Lord Corporation v. Hultec S&B Technical Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lord Corporation
Defendant: Hultec S&B Technical Products, Inc., Hultec Terramix S.A. and Mark A. Weih
Case Number: 5:2009cv00205
Filed: May 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER granting 670 Motion to Seal. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/14/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER granting 600 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 3/22/2012. (Marsh, K)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER granting 507 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 3/15/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting 447 Motion to Seal Document and granting 450 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/19/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER denying 445 Defendants' Motion to Exclude opinions and testimony of plaintiff's expert Charles A. Daniels. Signed by US District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/12/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER denying #467 Expedited Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 3/31/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER denying 395 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 2/16/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting 337 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 2/15/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER denying 393 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 1/28/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER: The court overrules the objections and adopts the Memorandum and Recommendation [D.E. 345]. Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) motion [D.E. 227] is GRANTED and defendants' motion for partial summary judgment [D.E. 190] is DENIED without prejudice. In due course, the court will address the second motion for partial summmy judgment [D.E. 346]. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 1/25/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lord Corporation v. Hultec S&B Technical Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Corporation
Represented By: Hayden J. Silver, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hultec S&B Technical Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hultec Terramix S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Weih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?