Courtesy copies of complaint, motion for TRO 6 , Memorandum 7 , and other relevant pleadings provided. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 10, 2007 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 10 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery, 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Robert Young by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 10, 2007 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re 10 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 10, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4) (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 10, 2007 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 10, 2007 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 10, 2007 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 10, 2007 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 7, 2007 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to N-F Newsite, LLC.. Counsel should print summons for service of process. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 7, 2007 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hulu Tech, Inc.. Counsel should print summons for service of process. (Deputy Clerk - JRH)
September 5, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Hamilton Segars on behalf of Lulu Enterprises, Inc. (Segars, Thomas)
September 5, 2007 Filing 2 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lulu Enterprises, Inc... (O'Toole, Leslie)
September 5, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 430448.), filed by Lulu Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Summons to N-F Newsite, Inc.# 3 Summons to Hulu Tech, Inc.# 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Exhibit I) (O'Toole, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lulu Enterprises, Inc. v. N-F Newsite, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lulu Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Hamilton Segars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N-F Newsite, LLC
Represented By: Hayden J. Silver, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hulu Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?