SAS Institute Inc. v. World Programming Limited
Plaintiff: SAS Institute Inc.
Defendant: World Programming Limited
Case Number: 5:2010cv00025
Filed: January 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 935 Appeal Remark - Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed in the US Supreme Court on 9/4/2020. (Foell, S.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 934 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 20)) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 27, 2020 Remark - Writ of Execution and Notice of Right to Have Exemptions Designated forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 form. (Collins, S.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 933 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #932 Writ of Execution Issued (USM-285). (Millen, Pressly)
August 21, 2020 SECOND Notice to Counsel regarding: #932 Writ of Execution Issued. Counsel shall prepare the USM-285 form and file using the event Notice-Other. (Collins, S.)
August 5, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #932 Writ of Execution Issued. Counsel shall prepare the USM-285 form and file using the event Notice-Other. (Collins, S.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 932 Writ of Execution Issued by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/5/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Rights to Have Exemptions Designated and Notice to Claim Exempt Property) (Collins, S.)
August 5, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #931 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution by SAS Institute Inc. (Collins, S.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 931 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Execution) (Millen, Pressly)
August 3, 2020 Filing 930 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
July 1, 2020 Filing 929 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 18)) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
June 1, 2020 Filing 928 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 17) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
May 1, 2020 Filing 927 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 16) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
April 24, 2020 Filing 926 MANDATE of US Court of Appeals as to #879 , #885 Notice of Appeal. (Foell, S.)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER of US Court of Appeals denying motion to stay mandate as to #879 , #885 Notice of Appeal. (Foell, S.)
April 14, 2020 Filing 924 Stay of Mandate regarding #879 , #885 Notice of Appeal. (Foell, S.)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited, #885 Notice of Appeal filed by World Programming Limited. The court denies the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. (Foell, S.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 922 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 15) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
March 27, 2020 Filing 921 Stay of Mandate regarding #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #885 Notice of Appeal. (Foell, S.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 920 US Court of Appeals Judgment as to #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited, #885 Notice of Appeal filed by World Programming Limited. (Foell, S.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 919 Published Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals regarding #879 , #885 Notice of Appeal. Affirmed. (Foell, S.) Modified on 3/12/2020 (Foell, S.).
March 2, 2020 Filing 918 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Partial Satisfaction - No. 14) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
February 21, 2020 Filing 917 Notice of Change of Address filed by Jeffrey A. Lamken filed by on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2020 Filing 916 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 13) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 915 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER TO AID TEXAS ACTION granting #914 Consent Motion for Protective Order for Texas Action. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/13/2020. (Collins, S.)
January 13, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #914 Consent MOTION for Protective Order for Texas Action. (Collins, S.)
January 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #914 Consent Motion for Protective Order for Texas action. All proposed protective orders submitted to the court must contain the language in Section V.G.1(a)(i) through (iv) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual with respect to the filing of sealed material. Filers should also review the judges practice preferences for additional requirements as well as the Case Management Order entered in this action. See Local Civil Rule 7.1(b)(3)and Section I (3) and (4) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel must file a corrected proposed order inserting the language accordingly. (Collins, S.)
January 13, 2020 Filing 914 Consent MOTION for Protective Order for Texas Action filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order to Aid Texas Action, #2 Exhibit A - Texas Protective Order) (Millen, Pressly)
January 2, 2020 Filing 913 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Notice of Partial Satisfaction - No. 12) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
December 2, 2019 Filing 912 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 11) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
November 1, 2019 Filing 911 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 10) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 3, 2019 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #907 Satisfaction of Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc., #908 Satisfaction of Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc., #909 Satisfaction of Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc., #910 Satisfaction of Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Foell, S.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 910 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 9) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 909 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (No. 8)) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 1, 2019 Filing 908 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Notice of Partial Satisfaction - No. 7) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
July 1, 2019 Filing 907 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Partial Satisfaction No. 6) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited. The court grants the motion to stay and denies the motion to expedite oral argument. The court denies the motion to suspend briefing; however, the parties are free to brief and argue fully before the court all issues pertinent to this appeal. Upon consideration of appellants motion to strike, the court denies the motion. (Foell, S.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 905 Notice filed by World Programming Limited regarding #902 SEALED Order . (Lamken, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #902 SEALED Order. Pursuant to the Sealed Order entered on 5/20/19, a response to the same was due by 6/3/19 (See Footnote 1). Counsel has failed to respond. Counsel is directed to now file same or file the appropriate motion showing good cause for failure to comply with the court's directive and need for extension, if applicable. (Collins, S.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 904 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Partial Satisfaction No. 5) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER granting #899 Motion to Seal #897 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #896 PROPOSED SEALED Response. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/24/2019. (Collins, S.)
May 24, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #899 MOTION to Seal #897 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #896 PROPOSED SEALED Response. (Collins, S.)
May 22, 2019 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #902 SEALED Order (Foell, S.)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/20/2019. (Collins, S.) Modified on 6/5/2019 to remove seal from Order pursuant to directive from chambers. (Collins, S.)
May 10, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #894 MOTION to Stay regarding #881 SEALED Order. (Collins, S.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 901 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #894 MOTION to Stay regarding #881 SEALED Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 900 Memorandum in Support regarding #899 MOTION to Seal #897 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #896 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 899 MOTION to Seal #897 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #896 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2019 Filing 898 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #897 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #896 PROPOSED SEALED Response, to World Programming Limited of Provisional Filing Under Seal. (Millen, Pressly)
April 25, 2019 Filing 897 SEALED Declaration (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #896 PROPOSED SEALED Response,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter from Lamken to Millen (Apr. 12, 2019), #2 Exhibit B-Invoice (Apr. 3, 2019)) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/24/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #903 . (Collins, S.).
April 25, 2019 Filing 896 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #894 MOTION to Stay regarding #881 SEALED Order . (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/24/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #903 . (Collins, S.).
April 15, 2019 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #891 Memorandum & Opinion. (Foell, S.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 895 Memorandum in Support regarding #894 MOTION to Stay regarding #881 SEALED Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2019 Filing 894 MOTION to Stay regarding #881 SEALED Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Stay Pending Appeal) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2019 Filing 893 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in Raleigh. Settlement Conference held on 4/3/2019. Counsel for parties present. Settlement discussions continue. At 5:30 p.m. the settlement conference ended. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Horton, B.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 892 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in Raleigh. Settlement Conference held on 4/3/2019. Counsel for parties present. The court makes opening remarks. The parties break for discussions. The court announces a recess in this matter. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Horton, B.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 891 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Redacted version of #881 . Entered by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/1/2019. (Collins, S.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 889 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Partial Satisfaction No. 4) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (19-1290- L) and #885 Notice of Appeal (19-1300). The court consolidates the cases on appeal. (Foell, S.)
March 21, 2019 Filing 887 US Court of Appeals Case Number 19-1300 (Cathy Poulsen, Case Manager) as to #885 Notice of Appeal filed by World Programming Limited. (Foell, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 886 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #885 Notice of Appeal. (Foell, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 885 Notice of Appeal filed by World Programming Limited as to #881 SEALED Order, #882 Judgment. Filing fee, receipt number 0417-4875044. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2019 Filing 884 US Court of Appeals Case Number 19-1290 (Cathy Poulsen, Case Manager) as to #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited. (Foell, S.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 883 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Foell, S.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 882 THIRD AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/18/2019. (Collins, S.)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 881 SEALED ORDER. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/18/2019. (Collins, S.)
March 16, 2019 Filing 880 Notice filed by World Programming Limited regarding #879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, . (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2019 Filing 879 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by World Programming Limited as to #848 Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #846 Order,, #810 Order. Filing fee, receipt number 0417-4870840. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER - Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/12/2019. (Collins, S.)
March 11, 2019 Filing 877 Proposed Order regarding #875 Status Conference, by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2019 Filing 876 Proposed Order regarding Text Order, #875 Status Conference, by SAS Institute Inc.. (Millen, Pressly)
March 8, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: The court after conference with the parties this date NOTICES the availability of United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates for the conduct of court-hosted settlement conference on the proposed dates of March 18 to March 19, 2019, and April 1 to April 3, 2019. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/8/2019. (Erickson, Ian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 875 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/8/2019. Counsel present for all parties. Parties advise the court of status of discussions regarding court hosted settlement conference. Parties directed to file a proposed order memorializing conference by close of business on Monday, 3/11/19. (Collins, S.)
March 8, 2019 **** Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Case manager will provide dial-in instructions to counsel via email to attend this conference. (Collins, S.)
March 6, 2019 Filing 874 SEALED OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/4/2019, before Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy McGurk. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available the court's #website. (McGurk, T.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 873 Memorandum in Support regarding #872 MOTION to Seal #864 PROPOSED SEALED Document,, #853 PROPOSED SEALED Document,,, #854 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 872 MOTION to Seal #864 PROPOSED SEALED Document,, #853 PROPOSED SEALED Document,,, #854 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER taking under advisement Oral motion for modification of injunction. Entered by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/4/2019. (Collins, S.)
March 4, 2019 Oral motion for modification of injunction filed by World Programming Limited. (Collins, S.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 871 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2019 regarding 809 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event by Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc. filed by SAS Institute Inc. Counsel present for all parties - Court hears arguments of counsel updating on status of pending motion - If parties seek to pursue alternative dispute mechanism, parties shall initiate call to case manager within one week with suggestion of three alternative dates and time to convene conference with the court - Defendant makes oral motion seeking modification of current injunction - Order motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Tracy McGurk) (Collins, S.)
March 4, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #866 Notice of Special Appearance. Attorney Megan Church will not receive electronic notifications for this case unless she files her own notice of appearance. See Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #870 Notice. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" or "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five exhibits, the first attached exhibit must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. The clerk corrected the entry in this instance. No further action is needed. In the future, counsel should adhere to this policy. (Collins, S.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 870 Notice filed by World Programming Limited regarding #856 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - Order of the Commercial Court in London, England #2 Exhibit 15 - Letters from counsel for WPL to counsel for SAS Institute) (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/4/2019 to label exhibits. (Collins, S.).
March 4, 2019 Filing 869 Memorandum in Support regarding #868 MOTION to Seal #867 PROPOSED SEALED Document, filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2019 Filing 868 MOTION to Seal #867 PROPOSED SEALED Document, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2019 Filing 867 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #856 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/18/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #861 . (Collins, S.).
March 4, 2019 Filing 866 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jeffrey A. Lamken on behalf of Megan Cunniff Church on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/4/2019 (Collins, S.).
March 4, 2019 Filing 865 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #864 PROPOSED SEALED Document,, (Notice of Provisional Filing Under Seal). (Millen, Pressly)
March 4, 2019 Filing 864 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #854 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 2, 2017 Invoice from World Programming Limited to Customer, #2 Exhibit 2 - March 4, 2018 Invoice from World Programming Limited to Customer, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of World Programming Limiteds active software licenses as of February 25, 2019) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 3/18/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #881 . (Collins, S.).
March 3, 2019 Filing 863 Notice filed by World Programming Limited . (Lamken, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 862 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Partial Satisfaction - No. 3) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
February 28, 2019 Filing 861 Memorandum in Support regarding #860 MOTION to Seal #856 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #859 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #858 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 860 MOTION to Seal #856 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #859 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #858 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 859 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding 857 Declaration. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/18/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #881 . (Collins, S.).
February 28, 2019 Filing 858 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding 857 Declaration. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/18/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #881 . (Collins, S.).
February 28, 2019 Filing 856 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #848 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/18/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #881 . (Collins, S.).
February 28, 2019 Filing 855 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #853 PROPOSED SEALED Document,,, #854 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, (Notice of Provisional Filing Under Seal). (Millen, Pressly)
February 28, 2019 Filing 854 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #848 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 3/18/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #881 . (Collins, S.).
February 28, 2019 Filing 853 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #848 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hewitt Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-Pt. 1 to Hewitt Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1-Pt. 2 to Hewitt Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2-5 to Hewitt Declaration, #5 Exhibit 6 to Hewitt Declaration, #6 Exhibit 7-9 to Hewitt Declaration, #7 Exhibit 10-Pt. 1 to Hewitt Declaration, #8 Exhibit 10-Pt. 2 to Hewitt Declaration, #9 Exhibit 11-13 to Hewitt Declaration, #10 Exhibit 14 to Hewitt Declaration, #11 Exhibit 15 to Hewitt Declaration, #12 Exhibit 16-19 to Hewitt Declaration, #13 Exhibit B - Millen 3rd Declaration, #14 Exhibit C - Boswell Declaration) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 3/18/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #881 . (Collins, S.).
February 22, 2019 Filing 852 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #848 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Accounting) (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/25/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
February 19, 2019 Filing 851 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Partial Satisfaction - No. 2) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
February 18, 2019 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript #850 Transcript,,,. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter or transcriber. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter or transcriber, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (McGurk, T.)
February 18, 2019 Filing 850 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/15/2019, before Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy McGurk, Telephone number 419-392-6626. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website Redaction Request due 3/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2019. (McGurk, T.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 849 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel Batiste Hartzell on behalf of SAS Institute Inc.. (Hartzell, Samuel)
February 15, 2019 Reset Hearing as to 809 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event by Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc. Motion Hearing reset for 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM in New Bern before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Collins, S.)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER denying #791 Motion to Strike; holding in abeyance in part [809-5], granting in part 809 Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event; granting #812 Motion to Seal; finding as moot #814 Motion for prompt dissolution of ex parte injunction; granting #818 Motion to Seal; granting #838 Motion to Seal; granting #842 Motion to Seal. Accounting from judgment debtor due by 2/22/19, payment by judgment debtor to judgment creditor all sums the judgment debtor has received from customers invoiced in the United States from and after 9/5/18 due by 2/22/19. Supplemental briefing on the issues raised by the accounting directed herein due 2/28/19. The court NOTICES renewed hearing on the judgment creditor's motion for relief under the All Writs Act and Rule 60 for 1:30 pm on 3/4/19 in New Bern. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/15/2019. (Collins, S.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 847 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #810 Order (Notice of Filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Witness Statement of Oliver Robinson) (Millen, Pressly)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER regarding #810 Order. This Order supplants the Court's previously entered Order Granting SAS Institute Inc.'s Emergency Motion under the All Writs Act to Preserve This Court's Jurisdiction #810 The Court issues this replacement Order - which follows notice to all parties, full briefing on the three motions listed, and oral argument before this Court - to state the reasons it grants Plaintiff's Emergency Motion under the AH Writs Act to Preserve This Court's Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/15/2019. (Collins, S.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 845 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2019 regarding #814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction regarding #810 Order filed by World Programming Limited. Counsel present for all parties. Renewed hearing on the judgment creditor's motion for relief under the All Writs Act and Rule 60 set for 3/4/19 at 1:30 pm. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Tracy McGurk) (Collins, S.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 844 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #810 Order (Notice of Filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-First Witness Statement of Alexander Victor Carter-Silk, filed 21 March 2018, in the matter of SAS Institute Inc. v. World Programming Ltd. (High Court of Justice (UK)), #2 Exhibit 2-SASs [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Turn Over Order, filed 10 October 2018, in the matter of SAS Institute Inc. v. World Programming Ltd., No. 2:18-cv-00603-VAP-PJW (U.S.D.C., C.D. Cal.), #3 Exhibit 3-Order Denying in Part and Granting in Part Motion for Reconsideration, or, in the Alternative, for an Indicative Ruling, filed 14 November 2018, in the matter of SAS Institute Inc. v. World Programming Ltd., No. 2:18-cv-00603-VAP-PJW (U.S.D.C., C.D. Cal.), #4 Exhibit 4-Press Release, dated 17 December 2018, titled Brown Rudnick Clinches Landmark Cross Jurisdictional Ruling in SAS Institute Copyright Dispute for UK Software Company, World Programming Limited", #5 Exhibit 5-First Witness Statement of Joel S. Miliband, filed 18 December 2018, in the matter of SAS Institute Inc. v. World Programming Ltd. (High Court of Justice (UK))) (Millen, Pressly)
February 11, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #812 MOTION to Seal #811 Notice - other Motion of World Programming Limited to File Under Seal SAS Institute Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion. (Collins, S.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 843 Memorandum in Support regarding #842 MOTION to Seal #826 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #827 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration,,,,,,,,, filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 842 MOTION to Seal #826 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #827 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER granting #840 Motion for Extension of Time To File Notice of Appeal. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/8/2019. (Collins, S.)
February 8, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding 809 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event by Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., #840 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Notice of Appeal, #814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction regarding #810 Order. (Collins, S.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 840 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Notice of Appeal filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 839 Memorandum in Support regarding #838 MOTION to Seal #833 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #835 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #836 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #837 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 838 MOTION to Seal #833 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #835 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #836 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #837 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 837 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #834 Declaration,. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
February 6, 2019 Filing 836 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #834 Declaration,. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
February 6, 2019 Filing 835 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #834 Declaration,. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
February 6, 2019 Filing 834 Declaration regarding #833 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, of James A. Barta by World Programming Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 833 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by Jeffrey A. Lamken (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction regarding #810 Order , #826 PROPOSED SEALED Reply,. (Lamken, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
February 4, 2019 Filing 832 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by James A. Barta on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Barta, James)
February 4, 2019 Filing 831 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jeffrey A. Lamken on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER granting #829 Motion to Amend #787 Stipulated Protective Order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/4/2019. (Collins, S.)
February 4, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #829 Consent MOTION to Amend #787 Protective Order. (Collins, S.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 829 Consent MOTION to Amend #787 Protective Order filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
February 1, 2019 Filing 828 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #826 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #827 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration,to World Programming Limited of Provisional Filing Under Seal. (Millen, Pressly)
February 1, 2019 Filing 827 SEALED Declaration (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #826 PROPOSED SEALED Reply,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F1 Letter of P. Millen to W. Dennison, counsel to WPL, dated 29 January 2019, #2 Exhibit F2 Letter of J. Lamken, counsel to WPL, to P. Millen, dated 30 January 2019, #3 Exhibit G Civil Docket Sheet for Case #: 2:18-cv-00603-VAP-PJW, SAS Inst. Inc. v. World Programming Ltd., (U.S.D.C., C.D. Cal.), #4 Exhibit H Email dated 21 September 2018, #5 Exhibit I dated 24 September 2018, #6 Exhibit J Email dated 26 September 2018, #7 Exhibit K Letter dated 25 September 2018 (and received on 29 September 2018), #8 Exhibit L Email dated 1 October 2018, #9 Exhibit M Letter from A. Carter-Silk, counsel to WPL, to P. Millen, dated 4 October 2018, #10 Exhibit N Letter from A. Carter-Silk, counsel to WPL, to P. Millen, dated 9 October 2018, attaching text of WPL standard notices to customers, #11 Exhibit O1 Letter from P. Millen to W. Dennsion, counsel to WPL, dated 30 October 2018, #12 Exhibit O2 Letter from P. Millen to W. Dennsion, counsel to WPL, dated 26 November 2018, #13 Exhibit O3 Letter from P. Millen to W. Dennsion, counsel to WPL, dated 12 December 2018, #14 Exhibit O4 Letter from P. Millen to W. Dennsion, counsel to WPL, dated 20 December 2018, #15 Exhibit P Letter from W. Dennison to P. Millen, dated 28 December 2018, #16 Exhibit Q WPLs Amended Defence and Counterclaim in SAS Inst. Inc. v. World Programming Ltd., No. CL-2017-000749 (UK High Court) (redline in original), dated 13 September 2018, #17 Exhibit R Second Witness Statement of A. Carter-Silk in SAS Inst. Inc. v. World Programming Ltd., No. CL-2017-000749 (UK High Court), dated 19 December 2018, #18 Exhibit S Fourth Witness Statement of A. Carter-Silk in SAS Inst. Inc. v. World Programming Ltd., No. CL-2017-000749 (UK High Court), dated 14 January 2019, #19 Exhibit T WPLs Revised Skeleton Argument For Anti-Suit Injunction (Without Notice), in SAS Inst. Inc. v. World Programming Ltd., No. CL-2017-000749 (UK High Court), dated 19 December 2018, #20 Exhibit U WPLs Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Post-Judgment Interrogatories (excerpts), dated 2 April 2018) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 2/4/2019 (Collins, S.). Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
February 1, 2019 Filing 826 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction regarding #810 Order , #810 Order. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 2/1/2019 to create docket entry relationship to 809 . (Collins, S.). Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
January 28, 2019 Set Hearing as to 809 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event by Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., #814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction regarding #810 Order. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2019 at 9:30 AM in New Bern - Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction. The judgment creditor is DIRECTED to file response to the instant motion on or before February 1, 2019, in conjunction with any reply in support of its motion 809 for relief under the All Writs Act and Rule 60. Any reply by the judgment debtor to response to its motion #814 must be filed by February 6, 2019. Hearing on said motions is set for February 15, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. at New Bern. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/28/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER granting #807 Motion to Seal #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/28/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER granting #805 Motion to Seal #804 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A to Declaration of Rebecca M. Lecaroz. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/28/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 823 SEALED REPLY Redacted regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 822 ORDER granting #801 MOTION to File Redacted Version of Its Reply #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, in Support of its Motion to Strike SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/28/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 821 Redacted Memorandum in Support regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment. (Filed by case manager pursuant to Order #820 ). (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER granting #793 Motion to Seal #792 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Strike SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/28/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 819 Memorandum in Support regarding #818 MOTION to Seal #815 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #817 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
January 25, 2019 Filing 818 MOTION to Seal #815 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #817 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
January 25, 2019 Filing 817 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #816 Declaration,. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
January 25, 2019 Filing 816 Declaration regarding #815 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, of Wayne F. Dennison by World Programming Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Approved Judgment of the Commercial Court in London, England, #2 Exhibit B - Injunction and Order of the Commercial Court, #3 Exhibit C - Directions Order of the Commercial Court, #4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal) (Dennison, Wayne)
January 25, 2019 Filing 815 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction regarding #810 Order , #811 Notice - other,. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 . (Collins, S.).
January 25, 2019 Filing 814 MOTION Prompt Dissolution of Ex Parte Injunction regarding #810 Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
January 18, 2019 Filing 813 Memorandum in Support regarding #812 MOTION to Seal #811 Notice - other Motion of World Programming Limited to File Under Seal SAS Institute Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
January 18, 2019 Filing 812 MOTION to Seal #811 Notice - other Motion of World Programming Limited to File Under Seal SAS Institute Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
January 14, 2019 Filing 811 SEALED - Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #810 Order Certificate of Service for Motion to File Ex Parte Motions Under Seal. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 1/22/2019 by case manager to provisionally seal pending ruling on motion to seal #812 . (Collins, S.) Modified on 2/11/2019 to create docket entry relationship to 809 . (Collins, S.). Modified on 2/15/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #848 .(Collins, S.).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER GRANTING SAS INSTITUTE INC.'S EMERGENCY MOTION UNDER THE ALL WRITS ACT TO PRESERVE THIS COURT'S JURISDICTION - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/11/2019. (Tripp, S.)
January 7, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #807 MOTION to Seal #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, , #805 MOTION to Seal #804 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A to Declaration of Rebecca M. Lecaroz, #801 MOTION to File Redacted Version of Its Reply #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, in Support of its Motion to Strile SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment. (Collins, S.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 808 Memorandum in Support regarding #807 MOTION to Seal #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 30, 2018 Filing 807 MOTION to Seal #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 30, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply. Counsel should file a motion to seal the document at [DE800] pursuant to Section V.G of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
November 30, 2018 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment , #793 MOTION to Seal #792 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Strike SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment. (Collins, S.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 806 Memorandum in Support regarding #805 MOTION to Seal #804 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A to Declaration of Rebecca M. Lecaroz filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 28, 2018 Filing 805 MOTION to Seal #804 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A to Declaration of Rebecca M. Lecaroz filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 28, 2018 Filing 804 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #803 Declaration. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 1/28/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #824 . (Collins, S.).
November 28, 2018 Filing 803 Declaration regarding #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, of Rebecca M. Lecaroz by World Programming Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Excerpt (Filed Under Seal)) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 28, 2018 Filing 802 Memorandum in Support regarding #801 MOTION to Seal #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, in Support of its Motion to Strile SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Redacted Reply in Support of its Motion to Strile SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 28, 2018 Filing 801 MOTION to File Redacted Version of Its Reply #800 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, in Support of its Motion to Strile SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 11/30/2018 to clarify docket text. (Collins, S.).
November 28, 2018 Filing 800 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment . (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 1/28/2019 to seal pursuant to Orders #822 and #825 . (Collins, S.).
November 14, 2018 Filing 799 Declaration regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment , #798 Memorandum in Opposition (Declaration of Pressly M. Millen) by SAS Institute Inc. filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WPL's Amended Defence and Counterclaim in the English Enforcement Action) (Millen, Pressly)
November 14, 2018 Filing 798 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment (Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment) filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Millen, Pressly)
November 7, 2018 Filing 797 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Mark R. Sigmon on behalf of World Programming Limited substituting for Christopher Graebe. (Sigmon, Mark)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER granting #795 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment. Response due by 11/14/2018. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/7/2018. (Collins, S.)
November 7, 2018 Remark - Clerk received reply email from Wayne Dennison consenting to request for extension of time in #795 . (Collins, S.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 795 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
October 17, 2018 Filing 794 Memorandum in Support regarding #793 MOTION to Seal #792 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Strike SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Redacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike) (Dennison, Wayne)
October 17, 2018 Filing 793 MOTION to Seal #792 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Strike SAS Institute's Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
October 17, 2018 Filing 792 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment . (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 1/28/2019 to seal pursuant to Order #820 . (Collins, S.).
October 17, 2018 Filing 791 MOTION to Strike #790 Satisfaction of Judgment filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
October 5, 2018 Filing 790 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of SAS Institute Inc. Against World Programming Limited (Partial Satisfaction) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 2, 2018 Filing 789 Appeal Remark: Petition for Writ of Certiorari denied by the US Supreme Court. (Foell, S.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 788 Notice filed by World Programming Limited Required Notice of Order. (Attachments: #1 Order from the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California) (Dennison, Wayne)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 787 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR UK ENFORCEMENT ACTION. Counsel is instructed to read the order in its entirety. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/14/2018.
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER denying the emergency motion to stay, including motion for immediate administrative stay. Please read the order in its entirety. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/13/2018. (Moore, P.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 785 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order for UK Enforcement Action filed by World Programming Limited. (Sigmon, Mark)
September 11, 2018 Filing 784 Memorandum in Support regarding #783 Emergency MOTION to Stay Non-U.S. Execution of the Judgment Pending the U.K. Judgment-Recognition Proceedings filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
September 11, 2018 Filing 783 Emergency MOTION to Stay Non-U.S. Execution of the Judgment Pending the U.K. Judgment-Recognition Proceedings filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Enter an Immediate Administrative Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Stay the non-U.S. Execution of this Courts Amended Judgment) (Dennison, Wayne)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - Plaintiff's #755 Motion to Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order, and plaintiff's #771 Motion to Modify Protective Order each are granted in part and denied in part as moot, without prejudice to renew. Plaintiff's motions are granted in that part pertaining to court documents filed under seal in the court file, subject to entry of an agreed-upon protective order, with defendant reserving the right to notice objections thereto within seven days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's motions are denied as moot as to that part pertaining to documents in discovery. Defendant's #761 Motion to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant's motion is granted in that part pertaining to documents in discovery and denied in that part pertaining to court documents filed under seal in the court file, without prejudice to renewal of issues raised. The parties are directed to confer and file a proposed consent protective order or an addendum to the existing one within seven days. Entered in open court by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/6/2018. (Castania, M)
September 6, 2018 Filing 782 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2018 in the New Bern Courtroom regarding #755 MOTION to Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by SAS Institute Inc.; #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by World Programming Limited; #771 MOTION to Modify Protective Order filed by SAS Institute Inc. Representative for plaintiff and defendant present with respective counsel. The court grants in part and denies in part as moot, without prejudice to renew, plaintiff's Motion to Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order; grants in part and denies in part, without prejudice to renew, defendant's Motion to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order; and grants in part and denies in part as moot, without prejudice to renew, plaintiff's motion to modify protective order. The parties are directed to confer and file a proposed consent protective order or an addendum to the existing one within seven days. (Court Reporter Tracy McGurk) (Castania, M)
September 4, 2018 Filing 781 Declaration regarding #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order (Declaration of Claire Blewett in Response to Declaration of Christopher John Charlton) by World Programming Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 6.29.18 Ltr. to Macfarlanes LLP from Brown Rudnick LLP, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 6.29.18 Ltr. from Macfarlanes LLP to Brown Rudnick LLP) (Sigmon, Mark)
August 30, 2018 Filing 780 Declaration regarding #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order (Declaration of Christopher John Carlton in Response to Declaration of Claire Blewett) by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6.29.18 Ltr. to Brown Rudnick LLP from Macfarlanes LLP) (Millen, Pressly)
August 20, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #771 MOTION for Protective Order. (Collins, S.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 779 Declaration regarding #778 Memorandum in Opposition, #771 MOTION for Protective Order Declaration of Claire Blewett in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Protective Order by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
August 17, 2018 Filing 778 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #771 MOTION for Protective Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
August 14, 2018 Reset Hearing as to #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order, #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 at 1:30 PM in New Bern before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER granting #776 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motions Regarding Access Under Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/14/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 776 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions Regarding Access Under Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sigmon, Mark)
August 3, 2018 Set Hearing as to #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order, #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2018 at 1:30 PM in New Bern before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Collins, S.)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding cross-motions to approve and deny access to consultants #755 #761 : The court sets the matter for hearing in New Bern, North Carolina, on August 24, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. In addition, the court construes plaintiff's response #771 as including an alternative motion to modify protective order. The court directs defendant to file a response to plaintiff's alternative motion to modify protective order on or before August 17, 2018. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/3/2018. (Collins, S.)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER granting #773 Motion to Seal #771 PROPOSED SEALED Response. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/9/2018. (Collins, S.)
June 29, 2018 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order, #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order. (Collins, S.)
June 21, 2018 Filing 774 Memorandum in Support regarding #773 MOTION to Seal #771 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
June 21, 2018 Filing 773 MOTION to Seal #771 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
June 14, 2018 Filing 772 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #771 PROPOSED SEALED Response, Notice to World Programming Limited of Provisional Filing Under Seal. (Millen, Pressly)
June 14, 2018 Filing 771 SEALED RESPONSE and Motion to Modify Protective Order (Selected Participants Only)by Press Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application Notice of Alexander Carter-Silk, #2 Exhibit B-Note of Hearing Before Mr. Justice Knowles) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 7/9/2018 to seal pursuant to Order #775 . (Collins, S.). Modified on 8/3/2018 by case manager to change docket event to motion. (Collins, S.).
June 13, 2018 Filing 770 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER granting #765 Motion to Seal Document #757 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #756 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/7/2018. (Collins, S.)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ORDER granting #767 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/30/2018. (Tripp, S.)
May 30, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #767 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order , #755 MOTION Approve Consulta. (Tripp, S.)
May 29, 2018 Filing 767 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order , #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
May 24, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #765 MOTION to Seal Document #757 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #756 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. (Collins, S.)
May 24, 2018 Filing 766 Memorandum in Support regarding #765 MOTION to Seal Document #757 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #756 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit,,, filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
May 24, 2018 Filing 765 MOTION to Seal Document #757 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #756 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit,,, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
May 17, 2018 Filing 764 Declaration regarding #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order of Claire Blewett by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Dated February 28, 2018) (Dennison, Wayne)
May 17, 2018 Filing 763 Declaration regarding #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order of Rebecca M. Lecaroz by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
May 17, 2018 Filing 762 Memorandum in Support regarding #761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
May 17, 2018 Filing 761 MOTION to Deny Access to Matt McCahearty and Christopher Charlton pursuant to Paragraph 13 of the Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Millen to Dennison re Undertakings, #2 Exhibit 2-Letter Dennison to Millen re No Access, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER granting #759 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessie M. Gabriel terminated. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/17/2018. (Collins, S.)
May 17, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #759 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel provided an incomplete signature block. Counsel does not have to refile but should refer to Section IV.D of the CM/ECF Policy Manual for signature block requirements on future pleadings. In addition, pursuant to this notice, counsel Dennis Cohen and Peter Brown should update their contact information. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.)
May 17, 2018 Filing 759 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gabriel, Jessie)
May 17, 2018 Filing 758 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #757 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order , #756 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit,,, to World Programming Limited of Provisional Filing Under Seal. (Millen, Pressly)
May 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: #757 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #756 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. Counsel should file a motion to seal these documents pursuant to Section G of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
May 16, 2018 Filing 757 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order . (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 6/7/2018 to remove word "proposed" pursuant to Order granting seal #769 .(Collins, S.).
May 16, 2018 Filing 756 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WPL Resolution 1.13.16, #2 Exhibit B - Intercompany Sale and License Back 1.13.16, #3 Exhibit C - Email String between K. Marshall and M. Chin 7.26.16, #4 Exhibit D - Dead of Variation 9.12.17, #5 Exhibit E - Meeting Minutes of December 2015 Software Ltd. 10.12.17, #6 Exhibit F - Email String between K. Marshall and J. Noble 12.18.17, #7 Exhibit G - Meeting Minutes of December 2015 Software Ltd. 2.27.18) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 6/7/2018 to remove word "proposed" pursuant to Order granting seal at #769 . (Collins, S.).
May 16, 2018 Filing 755 MOTION Approve Consultants for Access to Discovery Materials Under Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Ltr. from SAS counsel to counsel for WPL 4.13.18, #3 Exhibit 2 - Ltr. from WPL counsel to SAS counsel 4.23.18, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Pressly M. Millen, #5 Exhibit 4 - Signed Undertakings of A. Carter-Silk and C. Blewett 8.14.14) (Millen, Pressly)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER granting #751 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion Regarding Deficiencies In WPLs Post-Judgment Discovery Responses of April 2, 2018 - The time within which SAS may file any motion with respect to deficiencies in the post-judgment discovery responses of WPL of April 2, 2018, in response to the Court's March 2, 2018 Order, is hereby extended up to and including May 16, 2018. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/3/2018. (Tripp, S.)
May 3, 2018 Filing 753 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/3/2018. (Tripp, S.)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER granting #730 Motion to Alter Judgment (Alter, Amend, or Clarify) - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/3/2018. (Tripp, S.)
May 2, 2018 Filing 751 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion Regarding Deficiencies In WPLs Post-Judgment Discovery Responses of April 2, 2018 filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
April 24, 2018 Filing 750 Appeal Remark - A Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed 4/20/2018, in the US Supreme Court. (Foell, S.)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER granting #740 Motion to Seal Document - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/12/2018. (Tripp, S.)
March 12, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #740 MOTION to Seal Document #736 PROPOSED SEALED Document. (Tripp, S.)
March 5, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #730 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Alter, Amend, or Clarify). (Tripp, S.)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #722 Motion to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents - Defendant is DIRECTED to supplement its responses to plaintiff's post-judgment interrogatories and requests for production of documents, on or before April 2, 2018. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/2/2018. (Tripp, S.)
February 28, 2018 Filing 747 Declaration regarding #746 Notice - other, Declaration of Claire Blewett in Support of Notice of SAS Institute Inc.'s Extraterritorial Proceeding by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SAS Institute's Claim Form, #2 Exhibit B - SAS Institute's Particulars of Claim, #3 Exhibit C - WPL's Defence and Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit D - SAS Institute's Reply and Defence to Counterclaim) (Dennison, Wayne)
February 28, 2018 Filing 746 Notice of SAS Institute's Extraterritorial Proceeding filed by World Programming Limited regarding #725 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/28/2018 to clarify docket text. (Tripp, S.).
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER granting #719 Motion for Release of Funds to Direct Payment of Amounts Escrowed - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/21/2018. (Tripp, S.)
February 21, 2018 Filing 744 RESPONSE in Opposition (redacted) regarding #722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited (pursuant to the order at #743 ). (Edwards, S.)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER granting #726 Motion to File Redacted Version of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the foregoing document WITH REDACTIONS. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to send a copy of this Memorandum Order to all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/20/2018. (Edwards, S.)
February 20, 2018 Filing 742 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #719 MOTION for Release of Funds to Direct Payment of Amounts Escrowed, #722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Letter to Judge Flanagan. (Millen, Pressly)
February 15, 2018 Filing 741 Memorandum in Support regarding #740 MOTION to Seal Document #736 PROPOSED SEALED Document, filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
February 15, 2018 Filing 740 MOTION to Seal Document #736 PROPOSED SEALED Document, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
February 8, 2018 Filing 739 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #736 PROPOSED SEALED Document, of Provisional Filing Under Seal. (Millen, Pressly)
February 8, 2018 Filing 738 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #730 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Alter, Amend, or Clarify) filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Millen, Pressly)
February 8, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: #737 Response in Support of Motion. The incorrect event has been selected. Counsel is directed to refile the document using the event Reply to Response to Motion under the category Responses and Replies. (Collins, S.)
February 8, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #736 PROPOSED SEALED Document. Counsel must file the appropriate motion to seal or required notice of provisional sealing in accordance with Section V(G) of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
February 7, 2018 Filing 737 DISREGARD - Corrected and refiled at #738 RESPONSE in Support regarding #730 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Alter, Amend, or Clarify) filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 2/9/2018 (Collins, S.).
February 6, 2018 Filing 736 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #734 Response in Support of Motion, #722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-January 11, 2018 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B-January 29, 2018 Correspondence) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 3/12/2018 to remove 'proposed' from docket text. (Tripp, S.).
January 25, 2018 Filing 735 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #730 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Alter, Amend, or Clarify) filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
January 19, 2018 Filing 734 RESPONSE in Support regarding #722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Millen, Pressly)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER granting #729 Motion for Leave to File reply brief. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file its reply brief as proposed within 5 days of the date of this order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/19/2018. (Collins, S.)
January 16, 2018 Filing 732 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #729 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
January 4, 2018 Filing 731 Memorandum in Support regarding #730 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Alter, Amend, or Clarify) filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-WPL Website Printout Dated 1.4.18) (Millen, Pressly)
January 4, 2018 Filing 730 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Alter, Amend, or Clarify) filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
January 3, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: regarding #719 MOTION for Release of Funds to Direct Payment of Amounts Escrowed. (Collins, S.)
January 2, 2018 Filing 729 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Pressly M. Millen, #2 Exhibit 1 (to Ex. A)-Correspondence Regarding Offer, #3 Exhibit 2 (to Ex. A)-Overview Page from Companies House Website, #4 Exhibit 2A (to Ex. A)-Officers Website Page for Dec. 2015 Software Limited from Companies House, #5 Exhibit 3 (to Ex. A)-Companies House Overview Website Page, #6 Exhibit 4 (to Ex. A)-Companies House Overview Website Page, #7 Exhibit 5 (to Ex. A)-Companies House Overview Website Page, #8 Exhibit 6 (to Ex. A)-Companies House Overview Website Page, #9 Exhibit 7 (to Ex. A)-December 2015 Software Limited Filing History, #10 Exhibit 8 (to Ex. A)-Companies House Officers Listing Website Page, #11 Exhibit 9 (to Ex. A)-Companies House Proposed Officers Website Page, #12 Exhibit 10 (to Ex. A)-D2S Europe Limited's Persons with Significant Control Companies House Website Page, #13 Exhibit B-Proposed Reply Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel) (Millen, Pressly)
December 26, 2017 Filing 728 Declaration regarding #725 PROPOSED SEALED Response, of Wayne F. Dennison by World Programming Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Oliver Robinson in Opposition to SAS Institute Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production) (Dennison, Wayne)
December 26, 2017 Filing 727 Memorandum in Support regarding #726 MOTION to File Redacted Version of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel #725 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Redacted Opposition) (Dennison, Wayne)
December 26, 2017 Filing 726 MOTION to File Redacted Version of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel #725 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
December 26, 2017 Filing 725 PROPOSED SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Dennison, Wayne)
December 11, 2017 Filing 724 Letter from Glass & Goldberg for request for copy of certified judgment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
December 11, 2017 Filing 723 Memorandum in Support regarding #722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 12.5.17 Letter from Brown Rudnick) (Millen, Pressly)
December 11, 2017 Filing 722 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-1: Plaintiff's 1st Post-Judgment Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit A-2: Plaintiff's 1st Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit B-1: WPL's Objections & Responses to Plaintiff's 1st Post-Judgment Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit B-2: WPL's Objections & Responses to Plaintiff's 1st Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents) (Millen, Pressly)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - The court dispenses with requirement for any telephonic conference concerning dispute surrounding post-judgment discovery issues, the subject of prior motion denied 2/9/17 without prejudice, where it is unlikely, without more, that conference will aid in negotiated resolution. Should plaintiff wish to proceed, it shall file the appropriate motion. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/11/2017. (Collins, S.)
December 8, 2017 Filing 721 AMENDED JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/8/2017. (Collins, S.)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER - In accordance with the mandate, judgment, and opinion, of the court of appeals, the court DIRECTS the clerk to enter an amended judgment upon this order, stating as follows: Amended judgment upon mandate, judgment, and opinion of the court of appeals. This action is before the court upon the mandate, judgment, and opinion, of the court of appeals. Upon consideration thereof, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that the court's judgment entered July 15, 2016, is AFFIRMED in all respects, except that the court VACATES as moot the court's ruling granting summary judgment to defendant on plaintiff's claim for copyright infringement of the SAS System, and said claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In all other respects, the terms courts judgment entered July 15, 2016, not modified herein shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/8/2017. (Collins, S.)
December 8, 2017 Filing 719 MOTION for Release of Funds to Direct Payment of Amounts Escrowed filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
December 8, 2017 Filing 718 MANDATE of US Court of Appeals (certified copy) as to #605 Notice of Appeal filed by SAS Institute Inc., #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by SAS Institute Inc., #64 Notice of Appeal, filed by SAS Institute Inc., #614 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited - The judgment of this court, entered October 24, 2017, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Tripp, S.)
December 1, 2017 Filing 717 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. of Change of Firm Name. (Millen, Pressly)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #605 Notice of Appeal filed by SAS Institute Inc., #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by SAS Institute Inc., #614 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited - Upon consideration of submissions relative to the motion to stay mandate, the court denies the motion. (Tripp, S.)
November 29, 2017 Filing 715 Stay of Mandate regarding #605 Notice of Appeal, #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, #614 Notice of Cross Appeal - Under Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(1), the timely filing of a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or the timely filing of a motion to stay the mandate stays the mandate until the court has ruled on the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or motion to stay. In accordance with Rule 41(d)(1), the mandate is stayed pending further order of this court. (Tripp, S.)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #605 Notice of Appeal filed by SAS Institute Inc., #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by SAS Institute Inc., #614 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited - The court denies the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. No judge requested a poll under Fed. R. App. P. 35 on the petition for rehearing en banc. (Tripp, S.)
November 8, 2017 Filing 713 Stay of Mandate regarding #605 Notice of Appeal, #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, #614 Notice of Cross Appeal - Under Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(1), the timely filing of a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or the timely filing of a motion to stay the mandate stays the mandate until the court has ruled on the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or motion to stay. In accordance with Rule 41(d)(1), the mandate is stayed pending further order of this court. (Tripp, S.)
October 24, 2017 Filing 712 US Court of Appeals Judgment as to #605 , #611 , #614 Notice of Appeal. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed in part and vacated in part. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. (Foell, S.)
October 24, 2017 Filing 711 Published Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals. Affirmed in part, and vacated and remanded in part. (Foell, S.)
October 11, 2017 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #710 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds (Foell, S.)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER granting #708 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/10/2017. (Collins, S.)
October 6, 2017 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: regarding #708 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Interest-Bearing Account. (Collins, S.)
October 6, 2017 Filing 709 Proposed Order regarding #708 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Interest-Bearing Account filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
October 5, 2017 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: #708 Motion to Deposit Funds. Pursuant to the presiding judge's practice preferences available on this court's website, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event 'PROPOSED ORDER' located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Collins, S.)
October 5, 2017 Filing 708 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Interest-Bearing Account filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER granting #703 Motion to Seal #702 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/24/2017. (Baker, C.)
March 16, 2017 Filing 706 REDACTED MOTION HEARING TRANSCRIPT regarding #664 . Court Reporter Donna Tomawski. (Thuemmel Proctor, S.)
March 16, 2017 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #703 MOTION to Seal #702 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. (Baker, C.)
March 13, 2017 Filing 705 REDACTED VERSION of #702 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 3/24/2017 to clarify docket entry text and unseal docket entry pursuant to #707 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
March 13, 2017 Filing 704 Memorandum in Support regarding #703 MOTION to Seal Document #702 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
March 13, 2017 Filing 703 MOTION to Seal Document #702 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
March 13, 2017 Filing 702 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #701 Declaration. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 3/24/2017 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #707 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
March 13, 2017 Filing 701 Declaration of Wayne F. Dennison in Compliance with Court Order #696 Regarding Escrow Account and Proof of Bond by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appeal Bond (Filed Under Seal)) (Dennison, Wayne)
February 28, 2017 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding Text Order dated 2/28/17. (Foell, S.)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #696 SEALED Order - In accordance with sealed order entered February 9, 2017 at DE 696, directing the parties to provide the clerk, within fourteen (14) days after entry, a copy of that order and another, entered November 9, 2016 at DE 668, marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Having now received the consented to submission, the court gives its approval and DIRECTS that the redacted copies of the sealed orders be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/28/2017. (Baker, C.)
February 9, 2017 Filing 700 REDACTED ORDER regarding #696 SEALED ORDER - Filed pursuant to directive contained within text order entered on February 28, 2017. (Baker, C.)
February 9, 2017 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #696 SEALED ORDER. (Baker, C.)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 696 SEALED ORDER - The court GRANTS defendant's amended motion for stay pending appeal (DE 670), conditioned on defendant filing within 30 days of the date of this order proof of supersedeas bond and establishment of escrow account, on the terms set forth herein. The court DENIES without prejudice plaintiff's motion to compel (DE 647). The court GRANTS defendant's motions to seal (DE 652, 665, 674). To permit public viewing of redactions of the subject documents, the clerk is DIRECTED to unseal DE 654, 655, 656, 667, 688, and 694. In addition, the clerk is DIRECTED to coordinate with the court reporter filing of a redacted version of DE 664, in accordance with the redaction instructions at DE 689-1. The court dispenses with oral argument because the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before this court and argument would not aid the decisional process. The court's analysis relies, in part, on documents filed under seal. Within 14 days, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/9/2017. (Baker, C.)
December 28, 2016 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #692 MOTION to Seal #691 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #689 MOTION to Redact #664 Appeal Transcript, and #686 MOTION to Seal #684 PROPOSED SEALED Response. (Baker, C.)
December 12, 2016 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #670 PROPOSED SEALED AMENDED MOTION to Stay Execution of Final Judgment, #665 MOTION to Seal Document, #674 MOTION to Seal Document, and #652 MOTION to Seal Document. (Baker, C.)
December 5, 2016 Filing 694 Exhibit by Wayne F. Dennison regarding #693 Memorandum in Support, #692 MOTION to Seal #691 PROPOSED SEALED Reply. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/9/2017 to unseal document and clarify docket entry text pursuant to #696 SEALED ORDER.
December 5, 2016 Filing 693 Memorandum in Support regarding #691 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #692 MOTION to Seal #691 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
December 5, 2016 Filing 692 MOTION to Seal #691 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
December 5, 2016 Filing 691 PROPOSED SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Dennison, Wayne)
December 1, 2016 Filing 690 Memorandum in Support regarding #689 MOTION to Redact #664 Appeal Transcript filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
December 1, 2016 Filing 689 MOTION to Redact #664 Appeal Transcript filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Redactions, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 29, 2016 Filing 688 Exhibit by Wayne F. Dennison regarding #686 MOTION to Seal #684 PROPOSED SEALED Response. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/9/2017 to unseal document and clarify docket entry text pursuant to #696 SEALED ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 29, 2016 Filing 687 Memorandum in Support regarding #686 MOTION to Seal Document #684 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 29, 2016 Filing 686 MOTION to Seal Document #684 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 28, 2016 Filing 685 Declaration regarding #684 PROPOSED SEALED Response, Declaration of Christopher A. Vellturo, PH.D. by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Program Products License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Email and Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Invoice) (Millen, Pressly)
November 28, 2016 Filing 684 PROPOSED SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only)by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Millen, Pressly)
November 15, 2016 Filing 683 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction filed by Wayne F. Dennison regarding #664 Appeal Transcript. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 15, 2016 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #647 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Baker, C.)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER granting #680 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opinion of Sara Masters QC in Support of WPL's Amended Motion to Stay - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/15/2016. (Baker, C.)
November 15, 2016 Filing 681 Declaration regarding #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited), #672 Declaration, Supplemental Declaration by Wayne F. Dennison in Support of WPL's Amended Motion to Stay by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion of Sara Masters QC) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 680 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opinion of Sara Masters QC in Support of WPL's Amended Motion to Stay filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 679 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #674 MOTION to Seal Document #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #673 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant Wor, #675 Memorandum in Support,. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 678 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #674 MOTION to Seal Document #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #673 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant Wor, #675 Memorandum in Support,. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 677 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #674 MOTION to Seal Document #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #673 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant Wor, #675 Memorandum in Support,. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 676 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #674 MOTION to Seal Document #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #673 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant Wor, #675 Memorandum in Support,. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 675 Memorandum in Support regarding #674 MOTION to Seal Document #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #673 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant Wor filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 674 MOTION to Seal Document #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #673 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #670 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 673 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit B regarding #672 Declaration (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 11/15/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 672 Declaration of Wayne F. Dennison regarding #671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #670 PROPOSED SEALED AMENDED MOTION by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Supplemental Declaration of Michael M. Metayer) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 671 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #670 PROPOSED SEALED AMENDED MOTION to Stay Execution of Final Judgment (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Dennison, Wayne)
November 14, 2016 Filing 670 PROPOSED SEALED AMENDED MOTION to Stay Execution of Final Judgment (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting WPL's Amended Motion to Stay) (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 11/15/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 669 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #647 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 9, 2016 Filing 699 REDACTED ORDER regarding #668 SEALED ORDER - Filed pursuant to directive contained within text order entered on February 28, 2017. (Baker, C.)
November 9, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #668 SEALED ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 668 SEALED ORDER granting #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION for Temporary Stay of Execution of Final Judgment Pending Resolution of Amended Motion to Stay - The court GRANTS defendant's emergency motion (DE 649) for temporary stay of execution of final judgment pending filing and resolution of any amended motion to stay pending appeal contemplated by this court's October 24, 2016, order. (The court's analysis relies, in part, on documents filed provisionally under seal. Within 14 days of the court's ruling on defendants motions to seal (DE 652, 665), which are not ripe at this time, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record.) Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
November 8, 2016 Filing 667 Exhibit by Wayne F. Dennison regarding #666 Memorandum in Support. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/9/2017 to unseal document and clarify docket entry text pursuant to #696 SEALED ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 8, 2016 Filing 666 Memorandum in Support regarding #665 MOTION to Seal Document #663 PROPOSED SEALED Response by SAS Institute in Opposition to WPL's Motion for Temporary Stay filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 8, 2016 Filing 665 MOTION to Seal Document #663 PROPOSED SEALED Response by SAS Institute in Opposition to WPL's Motion for Temporary Stay filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 7, 2016 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript #664 Appeal Transcript. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter or transcriber. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter or transcriber, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (Thuemmel Proctor, S.)
November 7, 2016 Filing 664 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING for dates of December 17, 2015, before Senior District Judge David A. Faber, regarding #605 Notice of Appeal, #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, #614 Notice of Cross Appeal. Court Reporter Donna Tomawski. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? - Yes. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website. Redaction Request due 12/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2017. (Thuemmel Proctor, S.)
November 7, 2016 Filing 663 PROPOSED SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only)by SAS (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email) (Millen, Pressly)
November 7, 2016 Filing 662 REDACTION to #629 PROPOSED SEALED Response, in Opposition to Motion to File Under Seal by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
November 4, 2016 Filing 661 REDACTION to #633 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, in Support of Motion to Stay by World Programming Limited (Dennison, Wayne)
November 4, 2016 Filing 660 REDACTION to #625 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit C Declaration of Samuel Manning by World Programming Limited (Dennison, Wayne)
November 4, 2016 Filing 659 REDACTION to #624 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit B Declaration of Michael Metayer by World Programming Limited (Dennison, Wayne)
November 4, 2016 Filing 658 REDACTION to #623 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A - Declaration of John Natt by World Programming Limited (Dennison, Wayne)
November 4, 2016 Filing 657 REDACTION to #621 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Stay by World Programming Limited (Dennison, Wayne)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION for Temporary Stay of Execution of Final Judgment Pending Resolution of Amended Motion to Stay - Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion for temporary stay (DE 649) on or before November 8, 2016. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/2/2016. (Baker, C.)
November 1, 2016 Filing 656 Exhibit regarding #652 MOTION to Seal Document #650 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, #653 Memorandum in Support. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/9/2017 to unseal document and clarify docket entry text pursuant to #696 SEALED ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 1, 2016 Filing 655 Exhibit regarding #652 MOTION to Seal Document #650 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, #653 Memorandum in Support. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/9/2017 to unseal document and clarify docket entry text pursuant to #696 SEALED ORDER. (Baker, C.).
November 1, 2016 Filing 654 Exhibit regarding #652 MOTION to Seal Document #650 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION #653 Memorandum in Support. (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 2/9/2017 to unseal document and clarify docket entry text pursuant to #696 SEALED ORDER. (Baker, C.).
November 1, 2016 Filing 653 Memorandum in Support regarding #652 MOTION to Seal Document #650 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
November 1, 2016 Filing 652 MOTION to Seal Document #650 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 1, 2016 Filing 651 Declaration regarding #650 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment) (Dennison, Wayne)
November 1, 2016 Filing 650 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support regarding #649 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Execution of Final Judgment Pending Resolution of Amended Motion to Stay (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 11/2/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
November 1, 2016 Filing 649 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION for Temporary Stay of Execution of Final Judgment Pending Resolution of Amended Motion to Stay (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne) Modified on 11/2/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
October 31, 2016 Filing 648 Memorandum in Support regarding #647 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 31, 2016 Filing 647 MOTION to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 -Plaintiff's First Post-Judgment Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Plaintiff's First Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit B-1 - WPL's Objections and Responses to Pltf's First Post-Judgment Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit B-2 - WPL's Objections and Responses to Pltf's First Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
October 24, 2016 Filing 697 Redacted Version of #645 SEALED ORDER (filed pursuant to directive contained in footnote of page 14 in #696 SEALED ORDER) - Signed by U.S. District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/24/2016. (Baker, C.) Modified on 2/9/2017 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
October 24, 2016 Filing 646 Notice filed by World Programming Limited regarding #642 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction - Retracting Intent to Request Redaction. (Dennison, Wayne)
October 24, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #645 SEALED Order. (Baker, C.)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 645 SEALED ORDER - The court's analysis relies, in part, on documents filed under seal. Within 14 days, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/24/2016. (Baker, C.)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #644 Notice Regarding Discovery Conference Requirement in Section II.E. of the Amended Case Management Order filed by SAS Institute Inc. - Upon review of informal correspondence seeking discovery conference with this court pursuant to the case management order, together with attachments, the court concludes said conference is not likely to resolve disputed issues and, accordingly, relieves the judgment creditor of need for adherence to that directive. The judgment creditor shall file its motion in post-judgment discovery. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/20/2016. (Baker, C.)
October 19, 2016 Filing 644 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. Notice Regarding Discovery Conference Requirement in Section II.E. of the Amended Case Management Order. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - WPL's Objections & Responses to Plaintiff's First Post-Judgment Interrogatories, #2 Attachment 2 - WPL's Objections & Responses to Plaintiff's First Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents, #3 Attachment 3 - Letter and Various Emails) (Bennett, Raymond)
October 14, 2016 Filing 643 Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Marshall F. Goldberg on behalf of SAS Institute Inc. (Goldberg, Marshall)
October 11, 2016 Filing 642 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction filed by Wayne F. Dennison regarding #641 Appeal Transcript(Dennison, Wayne)
October 3, 2016 NOTICE of Filing of Official Trial Transcript #641 Appeal Transcript. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (Collier, David)
October 3, 2016 Filing 641 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL PROCEEDINGS for dates of September 22, 2015 to October 9, 2015, before Senior Judge David A. Faber, regarding #605 Notice of Appeal, #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, #64 Notice of Appeal, #614 Notice of Cross Appeal, Court Reporter David Collier, Telephone number (919) 912-9698. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? - Yes. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website. Redaction Request due 10/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supplement DAY 2 trial transcript, #2 Supplement DAY 3 trial transcript, #3 Supplement DAY 4 trial transcript, #4 Supplement DAY 5 trial transcript, #5 Supplement DAY 6 trial transcript, #6 Supplement DAY 7 trial transcript, #7 Supplement DAY 8 trial transcript, #8 Supplement DAY 9 trial transcript, #9 Supplement DAY 10 trial transcript, #10 Supplement DAY 11 trial transcript, #11 Supplement DAY 12 trial transcript, #12 Supplement DAY 13 trial transcript, #13 Supplement DAY 14 trial transcript) (Collier, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2016: #14 Jury Trial - Exhibit Index, September 22, 2015 - October 9, 2015) (Thuemmel Proctor, S.).
October 3, 2016 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #626 MOTION to Seal Document, #630 MOTION to Seal Document, #635 MOTION to Seal Document, and MOTION to Stay regarding #610 Judgment and Post-Judgment Discovery. (Baker, C.)
September 19, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #639 Order on Motion for Bill of Costs. (Baker, C.)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #529 Motion for Bill of Costs - As the prevailing party, SAS is awarded (1) $350.00 in fees of the clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920(1); (2) $1,220.95 in service of process of fees pursuant to 1920(1); (3) $9,812.50 in transcript and recording costs pursuant to 192 (2); and (4) $565.80 in witness fees pursuant to 1920(3). Total costs in the amount of $11,948.80 are taxed against defendant and shall be included in the judgment. Within 14 days of this order, SAS may reapply for the costs that were denied without prejudice, provided the application is supported by adequate documentation and explanation as specified herein. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 9/19/2016. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #638 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER granting #637 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel - The time within which SAS may file any motion to compel with respect to WPL's refusal to serve written responses to SAS's First Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents, and SAS's First Post-Judgment Interrogatories, is hereby extended up to and including September 23, 2016. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2016 Filing 637 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
September 7, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #636 Memorandum in Support filed by World Programming Limited, #635 MOTION to Seal Document #633 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #634 PROPOSED SEALED Reply filed by World Programming Limited, #634 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #632 Notice of Appearance filed by World Programming Limited, and #633 PROPOSED SEALED Reply. (Baker, C.)
September 6, 2016 Filing 636 Memorandum in Support regarding #635 MOTION to Seal Document #633 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #634 PROPOSED SEALED Reply filed by World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
September 6, 2016 Filing 635 MOTION to Seal Document #633 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #634 PROPOSED SEALED Reply filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dennison, Wayne)
September 6, 2016 Filing 634 PROPOSED SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #626 MOTION to Seal Document #625 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #621 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #623 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #624 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Redactions to Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Redactions to Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Redactions to Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Redactions to Memorandum of Law, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order for Redactions) (Dennison, Wayne)
September 6, 2016 Filing 633 PROPOSED SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by Wayne F. Dennison (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #620 MOTION to Stay regarding #610 Judgment and Post-Judgment Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Alternative Security) (Dennison, Wayne)
August 26, 2016 Filing 632 Notice of Appearance filed by Wayne F. Dennison on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Dennison, Wayne)
August 19, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #630 MOTION to Seal #628 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Opposition, #629 PROPOSED SEALED Response filed by SAS Institute Inc., #628 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #629 PROPOSED SEALED Response, and #631 Memorandum in Support filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Baker, C.)
August 18, 2016 Filing 631 Memorandum in Support regarding #630 MOTION to Seal #628 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Opposition and #629 PROPOSED SEALED Response filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 18, 2016 Filing 630 MOTION to Seal Document #628 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #629 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
August 18, 2016 Filing 629 PROPOSED SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #626 MOTION to Seal Document #625 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #621 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #623 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #624 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Article on WPL) (Millen, Pressly)
August 18, 2016 Filing 628 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Opposition (Selected Participants Only) by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #620 MOTION to Stay regarding #610 Judgment and Post-Judgment Discovery. (Millen, Pressly)
August 1, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #620 MOTION to Stay regarding #610 Judgment and Post-Judgment Discovery filed by World Programming Limited. (Tripp, S.)
July 29, 2016 Filing 627 Memorandum in Support regarding #626 MOTION to Seal Document #625 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #621 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #623 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #624 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
July 29, 2016 Filing 626 MOTION to Seal Document #625 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #621 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #623 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #624 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
July 29, 2016 Filing 625 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Edward J. Naughton (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #622 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward)
July 29, 2016 Filing 624 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Edward J. Naughton (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #622 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward)
July 29, 2016 Filing 623 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Edward J. Naughton (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #622 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward)
July 29, 2016 Filing 622 Declaration regarding #621 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #620 MOTION to Stay regarding #610 Judgment and Post-Judgment Discovery by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's First Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's First Post-Judgment Interrogatories) (Naughton, Edward)
July 29, 2016 Filing 621 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by Edward J. Naughton (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #620 MOTION to Stay regarding #610 Judgment and Post-Judgment Discovery. (Naughton, Edward)
July 29, 2016 Filing 620 MOTION to Stay regarding #610 Judgment and Post-Judgment Discovery filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
July 28, 2016 Filing 619 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Collier Transcript Order Form by SAS Institute Inc. for proceedings held on 9/22/2015-10/09/2015 before Judge Faber. (Millen, Pressly)
July 28, 2016 Filing 618 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by SAS Institute Inc. for proceedings held on 12/17/2015 before Judge Faber. (Millen, Pressly)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #605 Notice of Appeal filed by SAS Institute Inc., #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by SAS Institute Inc., #614 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited - The court consolidates Case No. 16-1808 and Case No. 16-1857 as cross-appeals. The appellant in Case No. 16-1808 (SAS Institute, Inc.) shall be considered the appellant for purposes of the consolidated appeals and shall proceed first at briefing and at oral argument. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary case. (Tripp, S.)
July 27, 2016 Filing 616 US Court of Appeals Case Number 16-1857 (Amy L. Carlheim, Case Manager) as to #614 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by World Programming Limited. (Tripp, S.)
July 26, 2016 Filing 615 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #614 Notice of Cross Appeal. (Tripp, S.)
July 26, 2016 Filing 614 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by World Programming Limited as to #528 Judgment, #599 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, #296 SEALED Order, #513 Memorandum & Opinion, Order, #380 SEALED Order, #600 Order on Motion for Judgment, #610 Judgment, #608 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #539 Order, #398 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #452 SEALED Order, #556 Memorandum & Opinion, #609 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion to Dismiss, #451 Order on Motion in Limine, #388 Order, #445 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #444 Order on Motion in Limine. Filing fee, receipt number 0417-3769708. (Naughton, Edward)
July 18, 2016 Filing 613 US Court of Appeals Case Number 16-1808 (Amy L. Carlheim, Case Manager) as to #605 Notice of Appeal filed by SAS Institute Inc., #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Tripp, S.)
July 18, 2016 Filing 612 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal. (Tripp, S.)
July 18, 2016 Filing 611 Subsequent Notice of Appeal filed by SAS Institute Inc. as to #296 SEALED Order, #610 Judgment, #609 Order, #601 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction - Amended Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0417-3756041. (Millen, Pressly)
July 15, 2016 Notification to Appeals Court of Filing regarding #610 Amended Judgment, #609 Order and #608 Order. (Tripp, S.)
July 15, 2016 Filing 610 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of SAS Institute Inc. against World Programming Limited - Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 7/15/2016. (Tripp, S.)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER denying #482 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying Oral Motion pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50; denying Renewed Oral Motion pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50; and, denying #505 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law - Amended Judgment to follow. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/15/2016. (Tripp, S.)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER denying #571 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/15/2016. (Tripp, S.)
July 15, 2016 Filing 607 Notice of Appearance filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of SAS Institute Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron)
July 15, 2016 Filing 606 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #605 Notice of Appeal. (Tripp, S.)
July 14, 2016 Filing 605 Notice of Appeal filed by SAS Institute Inc. as to #296 SEALED Order,,,, #601 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction. Filing fee, receipt number 0417-3756041. (Millen, Pressly)
June 28, 2016 Filing 604 Notice of Appearance filed by Sean Eric Andrussier on behalf of SAS Institute Inc. (Andrussier, Sean)
June 22, 2016 Filing 603 Notice of Suggestion of Subsequently Controlling Decided Authority filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Slip Opinions) (Millen, Pressly)
June 17, 2016 Filing 602 SEALED ORDER denying #531 MOTION for Attorney's Fees and #548 MOTION to Strike - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 6/17/2016. (Baker, C.)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER denying #536 Motion for Permanent Injunction - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 6/17/2016. (Baker, C.)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #540 Motion for Entry of Judgment - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Judge David A. Faber on 6/17/2016. (Baker, C.)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER denying #542 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 6/17/2016. (Baker, C.)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting #587 Motion to Seal #582 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #585 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #581 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #579 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #584 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #586 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #578 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #580 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting #562 Motion to Seal #561 PROPOSED SEALED Reply and #559 PROPOSED SEALED Reply - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER granting #554 Motion to Seal #550 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #552 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #553 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #551 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
May 2, 2016 Filing 594 Notice of Change of Address filed by Mark R. Sigmon filed by on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Sigmon, Mark)
April 18, 2016 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #587 MOTION to Seal Documents. (Baker, C.)
April 1, 2016 Filing 592 Supplemental Declaration of Samuel Manning regarding #575 Supplemental Declaration of Patricia L. Brown filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1Letter from SAS Institute, Apr. 10, 2015) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 4/4/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
March 30, 2016 Filing 591 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
March 23, 2016 Filing 590 Declaration of Claire Bewett regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal) (Naughton, Edward)
March 23, 2016 Filing 589 Certificate of Service filed by World Programming Limited regarding #577 Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen. (Naughton, Edward)
March 23, 2016 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES regarding #583 Declaration of Claire Bewett - Filing is not text searchable and does not contain an accurate certificate of service. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Counsel is directed to correct the deficiencies noted and refile the document accordingly. (Baker, C.)
March 23, 2016 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #577 Declaration of Denis Cohen - A Certificate of Service should accompany this filing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) and Section F(3) of the court's CM/ECF Electronic Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel is directed to file the Certificate of Service using the event code titled as such located under the "Service of Process" category of civil filing events. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 588 Memorandum in Support regarding #587 MOTION to Seal #582 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #585 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #581 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #579 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #584 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #586 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #578 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #580 PROP filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
March 22, 2016 Filing 587 MOTION to Seal #582 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #585 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #581 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #579 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #584 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #586 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #578 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #580 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
March 22, 2016 Filing 586 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #583 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 585 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #583 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 584 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #583 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 583 *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #590 * - Declaration of Claire Bewett regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees by World Programming Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal)) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 3/23/2016 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 582 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #577 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 581 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #577 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 580 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #577 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 579 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #577 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 578 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #577 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #598 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
March 22, 2016 Filing 577 Declaration of Dennis Cohen regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal)) (Naughton, Edward)
March 11, 2016 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Baker, C.)
March 11, 2016 Filing 576 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
March 10, 2016 Filing 575 Declaration regarding #536 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Magic Quadrant for Advanced Analytics Platforms) (Millen, Pressly)
February 26, 2016 Filing 574 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
February 5, 2016 Filing 573 Declaration regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees Under 17 USC 505. by World Programming Limited (Naughton, Edward)
February 5, 2016 Filing 572 Memorandum in Support regarding #571 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 17 USC 505 by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
February 5, 2016 Filing 571 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
January 12, 2016 Filing 570 Notice of Change of Address filed by Pressly M. Millen filed by on behalf of SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
December 18, 2015 Motion Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge Judge David A. Faber - #554 MOTION to Seal #550 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #552 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #553 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #551 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration. (Baker, C.)
December 17, 2015 Filing 569 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in Raleigh - Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2015 regarding #536 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #542 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, #540 MOTION for Judgment, and #531 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Oral arguments proffered. Court takes all matters under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter - Donna Tomawski) (Baker, C.)
December 16, 2015 Filing 568 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #542 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
December 16, 2015 Motion Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber - #548 MOTION to Strike 535 Declaration, 537 Memorandum in Support, 532 Memorandum in Support References to Settlement Communications. (Baker, C.)
December 16, 2015 Filing 567 Declaration regarding #566 Reply to Response to Motion, of Edward J. Naughton by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Court Order D.E. 241) (Naughton, Edward)
December 16, 2015 Filing 566 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #548 MOTION to Strike 535 Declaration, 537 Memorandum in Support, 532 Memorandum in Support References to Settlement Communications filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
December 15, 2015 Filing 565 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #558 Memorandum in Opposition Notice of Errata Contained in Opposition to Defendant's Post-Verdict Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or for a New Trial. (Millen, Pressly)
December 14, 2015 Motion Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber - #540 MOTION for Judgment. (Baker, C.)
December 14, 2015 Filing 564 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #540 MOTION for Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
December 11, 2015 Motions Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge Judge David A. Faber - #536 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #562 MOTION to Seal #561 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #559 PROPOSED SEALED Reply and , #531 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Baker, C.)
December 10, 2015 Filing 563 Memorandum in Support regarding #562 MOTION to Seal Document #561 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #559 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
December 10, 2015 Filing 562 MOTION to Seal Document #561 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, #559 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
December 10, 2015 Filing 561 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by SAS (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #531 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Costs and Attorneys' Fees, #2 Exhibit B - Time Entries) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #597 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
December 10, 2015 Filing 560 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #548 MOTION to Strike 535 Declaration, 537 Memorandum in Support, 532 Memorandum in Support References to Settlement Communications filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
December 10, 2015 Filing 559 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by SAS (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #536 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #597 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
December 7, 2015 Filing 558 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #542 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
December 7, 2015 Filing 557 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #540 MOTION for Judgment filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Case Cited in Memorandum) (Naughton, Edward)
November 23, 2015 Filing 555 Memorandum in Support regarding #554 MOTION to Seal #550 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #552 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #553 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #551 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
November 23, 2015 Filing 554 MOTION to Seal #550 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #552 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #553 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #551 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
November 23, 2015 Filing 553 SEALED Declaration of Samuel Manning (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #552 PROPOSED SEALED Response. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #596 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 23, 2015 Filing 552 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #536 MOTION for Permanent Injunction SAS Institute Inc.'s Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #596 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 23, 2015 Filing 551 SEALED Declaration of Oliver Robinson (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #550 PROPOSED SEALED Response. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #596 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 23, 2015 Filing 550 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #531 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/9/2016 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #596 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
November 23, 2015 Filing 549 Memorandum in Support regarding #548 MOTION to Strike 535 Declaration, 537 Memorandum in Support, 532 Memorandum in Support References to Settlement Communications filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases) (Naughton, Edward)
November 23, 2015 Filing 548 MOTION to Strike 535 Declaration, 537 Memorandum in Support, 532 Memorandum in Support References to Settlement Communications filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions - Hearing set on post-trial motions for 12/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 5th Floor Courtroom before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 11/17/2015. (Baker, C.)
November 17, 2015 Motion Referred to Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court - #529 MOTION for Bill of Costs. (Baker, C.)
November 13, 2015 Filing 545 Declaration regarding #542 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Edward Naughton by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Case Law, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment by Court of Justice of the European Union, #3 Exhibit C - Judgment by the UK High Court of Justice, Chancery Division, #4 Exhibit D - Judgment by the UK Court of Appeal) (Naughton, Edward)
November 13, 2015 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #544 Declaration - Pursuant to Section L(2) of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, attachments and exhibits must be identified with a clear and complete description of the document (e.g. 'Exhibit A' is insufficient. 'Exhibit A - Map of Main Street' would meet the requirement.) Counsel is instructed to refile the document making sure that each attached exhibit is properly identified using a complete description in the docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
November 13, 2015 Filing 544 *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #545 * - Declaration regarding #542 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Edward Naughton by World Programming Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 11/16/2015 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.)
November 13, 2015 Filing 543 Memorandum in Support regarding #542 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
November 13, 2015 Filing 542 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
November 13, 2015 Filing 541 Memorandum in Support regarding #540 MOTION for Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lewis v. Eliades) (Millen, Pressly)
November 13, 2015 Filing 540 MOTION for Judgment filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER Approving #528 Judgment - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 11/10/2015 (entered nunc pro tunc for 10/16/2015). (Baker, C.)
November 5, 2015 Filing 556 MEMORANDUM OPINION memorializing the grounds supporting the court's oral ruling granting #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Expert Kendyl A. Roman - Redacted version of #538 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/5/2015. (Baker, C.)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 538 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION memorializing the grounds supporting the court's oral ruling granting #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Expert Kendyl A. Roman - The court's analysis relies, in part, on documents filed under seal. Within 14 days, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/5/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 30, 2015 Filing 536 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
October 30, 2015 Filing 534 Declaration of Douglas W. Kenyon regarding #531 MOTION for Attorney Fees by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 30, 2015 Filing 533 AFFIDAVIT regarding #531 MOTION for Attorney Fees by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Time Entries PMM, #2 Exhibit B - Time Entries AKQ, #3 Exhibit C - Time Entries RMB, #4 Exhibit D - Time Entries MWC) (Millen, Pressly)
October 30, 2015 Filing 531 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 30, 2015 Filing 530 Declaration of Pressly M. Millen regarding #529 MOTION for Bill of Costs by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Invoice for Service of Process, #2 Exhibit 2 - Invoices of Depositions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Invoice for Trial Transcript) (Millen, Pressly)
October 30, 2015 Filing 529 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 16, 2015 Filing 528 JUDGMENT in favor of SAS Institute Inc. against World Programming Limited - Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 10/16/2015. (Tripp, S.)
October 16, 2015 Filing 527 Redaction regarding #399 Transcript, #400 Transcript. (Attachments: #1 07-24-15 proceedings DAY 2) (Collier, David)
October 9, 2015 Filing 524 Court Exhibit # 8 - Meyer Damages Summary. (Baker, C.)
October 9, 2015 Filing 523 Court Exhibit # 7 - Vellturo Damages Summary. (Baker, C.)
October 9, 2015 Filing 519 Exhibit List for Jury Trial - Official. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List - Jury Version) (Baker, C.)
October 9, 2015 Filing 518 Jury Seating Arrangement - Sealed Document. (Baker, C.)
October 9, 2015 Filing 517 JURY VERDICT. (Baker, C.)
October 9, 2015 Filing 516 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial completed on 10/9/2015. DAY FOURTEEN. Counsel present for all parties - Deliberations continue and are completed - Jury returns verdict - Verdict published by the clerk - Jury polled by the Court - Jurors excused and trial proceedings concluded. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.) (Baker, C.).
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER FOR JURORS' LUNCH - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 10/9/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 9, 2015 Filing 513 MEMORANDUM OPINION and WRITTEN ORDER regarding Oral Order denying #480 Motion to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 10/9/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 8, 2015 Filing 515 Court's Exhibit # 3 - Jury Instructions. (Baker, C.)
October 8, 2015 Filing 512 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 10/8/2015. DAY THIRTEEN. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - Plaintiff withdraws #495 MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions - 10 jurors present for service - Closing arguments offered - Charge conference commenced and completed - Deliberations begin - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return October 9, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. to resume deliberations. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #503 Motion to Seal #502 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit and #501 PROPOSED SEALED Document - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 10/8/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER granting #492 Consent Motion to Amend Exhibit B as to #467 Pretrial Order - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 10/8/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER FOR JURORS' LUNCH - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 10/8/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 8, 2015 Filing 506 Memorandum in Support regarding #505 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward)
October 8, 2015 Filing 505 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
October 8, 2015 Filing 504 Memorandum in Support regarding #503 MOTION to Seal Document #502 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #501 PROPOSED SEALED Document by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
October 8, 2015 Filing 503 MOTION to Seal Document #502 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #501 PROPOSED SEALED Document filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
October 8, 2015 Filing 502 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #500 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 12/3/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #511 ORDER.
October 8, 2015 Filing 501 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #500 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 10/12/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #511 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
October 8, 2015 Filing 500 Declaration regarding #499 Response in Opposition to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's List of Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Inter-solicitor Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4 - (Filed Under Seal)) (Naughton, Edward)
October 8, 2015 Filing 499 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #495 MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
October 8, 2015 Filing 498 Suppemental Proposed Jury Instructions by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
October 7, 2015 Filing 508 SEALED Document: Court Exhibit # 2 - Draft Verdict Form (Selected Participants Only) (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Baker, C.)
October 7, 2015 Filing 507 SEALED Document: Court Exhibit 1 - Draft jury instructions (Selected Participants Only) (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Baker, C.)
October 7, 2015 RENEWED ORAL MOTION pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50 filed by World Programming Limited. (Baker, C.)
October 7, 2015 ORAL ORDER denying #480 Motion to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint - Written Order to follow. Entered in open court by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 10/7/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 7, 2015 Filing 497 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 10/07/2015. DAY TWELVE. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Defendant's evidence continues - Defendant rests - Plaintiff offers rebuttal evidence - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return October 8, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. - Matters addressed outside the presence of the jury regarding finalization of jury instructions - Court adjourns to reconvene at 8:15 a.m. on Thursday, October 8, 2015. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
October 7, 2015 Filing 496 Memorandum in Support regarding #495 MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 7, 2015 Filing 495 MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
October 7, 2015 Filing 494 Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 7, 2015 Motion Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge Judge David A. Faber - #492 Consent MOTION to Amend Exhibit B to #467 Pretrial Order. (Baker, C.)
October 7, 2015 Filing 493 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 10/06/2015. DAY ELEVEN. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Defendant's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return October 7, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
October 6, 2015 Filing 492 Consent MOTION to Amend #467 Pretrial Order filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Revised Exhibit B to Pretrial Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
October 6, 2015 Motion Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber - #480 MOTION to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint. (Baker, C.)
October 6, 2015 Filing 491 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #480 MOTION to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by World Programming Limited. (Sigmon, Mark)
October 5, 2015 Filing 490 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 10/05/2015. DAY TEN. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Defendant's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return October 6, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
October 2, 2015 Filing 489 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 10/02/2015. DAY NINE. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Defendant's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return October 5, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER FOR JURORS' LUNCH - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 10/2/2015. (Baker, C.)
October 2, 2015 Filing 487 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #480 MOTION to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
October 1, 2015 Filing 486 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 10/01/2015. DAY EIGHT. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Defendant's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return October 2, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
October 1, 2015 Filing 485 RESPONSE to Order Sustaining Objection filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to WPL's Offer of Proof) (Naughton, Edward)
September 30, 2015 Filing 484 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 9/30/2015. DAY SEVEN. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Oral argument offered as to #480 MOTION to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint and #482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - Court takes motions under advisement - Defendant's evidence begins - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return October 1, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 30, 2015 Filing 483 Memorandum in Support regarding #482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Case, Austin v. Colonial Williamsburg Hotel Props., Inc., No. 4:95CV130, 1996 WL 406671) (Sigmon, Mark)
September 30, 2015 Filing 482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting World Programming Limited's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law) (Sigmon, Mark)
September 30, 2015 Filing 481 Memorandum in Support regarding #480 MOTION to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by World Programming Limited. (Sigmon, Mark)
September 30, 2015 Filing 480 MOTION to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting World Programming Limited's Motion to Amend Answer to First Amended Complaint) (Sigmon, Mark)
September 29, 2015 ORAL MOTION pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50 filed by World Programming Limited. (Baker, C.)
September 29, 2015 Filing 478 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 9/29/2015. DAY SIX. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Plaintiff's evidence continues - Plaintiff rests - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return September 30, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 29, 2015 Remark - Pursuant to the court's Text Order entered on this date, #453 SEALED ORDER has been unsealed in its entirety and made a part of the public record. (Baker, C.)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #453 SEALED ORDER - In accordance with sealed order entered September 9, 2015 at DE 453, directing the parties to provide the clerk, within fourteen (14) days after entry, a copy of that order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions, having received confirmation from the parties that no redactions are necessary, the court DIRECTS the clerk to unseal the order so that it can be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/29/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 28, 2015 Filing 477 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 9/28/2015. DAY FIVE. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Plaintiff's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return September 29, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER For Jurors' Lunch - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Judge David A. Faber on 09/25/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 25, 2015 ORAL ORDER granting ORAL MOTION to Excuse Attendance of Defendant's Local Counsel from Remainder of Trial Proceedings - Entered in open court by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 09/25/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 25, 2015 ORAL MOTION to Excuse Attendance of Defendant's Local Counsel from Remainder of Trial Proceedings filed by World Programming Limited. (Baker, C.)
September 25, 2015 Filing 476 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 9/25/2015. DAY FOUR. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Plaintiff's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return September 28, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #452 SEALED ORDER - In accordance with sealed order entered September 8, 2015 at DE 452, directing the parties to provide the clerk, within fourteen (14) days after entry, a copy of that order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions, having now received the consented to submission, the court gives its approval in part and DIRECTS that the redacted copy of the sealed order be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/25/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 24, 2015 Filing 474 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 9/24/2015. DAY THREE. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Plaintiff's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return September 25, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 23, 2015 Filing 473 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Trial held on 9/23/2015. DAY TWO. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 10 jurors present for service - Plaintiff's evidence continues - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return September 24, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER granting Consent MOTION to Amend Exhibit A as to #467 Pretrial Order - Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber on 09/23/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 23, 2015 Motion Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber - #471 Consent MOTION to Amend Exhibit A as to #467 Pretrial Order. (Baker, C.)
September 23, 2015 Filing 471 Consent MOTION to Amend Exhibit A as to #467 Pretrial Order filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Exhibit A to the Pretrial Order - Plaintiff's Exhibits and Defendant's Objections, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/23/2015 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
September 22, 2015 Filing 470 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Jury Selection and commencement of Jury Trial held on 9/22/2015. DAY ONE. Counsel present for all parties - Administrative trial issues addressed - 50 potential jurors present for service - Jury panel sworn/affirmed - Voir Dire conducted - 10 jurors selected and impaneled - Plaintiff's evidence begins - Jurors admonished, excused and directed to return September 23, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 21, 2015 Filing 469 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David A. Faber in New Bern - Pretrial Conference held on 9/21/2015. Counsel present for all parties. Administrative matters pertaining to trial processes and procedures addressed. Jury selection set to commence at 9:30 a.m. on Tuesday, September 22, 2015. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
September 21, 2015 Motion Submitted to Senior U.S. District Judge David A. Faber - #464 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Lost Profits As Consequential Damages. (Baker, C.)
September 21, 2015 Filing 468 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #464 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Lost Profits As Consequential Damages filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Excerpt of Transcript of June 24, 2015 Hearing, #2 WPL Proposed Special Verdict Form, #3 WPL's Legal Basis for Proposed Special Verdict Form) (Millen, Pressly)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 PRETRIAL ORDER - Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 09/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Exhibits and Defendant's Objections, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Exhibits and Plaintiff's Objections, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Designations and Defendant's Objections and Counter-Designations, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant's Designations and Plaintiff's Objections and Counter-Designations, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Witness List, #6 Exhibit F - Defendant's Witness List) (Baker, C.)
September 17, 2015 **** Set Hearing - Administrative Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2015 at 3:00 PM in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before Senior Judge David A. Faber. (Baker, C.)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the court on its own initiative, in furtherance of its planning and scheduling. Given the fast-approaching jury trial, scheduled to commence September 22, 2015, the parties are DIRECTED to submit to the proposed order inbox of the undersigned their final proposed pretrial order by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, September 17, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 09/16/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting #457 Motion to Redact #399 Transcript and #400 Transcript - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/15/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 14, 2015 Filing 465 Memorandum in Support regarding #464 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Lost Profits As Consequential Damages filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Authority: Digital Ally, Inc. v. Z3 Tech., LLC, #2 Unpublished Authority: Infectious Disease Solutions, P.C. v. Synamed, LLC, #3 Unpublished Authority: Marion Mills, L.L.C. v. Delta Mills Mktg. Co., #4 Unpublished Authority: Smart Online, Inc. v. Opensite Techs., Inc., #5 Unpublished Authority: Terry's Floor Fashions, Inc. v. Georgia-Pac. Corp., #6 Exhibit Unpublished Authority: Troche v. Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, Inc., #7 Unpublished Authority: Waterfront Properties, Inc. v. Xerox Connect, Inc.) (Naughton, Edward)
September 14, 2015 Filing 464 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Lost Profits As Consequential Damages filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
September 14, 2015 Filing 463 Proposed Jury Instructions by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
September 14, 2015 Filing 462 Proposed Voir Dire by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
September 14, 2015 Filing 461 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. Joint Statement of the Case. (Millen, Pressly)
September 14, 2015 Filing 460 Proposed Jury Instructions by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 14, 2015 Filing 459 Proposed Voir Dire by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 14, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #457 MOTION to Redact #399 Transcript, #400 Transcript. (Baker, C.)
September 11, 2015 Filing 458 Memorandum in Support regarding #457 MOTION to Redact #399 Transcript, #400 Transcript filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Redactions) (Naughton, Edward)
September 11, 2015 Filing 457 MOTION to Redact #399 Transcript, #400 Transcript filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
September 10, 2015 Filing 456 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt in Raleigh: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/10/2015. Counsel for plaintiff and counsel for defendant present. Court reviews proposed pretrial order and advises parties as to potential changes. Parties should submit to the court for review and approval a revised proposed pretrial order. Jury Selection and commencement of Jury Trial remains set for 9/22/2015 in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before Senior US District Judge David A. Faber. (Court Reporter Sheila Darden) (Marsh, K)
September 9, 2015 Filing 455 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt in Raleigh: Status Conference held on 9/9/2015. Counsel for plaintiff and counsel for defendant present via telephone. Preliminary statements by the court. Argument by counsel for both plaintiff and defendant regarding objections. Court enters oral rulings on the record. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2015 at 9:30 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt. (Court Reporter Gaye Paul) (Marsh, K)
September 9, 2015 Filing 454 STIPLATION OF DISMISSAL of the Manual-to-Manual Copyright Claim filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #143 Amended Complaint. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/9/2015 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #404 SEALED MOTION in Limine Under FRE 106 - The court's analysis relies, in part, on documents filed under seal. Within 14 days, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/09/2015. (Baker, C.) Modified on 9/29/2015 to unseal order pursuant to 9/29/2015 TEXT ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #407 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence - REDACTED VERSION OF #452 SEALED ORDER. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/8/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 8, 2015 **** Set Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2015 at 9:30 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt. Telephonic Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 3:00 PM in Telephonic before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt. (Baker, C.)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE - Upon request of the parties, the court notices conference by telephone for Wednesday, September 9, 2015, at 3:00 p.m. Said conference shall be presided over by the Hon. W. Earl Britt, Senior U.S. District Judge. Moreover, in accordance with Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, upon scheduling conflict now arisen involving the undersigned, it also is NOTICED that final pretrial conference will occur as previously ordered now at the Terry Sanford Federal Building and Courthouse in Raleigh, before Judge Britt. SO NOTICED... Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/08/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #407 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence - The court's analysis relies, in part, on documents filed under seal. Within 14 days, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/08/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER denying #413 Motion in Limine To Exclude Evidence Concerning Disgorgement of Profits - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/08/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER granting #448 Motion to Seal #447 PROPOSED SEALED Document - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Filing 449 Memorandum in Support regarding #448 MOTION to Seal #447 PROPOSED SEALED Document filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
September 4, 2015 Filing 448 MOTION to Seal #447 PROPOSED SEALED Document filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
September 4, 2015 Filing 447 SEALED Document: Joint Compenium of Deposition Objections by the Parties (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - WPL Objections to Waselewski Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit 2 - WPL Objections to T. Quarendon Deposition Designations, #3 Exhibit 3 - WPL Objections to Robinson Deposition Designations, #4 Exhibit 4 - WPL Objections to Robinson & Manning Deposition Designations, #5 Exhibit 5 - WPL Objections to Vellturo Deposition Designations, #6 Exhibit 6 - WPL Objections to Rack Deposition Counter-Designations, #7 Exhibit 7 - WPL Objections to Quarendon Witness Statement Counter-Designations, #8 Exhibit 8 - WPL Objections to Eaton First Witness Statement Counter-Designations, #9 Exhibit 9 - WPL Objections to Eaton Second Witness Statement Counter-Designations, #10 Exhibit 10 - WPL Objections to UK Trial Testimony Designations, #11 Exhibit 11 - SAS Objections to Brown & Carlton Deposition Designations, #12 Exhibit 12 - SAS Objections to Davis Deposition Designations, #13 Exhibit 13 - SAS Objections to Langston Deposition Designations, #14 Exhibit 14 - SAS Objections to Rack Deposition Designations, #15 Exhibit 15 - SAS Objections to Waselewski Deposition Designations, #16 Exhibit 16 - SAS Objections to Robinson Deposition Counter-Designations, #17 Exhibit 17 - SAS Objections to Robinson & Manning Deposition Counter-Designations, #18 Exhibit 18 - SAS Objections to UK Trial Testimony) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/8/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #450 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Filing 446 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. regarding Text Order, Joint Notice of Proposed Dates and Times for Conduct of Telephone Conference regarding Deposition Objections. (Millen, Pressly)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER denying #401 Emergency Motion to Allow the Use of the SAS Learning Edition Software as an Exhibit At Trial - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER denying #415 Motion in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Damages on Plaintiff's Contract Claim - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - In response to inquiry presented to the Case Administrator regarding setting of conference by telephone and provision of joint compendium, the parties shall file the compendium today, before the close of business, and also today propose in filed notice three (3) alternative dates and times next week for conduct of the conference, identifying the proposed attendees for each side and their contact numbers. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #415 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Damages on Plaintiff's Contract Claim and #413 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Concerning Disgorgement of Profits. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #438 Motion to Seal #435 PROPOSED SEALED Response and #436 PROPOSED SEALED Response - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #433 Motion to Seal #429 PROPOSED SEALED Response and #431 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting #422 Motion to Seal #421 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #417 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, #418 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #420 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #411 Motion to Seal #404 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, #410 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #407 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, and #406 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 3, 2015 Filing 439 Memorandum in Support regarding #438 MOTION to Seal filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2015 toclarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
September 3, 2015 Filing 438 MOTION to Seal #435 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #436 PROPOSED SEALED Response filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
September 3, 2015 Filing 437 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by World Programming Limited regarding #436 SEALED Response. (Naughton, Edward)
September 3, 2015 Filing 436 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #404 SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only) by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #443 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 3, 2015 Filing 435 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #407 SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #443 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 3, 2015 Filing 434 Memorandum in Support regarding #433 MOTION to Seal Document #429 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #431 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 3, 2015 Filing 433 MOTION to Seal Document #429 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #431 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
September 3, 2015 Filing 432 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #415 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Damages on Plaintiff's Contract Claim filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 3, 2015 Filing 431 SEALED Exhibit A - 30(b)(6) Deposition of Computer Associates (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #430 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Vellturo Second Supplemental Report and Exhbits signed, #2 Exhibit D - Vellturo deposition excerpt) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #442 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 3, 2015 Filing 430 Declaration of Pressly M. Millen regarding #428 Response in Opposition to Motion, #429 SEALED Response, by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - 30b6 Deposition Notice of CA, Inc.) (Millen, Pressly)
September 3, 2015 Filing 429 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #417 SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #442 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 3, 2015 Filing 428 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #413 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Concerning Disgorgement of Profits filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 2, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #401 Emergency MOTION to Allow the Use of the SAS Learning Edition Software as an Exhibit at Trial. (Baker, C.)
September 2, 2015 Filing 427 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #401 Emergency MOTION to Allow the Use of the SAS Learning Edition Software as an Exhibit At Trial Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Emergency Motion to Allow Use of the SAS Learning Edition at Trial filed by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Edward Naughton dated August 26, 2015, #2 Exhibit B - Email to Dennis Cohen dated March 13, 2015, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Patricia Brown) (Millen, Pressly)
September 2, 2015 **** Reset Hearings - Trial Docket Call reset for 9/22/2015 at 9:00 AM in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Jury Selection and commencement of Jury Trial reset for 9/22/2015 at 9:30 AM in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Baker, C.)
September 2, 2015 Filing 426 NOTICE REGARDING CHANGE IN DATE OF COMMENCEMENT OF TRIAL - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/02/2014. (Baker, C.)
September 1, 2015 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #411 MOTION to Seal Documents and #422 MOTION to Seal Documents. (Baker, C.)
September 1, 2015 **** Set Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2015 at 9:30 AM in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Baker, C.)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #425 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. - Upon letter notice, (DE 425), the court discontinues any hearing in the case on September 9, 2015. Any remaining pretrial issues shall be heard at time of the final pretrial conference on September 10, 2015. If a party deems a conference by telephone in advance of September 10, 2015, likely to promote efficiencies, request may be made representing the position of the other side, including proposed alternative dates and times of availability. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/01/2015. (Baker, C.)
August 31, 2015 Filing 425 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. Joint Letter regarding Pretrial Matters. (Millen, Pressly)
August 28, 2015 Filing 424 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction filed by Edward Joseph Naughton regarding #399 Transcript, #400 Transcript. (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 423 Memorandum in Support regarding #422 MOTION to Seal Document #421 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #417 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION #418 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 422 MOTION to Seal Document #421 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #417 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, #418 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #420 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 421 SEALED Exhibit 4 (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #419 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #441 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 420 SEALED Exhibit 2 (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #419 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #441 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 419 Declaration of Edward J. Naughton regarding #417 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Computer Associates' Alleged Breach of its SAS License (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SAS Institute's Discovery Designations, #2 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Anthony Valenzano, #3 Exhibit 5 - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 418 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #417 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Computer Associates' Alleged Breach of its SAS License (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #441 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 417 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Computer Associates' Alleged Breach of its SAS License (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #441 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 416 Memorandum in Support regarding #415 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Damages on Plaintiff's Contract Claim filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 415 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Damages on Plaintiff's Contract Claim filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 414 Memorandum in Support regarding #413 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Concerning Disgorgement of Profits filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 413 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Concerning Disgorgement of Profits filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 412 Memorandum in Support regarding #411 MOTION to Seal #404 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, #410 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #407 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, and #406 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 27, 2015 Filing 411 MOTION to Seal #404 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, #410 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #407 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION, and #406 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
August 27, 2015 Filing 410 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #407 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence (Selected Participants Only)by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #440 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 409 Declaration regarding #407 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WPL Pretrial Disclosures) (Millen, Pressly)
August 27, 2015 Filing 408 Proposed Order regarding #407 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 27, 2015 Filing 407 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Robinson and Manning Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Davis Excerpts) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #440 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 406 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #404 SEALED MOTION in Limine Under FRE 106 (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #440 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 405 Proposed Order regarding #404 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION in Limine Under FRE 106(Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 27, 2015 Filing 404 SEALED MOTION in Limine Under FRE 106 (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bagshaw Witness Statement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jupp Witness Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Manning Witness Statement, #4 Exhibit 4 - P Quarendon I Witness Statement, #5 Exhibit 5 - P Quarendon II Witness Statement, #6 Exhibit 6 - T Quarendon I Witness Statement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Robinson Witness Statement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Scurr Witness Statement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Vibert Witness Statement, #10 Exhibit 10 - Weekes Witness Statement) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/4/2015 to remove "proposed" from docket text pursuant to #440 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #401 Emergency MOTION to Allow the Use of the SAS Learning Edition Software as an Exhibit At Trial filed by World Programming Limited - This matter is before the court on its own initiative. In light of the pressing nature of defendant's recently filed motion, the court sets briefing on the motion as follows: Plaintiff shall respond to the motion within 7 days. No replies shall be allowed. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/27/2015. (Tripp, S.)
August 27, 2015 Filing 403 Declaration of Edward J. Naughton regarding #401 Emergency MOTION to Allow the Use of the SAS Learning Edition Software as an Exhibit At Trial filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Millen to Naughton, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Naughton to Millen, #3 Exhibit 3 - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 402 Memorandum in Support regarding #401 Emergency MOTION to Allow the Use of the SAS Learning Edition Software as an Exhibit At Trial filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
August 27, 2015 Filing 401 Emergency MOTION to Allow the Use of the SAS Learning Edition Software as an Exhibit At Trial filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
August 21, 2015 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript #399 Transcript. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (Collier, David)
August 21, 2015 Filing 400 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING Proceedings held on July 24, 2015, before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Court Reporter David J. Collier, Telephone number (919) 912-9698. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's # href=http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/pdfs/transcriptRedactionRequirements.pdf target=_blank>website. Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2015. (Collier, David)
August 21, 2015 Filing 399 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING Proceedings held on July 23, 2015, before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Transcriber David J. Collier, Telephone number (919) 912-9698. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's # href=http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/pdfs/transcriptRedactionRequirements.pdf target=_blank>website. Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2015. (Collier, David)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #329 Motion To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/12/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 30, 2015 Filing 397 REDACTION to #391 SEALED Document: Powerpoint Presentation from 07/23/2015 Motions Hearing (Direct Testimony of Kendyl A. Roman) by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
July 30, 2015 Filing 396 Declaration regarding #395 Response regarding Notice of Suggestion of Subsequent Authority by Edward J. Naughton by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence between Denis Cohen, Esq. and Press Millen, Esq. dated Oct. 21, 2014 through Nov. 4, 2014) (Naughton, Edward)
July 30, 2015 Filing 395 RESPONSE regarding #394 Notice of Suggestion of Subsequent Authority filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
July 28, 2015 Filing 394 Notice of Suggestion of Subsequently Controlling Decided Authority filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting in part and denying in part #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer - Entered in open court by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/24/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #337 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo - Entered in open court by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/24/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying in part and holding in abeyance in remaining part #329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer - Entered in open court by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/24/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 24, 2015 Filing 393 Exhibit List - Motions Hearing and Oral Arguments held in New Bern on July 23, 2015 and July 24, 2015. (Baker, C.)
July 24, 2015 Filing 392 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan in New Bern: Motions Hearing and Oral Argument on 7/24/2015. DAY TWO. Counsel present for all parties. Witness testimony continues and concludes. Oral arguments presented. Court tenders rulings as to pending Daubert motions and related issues. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
July 23, 2015 Filing 391 SEALED Document: Powerpoint Presentation from 07/23/2015 Motions Hearing (Direct Testimony of Kendyl A. Roman) (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). *Filed UNDER SEAL at the direction of the Court. The parties shall file within seven (7) days a redacted version on the record.* (Baker, C.)
July 23, 2015 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan in New Bern: Motions Hearing and Oral Argument begun on 7/23/2015. DAY ONE. Counsel present for all parties. Witness testimony offered. Court takes overnight recess and will reconvene at 9:00 a.m. on Friday, July 24, 2015. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
July 22, 2015 Filing 389 NOTICE - In aid to the parties' continued preparation for hearing tomorrow, where the court notes plaintiff has pending a claim for violation of copyright (Count II), a claim for fraudulent inducement to contract (Count III), a breach of contract claim (Count III) (damages only), and a claim for violation of the North Carolina Unfair and Deceptive Trade Practices Act (Count V) the court invites argument tomorrow as to the appropriate damages measure(s) attributable to each remaining claim. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/2/22015. (Baker, C.)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/21/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 14, 2015 **** Reset Hearings - Tentative Motion and/or Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/9/2015 at 9:30 AM in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/10/2015 at 9:30 AM in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Baker, C.)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 SECOND ORDER IN ANTICIPATION OF TRIAL - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/14/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 14, 2015 Filing 386 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan in New Bern, NC - Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/14/2015. Counsel present for all parties. Issues bearing on format addressed in preparation for upcoming Daubert Motions hearing. Court allows extension of case deadlines and also continues upcoming final pretrial conference. Written order to follow. (Baker, C.) (Baker, C.).
July 13, 2015 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing - Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/14/2015 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Counsel will be contacted in advance of the conference by court personnel who will provide the information necessary to participate in the call. (Baker, C.)
July 10, 2015 Filing 385 SEALED Expert Report of Kendyl A. Roman - (Sealed pursuant to #356 ORDER) - (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit 2 - Materials Reviewed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Information regarding the SAS System and the SAS Learning Edition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Details of analysis of the SAS Learning Edition, #5 Exhibit 5-1 - Analysis of the reported problems and enhancement requests, #6 Exhibit 5-2 - Analysis of the reported problems and enhancement requests, #7 Exhibit 5-3 - Analysis of the reported problems and enhancement requests, #8 Exhibit 6 - Issues that indicate use of the SAS Learning Edition, #9 Exhibit 7 - Instructional Material regarding the SAS System, #10 Exhibit 8 - Analysis of the WPL Source Code Versions, #11 Exhibit 9 - Analysis of the WPL New Products and Features, #12 Exhibit 10 - Analysis of the correspondence between the SAS System and WPS, #13 Exhibit 11-1 - Information regarding SAS System Versions 9.2, 9.3, and 9.4 (Part 1), #14 Exhibit 11-1 - Information regarding SAS System Versions 9.2, 9.3, and 9.4 (Part 2), #15 Exhibit 11-2 - Information regarding SAS System Versions 9.2, 9.3, and 9.4 (Part 1), #16 Exhibit 11-2 - Information regarding SAS System Versions 9.2, 9.3, and 9.4 (Part 2), #17 Exhibit 11-2 - Information regarding SAS System Versions 9.2, 9.3, and 9.4 (Part 3), #18 Exhibit 11-3 - Information regarding SAS System Versions 9.2, 9.3, and 9.4 (Part 1), #19 Exhibit 11-3 - Information regarding SAS System Versions 9.2, 9.3, and 9.4 (Part 2), #20 Exhibit 12-1 - Pages from computer dictionaries cited in this report, #21 Exhibit 12-2 - Pages from computer dictionaries cited in this report) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 7/13/2015 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
July 10, 2015 Filing 384 SEALED Deposition Transcript of Kendyl A. Roman Taken on May 15, 2015 - (Filed under seal pursuant to #356 ORDER) - (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited). (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 7/13/2015 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
July 10, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #383 Consent MOTION to Modify Timeline for Providing Pretrial Disclosures and Objections Under Local Civil Rule 16.1(b)(1). (Baker, C.)
July 9, 2015 Filing 383 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify Timeline for Providing Pretrial Disclosures and Objections Under Local Civil Rule 16.1(b)(1) filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
July 9, 2015 Filing 382 NOTICE - There are pending three Daubert motions, (DE 329, 337, 347), just recently ripened, where final pretrial conference is scheduled for September 3, 2015, with trial to commence September 21, 2015. The court has determined upon its early review, that hearing arguments on each of these motions would assist in the courts address. Hearing is noticed at New Bern, to commence at 9:30 a.m. on July 23, 2015. The court also reserves time on July 24, 2015, should it be necessary. If either side wishes a conference by telephone with the court in advance of hearing, in furtherance of your preparation, request may be made of the case manager with provision of suggested alternative dates and times of mutual availability. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/09/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #380 SEALED Order - Upon receipt and review of the parties' response concerning any need to redact the court's sealed order, informally submitted by e-mail this date directed to the case manager, where no need is perceived, the court directs said order now to be unsealed by the clerk. Entered by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on July 8, 2015. (Baker, C.)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER denying #318 MOTION for Reconsideration - The court's analysis relies, in part, on documents filed under seal. Within 14 days, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/01/2015. (Baker, C.) Modified on 7/8/2015 to unseal document pursuant to Text Order entered on this date. (Baker, C.)
June 30, 2015 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer, #337 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo, and #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer. (Baker, C.)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #377 Motion to Seal #376 PROPOSED SEALED Reply - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/30/2015. (Baker, C.)
June 30, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #377 MOTION to Seal #376 PROPOSED SEALED Reply. (Baker, C.)
June 30, 2015 Filing 378 Memorandum in Support regarding #377 MOTION to Seal #376 PROPOSED SEALED Reply filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
June 30, 2015 Filing 377 MOTION to Seal #376 PROPOSED SEALED Reply filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
June 30, 2015 Filing 376 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by SAS (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 6/30/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #379 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting #372 Motion to Seal #371 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/16/2015. (Baker, C.)
June 16, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #372 MOTION to Seal #371 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo. (Baker, C.)
June 16, 2015 Filing 374 Proposed Order regarding #372 MOTION to Seal #371 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
June 15, 2015 Filing 373 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
June 15, 2015 Filing 372 MOTION to Seal #371 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
June 15, 2015 Filing 371 SEALED Exhibit A (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #370 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 6/16/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket entry text pursuant to #375 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
June 15, 2015 Filing 370 Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward)
June 15, 2015 Filing 369 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #337 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
June 15, 2015 Filing 368 Declaration of Edward J. naughton regarding #367 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae of Kendyl A. Roman, #2 Exhibit B - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward)
June 15, 2015 Filing 367 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
June 15, 2015 Notice to Counsel regarding #366 Reply to Response to Motion - Pursuant to Section L of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, attachments and exhibits must be identified with a clear and complete description in the docket entry text. The clerk's office has corrected the deficiency in this instance, but future filings must adhere to the court's filing policy. (Baker, C.)
June 11, 2015 Filing 366 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AVX Corp. v. U.S., 518 Fed Appx. 130 (2013)) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 6/15/2015 to insert naming convention for exhibit. (Baker, C.)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting #363 Motion to Seal #361 PROPOSED SEALED Response and #362 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/02/2015. (Baker, C.)
June 1, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #363 MOTION to Seal #361 PROPOSED SEALED Response and #362 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration. (Baker, C.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 364 Memorandum in Support regarding #363 MOTION to Seal #361 PROPOSED SEALED Response and #362 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
June 1, 2015 Filing 363 MOTION to Seal Document #361 PROPOSED SEALED Response and #362 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
June 1, 2015 Filing 362 SEALED Declaration of Raymond Bennett (Selected Participants Only) by SAS (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #361 SEALED Response in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Expert Report of Vellturo, #2 Exhibit B - Exhibits to Vellturo Expert report, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Vellturo Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Meyer Expert Report with Exhibits) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 6/2/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #365 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 361 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition (Selected Participants Only) by SAS (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #337 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 6/2/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #365 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting #358 Motion to Seal #357 PROPOSED SEALED Document - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/29/2015. (Baker, C.)
May 29, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #358 MOTION to Seal #357 PROPOSED SEALED Document. (Baker, C.)
May 28, 2015 Filing 359 Memorandum in Support regarding #358 MOTION to Seal #357 PROPOSED SEALED Document filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
May 28, 2015 Filing 358 MOTION to Seal #357 PROPOSED SEALED Document by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
May 28, 2015 Filing 357 SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Materials Reviewed) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/30/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #360 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - In light of the voluminous nature of the parties' recent motion filings in the case, the court requests a courtesy paper set to be provided for its use to the case manager at the United States Courthouse at 413 Middle Street in New Bern, North Carolina, including copies of all filings of or relating to DE 329, (tabbed and indexed); DE 337 (tabbed and indexed); and DE 347 (tabbed and indexed). In addition to these motions and their accompanying memoranda and supporting documents, the court requests the filings submitted in opposition similarly to be provided in paper, and where multiple supporting documents are relied upon in opposition, that those, too, be provided, tabbed and indexed, for the court's ease of reference. Likewise, paper copies of any reply shall be provided. Where the filings already have been made, the parties are allowed 14 days from this date within which to comply with this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/26/2015. (Baker, C.)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #353 Motion to Seal #348 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #349 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #350 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #351 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, and #352 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/26/2015. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2015 Filing 355 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #350 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #349 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #351 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #352 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Millen, Pressly)
May 22, 2015 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #349 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration of Pressly M. Millen - Counsel failed to attach a certificate of service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) and Section F(3) of the Court's CM/ECF Electronic Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel should file a separately captioned certificate of service using the appropriate event located under the 'Civil Events - Service of Process' category. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #353 MOTION to Seal #348 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #349 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #350 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #351 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, and #352 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2015 Filing 354 Memorandum in Support regarding #353 MOTION to Seal #348 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #349 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #350 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #351 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, and #352 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/22/2015 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2015 Filing 353 MOTION to Seal #348 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #349 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #350 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #351 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, and #352 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/22/2015 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2015 Filing 352 SEALED Exhibit C (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #349 SEALED Declaration. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/26/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket entry text pursuant to #356 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
May 22, 2015 Filing 351 SEALED Exhibit B (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #349 SEALED Declaration. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/26/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket entry text pursuant to #356 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
May 22, 2015 Filing 350 SEALED Exhibit A (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #349 SEALED Declaration. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/26/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket entry text pursuant to #356 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2015 Filing 349 SEALED Declaration of Pressly M. Millen(Selected Participants Only)by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/26/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket entry text pursuant to #356 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
May 22, 2015 Filing 348 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/26/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket entry text pursuant to #356 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
May 22, 2015 Filing 347 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendant's Experts Kendyl A. Roman and Christine S. Meyer by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
May 12, 2015 Filing 346 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in Raleigh. Settlement Conference held on 5/12/2015. Parties present with counsel. The court makes opening remarks. The parties break for negotiations. Court declares an impasse. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Horton, B.)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting #342 Motion to Seal #340 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit and #341 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/12/2015. (Baker, C.)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting #335 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer regarding #333 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A, #334 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit B - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/12/2015. (Baker, C.)
May 7, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #342 MOTION to Seal #340 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #341 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. (Baker, C.)
May 6, 2015 Filing 343 Memorandum in Support regarding #342 MOTION to Seal #340 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #341 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
May 6, 2015 Filing 342 MOTION to Seal #340 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #341 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
May 6, 2015 Filing 341 SEALED Exhibit B (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #339 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/12/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #345 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 6, 2015 Filing 340 SEALED Exhibit A (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #339 Declaration. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/12/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #345 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 6, 2015 Filing 339 Declaration of Edward J. Naughton regarding #337 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Part 1, #2 Exhibit C - Part 2) (Naughton, Edward)
May 6, 2015 Filing 338 Memorandum in Support regarding #337 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
May 6, 2015 Filing 337 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Dr. Christopher A. Vellturo by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
May 5, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #335 MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer regarding #333 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A, #334 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit B. (Baker, C.)
May 4, 2015 Filing 336 Memorandum in Support regarding #335 MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer regarding #333 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A, #334 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit B filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
May 4, 2015 Filing 335 MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Edward J. Naughton in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer regarding #333 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit A, #334 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit B by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
May 4, 2015 Filing 334 SEALED Exhibit B regarding #332 Declaration. (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/12/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #344 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 4, 2015 Filing 333 SEALED Exhibit A regarding #332 Declaration. (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/12/2015 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #344 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 4, 2015 Filing 332 Declaration of Edward J. Naughton regarding #329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Curriculum Vitae of James A. Storer, #2 Exhibit D - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 5/5/2015 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
May 4, 2015 Filing 331 Proposed Order regarding #329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
May 4, 2015 Filing 330 Memorandum in Support regarding #329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
May 4, 2015 Filing 329 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Dr. James A. Storer by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #327 Motion for Extension of Certain Dates Regarding Experts - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/17/2015. (Baker, C.)
April 17, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #327 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Dates Regarding Experts. (Baker, C.)
April 17, 2015 Filing 327 Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Dates Regarding Experts by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
April 10, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #318 MOTION for Reconsideration. (Baker, C.)
April 9, 2015 Filing 326 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #318 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Law) (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 4/17/2015 to insert naming convention for exhibit. (Baker, C.)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Order Setting Hearing - Settlement Conference set for 5/12/2015 at 11:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Counsel should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 03/30/2015. (Baker, C.)
March 26, 2015 Filing 324 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #318 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
March 24, 2015 **** Set Hearing - Court-Hosted Settlement Conference set for 5/12/2015 in Raleigh (Courtroom to be Announced) before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Baker, C.)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Upon receipt of the parties' joint notice (DE 323), and having conferred with Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on his availability, the court sets the matter for court-hosted settlement conference at Raleigh before Judge Gates, to commence May 12, 2015. Further order will issue from Judge Gates as to start time that date, any particular preparation required of the parties in advance of conference, and/or any conference requirements, as deemed appropriate. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/24/2015. (Baker, C.)
March 20, 2015 Filing 323 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #321 Status Conference - Joint Notice of Available Dates for a Court-Hosted Settlement Conference. (Millen, Pressly)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER IN ANTICIPATION OF TRIAL - Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2015 at 9:30 AM in New Bern - 2nd Floor Courtroom before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Jury Selection and commencement of Jury Trial set for 9/21/2015. Counsel should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/13/2015. (Baker, C.)
March 13, 2015 Filing 321 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 3/13/2015. Counsel present for all parties. Discovery supplementation expectations and status of lifting of sealed security as to #296 ORDER clarified. Alternative dispute resolution efforts discussed. Case will be submitted to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates to conduct court-hosted settlement conference subsequent to the close of expert discovery. The parties are ordered to file notice on the docket within ten (10) days containing three dates of mutual availability to attend settlement conference. Pre-trial and trial schedule confirmed. Parties are reminded to refer to the pre-trial planning obligations and deadlines contained in #89 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER and the court will also enter a supplemental order with additional information for the parties' reference. (Court Reporter - David Collier) (Baker, C.)
March 2, 2015 Filing 320 Declaration of Edward J. Naughton by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 23, 2010 Interim Judgment of the High Court of England and Wales, #2 Exhibit 2 -January 25, 2013 Final Judgment of the High Court of England and Wales, #3 Exhibit 3 - Nov. 21, 2013 Judgment of the Court of Appeal of England and Wales, #4 Exhibit 4 - Coomer v, Coomer, #5 Exhibit 5 - In re DeCoro USA, Ltd., #6 Exhibit 6 - Johnson v. Kelly, #7 Exhibit 7 - Primary Energy Sys. v. Friedrich Climate Master, #8 Exhibit 8 - Tully v. Johnson) (Naughton, Edward)
March 2, 2015 Filing 319 Memorandum in Support regarding #318 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
March 2, 2015 Filing 318 MOTION for Reconsideration by World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING - The court notices the matter for Rule 16 status conference by telephone on Friday, March 13, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. By the close of business March 11, 2015, any party may submit a suggested agenda for conference discussion. Further notice will follow from the clerk's office providing the professional conference operator's information. Entered by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/27/2015. (Tripp, S.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #314 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports - The court held a telephone conference with counsel on the motion earlier today. Good cause having been shown, the deadline for defendant to produce its expert reports is extended to and including 3/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/23/2015. (Tripp, S.)
February 23, 2015 Motion No Longer Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. MOTION REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates: #314 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports. (Tripp, S.)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER Setting Hearing on #314 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports: The undersigned will conduct a telephone conference with counsel concerning the motion on Monday, 23 February 2015, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/19/2015. (Castania, M.)
February 19, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: #314 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports. (Tripp, S.)
February 19, 2015 Filing 315 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #314 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Press Millen) (Millen, Pressly)
February 17, 2015 Filing 314 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Naughton, Edward)
February 11, 2015 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Joseph Naughton on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Naughton, Edward)
February 11, 2015 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca MacDowell Lecaroz on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Lecaroz, Rebecca)
January 7, 2015 Filing 311 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. Letter regarding consideration of entry of scheduling order. (Millen, Pressly)
December 31, 2014 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for consideration of entry of a scheduling order pursuant to the court's 10/23/2014 Text Order. (Baker, C.)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #286 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/31/2014. (Rudd, D.)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #305 Motion to Seal #304 PROPOSED SEALED Response - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/01/2014. (Baker, C.)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #307 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - Attorney Robert T. Numbers, II terminated as counsel for Plaintiff SAS Institute, Inc. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/24/2014. (Baker, C.)
November 24, 2014 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #307 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Baker, C.)
November 21, 2014 Filing 307 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Numbers, Robert)
November 4, 2014 MOTIONS REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate James E. Gates - Supplemental Court-Ordered Briefing regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders and #305 MOTION to Seal Document #304 PROPOSED SEALED Response. (Baker, C.)
November 4, 2014 Filing 306 Memorandum in Support regarding #305 MOTION to Seal Document #304 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Bennett, Raymond)
November 4, 2014 Filing 305 MOTION to Seal Document #304 PROPOSED SEALED Response, by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bennett, Raymond)
November 4, 2014 Filing 304 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #302 Memorandum in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pressly Millen, #2 Exhibit A - Report) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 12/1/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #309 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #301 Joint Pretrial Report - Having reviewed the parties' joint report on scheduling (DE 301), the court stays entry of a pretrial and trial scheduling order pending decision by the Magistrate Judge on plaintiff's pending motion. Upon entry of that order, the clerk shall refer again the matter to the undersigned for consideration of a scheduling order, also with reference to the parties' report. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/23/2014. (Baker, C.)
October 21, 2014 Filing 303 Declaration regarding #302 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Dennis Cohen by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10/21/14 Email Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10/21/14 Email Part 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10/21/14 Email Part 3) (Cohen, Dennis)
October 21, 2014 Filing 302 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders World Programming Limited's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - The court has reviewed the proposed redacted order, together with correspondence from defense counsel dated October 13, 2014. Unless within ten (10) days, good cause be shown, with specificity, why the proposed redacted material should remain sealed, the court agrees with plaintiff that no word or phrase sought by defendant to be removed rises to a level warranting redaction, and the order will be unsealed in its entirety. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/21/2014. (Baker, C.)
October 20, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE by World Programming Limited regarding #296 SEALED Order - Joint Pretrial Report Pursuant to the Court's September 29, 2014 Order. (Cohen, Dennis)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #298 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Report Dates Pending Resolution of Pending Motion - The deadlines for the parties' expert reports are STAYED pending the court's ruling on SAS's motion for sanctions. WPL shall file a memorandum supporting its contention that the court's summary judgment order moots production of its source code and Bugzilla reports no later than 21 October 2014. The memorandum shall cite the legal authority upon which WPL relies. SAS shall file a memorandum in response to WPLs memorandum within 14 days after the filing of WPL's memorandum. The memorandum shall cite the legal authority upon which SAS relies. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 10/07/2014. (Baker, C.)
October 3, 2014 MOTION REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #298 Joint MOTION to Extend Expert Report Dates Pending Resolution of Pending Motion. (Baker, C.)
October 3, 2014 Filing 298 Joint MOTION to Extend Expert Report Dates Pending Resolution of Pending Motion by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
October 2, 2014 Remark - #297 NOTICE referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Baker, C.)
October 2, 2014 Filing 297 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders - Letter to Judge Gates. (Millen, Pressly)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Where discovery was conducted pursuant to a consent protective order and stipulation of confidentiality, certain filings on which the parties rely in furtherance of their motions were sealed. Within fourteen (14) days, the parties jointly shall return to the court by U.S. Mail, addressed to the case manager, a copy of this order marked to reflect any perceived necessary redactions. Upon the court's inspection and approval, a redacted copy of this sealed order will be made a part of the public record. The parties are DIRECTED to confer within twenty-one (21) days and make joint report to the court as to estimated trial length, alternative suggested trial date settings, suggested alternative dispute resolution techniques to be employed prior to trial in attempt to resolve remaining issues as between the parties, and any other matter bearing on the parties' pretrial and trial preparations. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/29/2014. (Baker, C.) Modified on 11/4/2014 to unseal order pursuant to 10/21/2014 TEXT ORDER, to which no response was received. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #293 Motion for Leave to File a Limited Surreply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions - Defendant's surreply (D.E. 293-1) shall accordingly be considered part of the record on plaintiff's motion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/8/2014. (Tripp, S.)
September 5, 2014 MOTIONS REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders and #293 MOTION for Leave to File a Limited Surreply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (Baker, C.)
September 5, 2014 Filing 294 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #293 MOTION for Leave to File a Limited Surreply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 4, 2014 Filing 293 MOTION for Leave to File a Limited Surreply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply) (Cohen, Dennis)
September 2, 2014 Filing 292 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Response to Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Email regarding Meet and Confer, #3 Exhibit C - Email regarding document production, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Peter Ivey) (Millen, Pressly)
August 19, 2014 Motion No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders. (Baker, C.)
August 19, 2014 Filing 291 NOTICE by World Programming Limited regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders. (Sigmon, Mark) Modified on 8/19/2014 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
August 19, 2014 Filing 290 Declaration of Oliver R. Robinson regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
August 19, 2014 Filing 289 Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Chain) (Cohen, Dennis)
August 19, 2014 Filing 288 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
August 19, 2014 MOTION REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders. (Baker, C.)
August 1, 2014 Filing 287 Memorandum in Support regarding #286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 1, 2014 Filing 286 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Court Orders by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Cohen from Millen dated July 17, 2014, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Cohen to Millen dated July 23, 2014, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to Millen from Cohen dated July 25, 2014, #4 Exhibit D - Letter to Cohen from Millen dated July 28, 2014, #5 Exhibit E - Email from Cohen to Millen dated July 29, 2014, #6 Exhibit F - Email from Millen to Cohen dated July 29, 2014, #7 Exhibit G - Email from Cohen to Millen dated July 30, 2014, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
July 9, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE by World Programming Limited - Letter Regarding United Kingdom Proceeding. (Cohen, Dennis)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER - This case comes before the court on the request for expenses, including attorneys fees, incurred by defendant World Programming Limited (WPL) in bringing its motion (D.E. 178) to enforce the Protective Order in this case (D.E. 106) and impose sanctions. WPL is AWARDED the sum of $15,450.00 in attorney's fees and $638.95 in costs, for a total of $16,088.95, in connection with their motion to enforce the Protective Order and to impose sanctions. SAS shall pay WPL the full sum of $16,088.95 on or before 17 July 2014, unless WPL agrees to payment on a different schedule. Failure by SAS to make timely payment in full could result in the imposition of additional sanctions against it. Payment shall be by check payable to the order of the trust account of WPL's counsel or by such other means as are agreeable to WPL. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 07/03/2014. (Baker, C.)
June 24, 2014 Filing 283 Letter from District Judge Louise W. Flanagan regarding #282 NOTICE. (Tripp, S.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. - Letter to Judge Flanagan. (Millen, Pressly)
June 16, 2014 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript #281 Transcript. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter or transcriber. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter or transcriber, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (Thuemmel Proctor, S.)
June 16, 2014 Filing 281 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT OR MOTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS held on April 24, 2014, before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Transcriber Janice Russell Transcripts. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website. Redaction Request due 7/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2014. (Thuemmel Proctor, S.)
June 11, 2014 Filing 280 RESPONSE regarding #267 Declaration - Plaintiff's Response to Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen Seeking Payment of Attorney's Fees filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
June 9, 2014 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Baker, C.)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #276 Motion to Seal #274 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit and #272 PROPOSED SEALED Reply - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/09/2014. (Baker, C.)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #270 Motion to Seal #269 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration and #268 PROPOSED SEALED Reply - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/09/2014. (Baker, C.)
June 9, 2014 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #270 MOTION to Seal #269 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #268 PROPOSED SEALED Reply and #276 MOTION to Seal #274 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #272 PROPOSED SEALED Reply. (Baker, C.)
June 5, 2014 Filing 277 Memorandum in Support regarding #276 MOTION to Seal #274 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #272 PROPOSED SEALED Reply filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
June 5, 2014 Filing 276 MOTION to Seal #274 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #272 PROPOSED SEALED Reply by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
June 5, 2014 Filing 275 Memorandum in Support regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment - REDACTED VERSION filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
June 5, 2014 Filing 274 SEALED Exhibit 59 - Excerpt of 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #273 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit 60 - Excerpt of Patricia L. Brown Deposition Transcript) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 5/09/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #279 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
June 5, 2014 Filing 273 Declaration regarding #272 SEALED Reply by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 59 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 60 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 61 - Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production) (Cohen, Dennis)
June 5, 2014 Filing 272 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 6/9/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #279 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
June 5, 2014 Filing 271 Memorandum in Support regarding #270 MOTION to Seal #269 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #268 PROPOSED SEALED Reply filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
June 5, 2014 Filing 270 MOTION to Seal #269 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #268 PROPOSED SEALED Reply by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
June 5, 2014 Filing 269 SEALED Declaration of Pressly M. Millen (Selected Participants Only)by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #268 SEALED Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined Document) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 6/09/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #278 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
June 5, 2014 Filing 268 SEALED REPLY (Selected Participants Only) by Pressly M. Millen (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 6/09/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #278 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 28, 2014 Filing 267 Declaration regarding #265 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #241 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen) by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Dated May 14, 2014, #2 Exhibit 2-Letter Dated May 19, 2014, #3 Exhibit 3-Letter Dated May 20, 2014, #4 Exhibit 4-E-Mail Dated May 21, 2014, #5 Exhibit 5-E-Mail Dated May 28, 2014, #6 Exhibit 6-Response E-Mail Dated May 28, 2014) (Cohen, Dennis)
May 28, 2014 Filing 266 RESPONSE to Order regarding #241 Order - (Defendant's Supporting Memorandum For Payment of Attorneys Fees) filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #264 Motion for Extension of Time to File. World Programming Limited has until 5/28/2014 to file its notice or documentation regarding expenses. Plaintiff shall file any response within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 5/27/2014. (Castania, M.)
May 22, 2014 MOTION REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #264 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit or Memorandum for Attorneys Fees. (Baker, C.)
May 22, 2014 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #264 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit or Memorandum for Attorneys Fees. (Baker, C.)
May 21, 2014 Filing 264 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit or Memorandum for Attorneys Fees by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sigmon, Mark)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #260 Motion to Seal #256 PROPOSED SEALED Response and #258 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/21/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #254 Motion to Seal #246 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration and #243 PROPOSED SEALED Response - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/21/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 20, 2014 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #260 MOTION to Seal #256 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #258 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit and #254 MOTION to Seal #246 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #243 PROPOSED SEALED Response. (Baker, C.)
May 19, 2014 Filing 261 Memorandum in Support regarding #260 MOTION to Seal Document #256 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #258 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
May 19, 2014 Filing 260 MOTION to Seal Document #256 PROPOSED SEALED Response, #258 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
May 19, 2014 Filing 259 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment REDACTED VERSION filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
May 19, 2014 Filing 258 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #257 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 55-Robinson Deposition Volumes 1 and 2 (Additional Excerpts), #2 Exhibit 56-Waselewski Deposition (Additional Excerpts), #3 Exhibit 57-Opinion of Simon Thorley Q.C, #4 Exhibit 58-Claimant's Responses to Defedant's Request for Further Information) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 5/21/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #262 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 19, 2014 Filing 257 Declaration regarding #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Declaration of Dennis Cohen in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54-Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 55-Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 56-Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 57-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 58-Filed Under Seal) (Cohen, Dennis)
May 19, 2014 Filing 256 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only) by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 5/21/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #263 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 19, 2014 Filing 255 Memorandum in Support regarding #254 MOTION to Seal Document #246 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #243 PROPOSED SEALED Response, filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 254 MOTION to Seal #246 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #243 PROPOSED SEALED Response, by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 253 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #247 Declaration, Exhibit A - Index of SAS Copyrigh Registrations and Exhibit C - Index to WPS Reference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Index to WPS Reference) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 252 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #247 Declaration, Exhibit B, Part 11 and Exhibit B, Part 12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Part 12 - Copyright registrations) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #247 Declaration, Exhibit B, Part 9 and Exhibit B, Part 10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Part 10 - copyright registrations) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #247 Declaration, Exhibit B, Part 7 and Exhibit B, Part 8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Part 8 - copyright registrations) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #247 Declaration, Exhibit B, Part 5 and Exhibit B, Part 6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Part 6 - Copyright Registrations) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #247 Declaration, Exhibit B, Part 3 and Exhibit B, Part 4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Part 4 - Copyright registrations) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 247 Declaration regarding #243 SEALED Response, Second Declaration of Patricia L. Brown by SAS Institute Inc. filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Part 1 - Copyright registrations, #2 Exhibit B, Part 2 - Copyright registrations) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 246 SEALED Declaration (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #243 SEALED Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2a - Excerpts of transcript, #2 Exhibit 2b - Excerpts of transcript, #3 Exhibit 3a - Invoice, #4 Exhibit 3b - Invoice, #5 Exhibit 3c - Reference, #6 Exhibit 3d - Reference, #7 Exhibit 3e - Reference, #8 Exhibit 3f - Reference, #9 Exhibit 3g - Email, #10 Exhibit 3h - Email, #11 Exhibit 3i - Notice) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/21/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #262 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 19, 2014 Filing 245 Declaration regarding #243 SEALED Response - Declaration of Dr. James E. Gentle by SAS Institute Inc. filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Materials Received) (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 244 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Affidavit of Alan Richard Eaton filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 243 SEALED RESPONSE (Selected Participants Only) by SAS Institute, Inc. (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Document) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 5/21/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #262 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
May 5, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #212 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support - Plaintiff's Notice of Erratum in Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Millen, Pressly)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #178 Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and For Sanctions - Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 04/30/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #198 Motion to Compel Production of Documents - Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 04/30/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 24, 2014 Filing 239 Exhibit List from motion hearing held 4/24/14. Exhibits are sealed per directive of the Court. (Attachments: #1 World Programming Ltd Customer List, #2 Spreadsheet, #3 Document SAS produced showing data, #4 email of names of team members, #5 Document produced to WPL's counsel, #6 Email dated 11/22/10, #7 Email dated 11/10/12, #8 Letter regarding license agreement) (Powers, S.)
April 24, 2014 Filing 238 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in Raleigh - Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2014 regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions filed by World Programming Limited. Parties for both sides present. Attorneys for both sides address issues raised by the court. Court orders the exhibits sealed. Taken under advisment, written order to follow. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Powers, S.)
April 22, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE by World Programming Limited regarding #221 Declaration - Exhibit 39 - Brown II Deposition Defendant's Exhibit 38. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 21, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district counsel by Krista S. Schwartz on behalf of SAS Institute Inc. (Schwartz, Krista)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #232 Amended Motion to Seal #229 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #226 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #228 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #227 PROPOSED SEALED - Defendant shall re-file Exhibit 39 to the Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen as a public event. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/17/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #218 Motion to Seal #215 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #217 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #214 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #213 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #216 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #212 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/17/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 233 Memorandum in Support regarding #232 Amended MOTION to Seal #229 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #226 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #228 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #227 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 16, 2014 Filing 232 Amended MOTION to Seal #229 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #226 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #228 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #227 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
April 15, 2014 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #230 MOTION to Seal and #218 MOTION to Seal. (Baker, C.)
April 14, 2014 Filing 231 Memorandum in Support regarding #230 MOTION to Seal #229 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #226 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #228 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #227 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 230 MOTION to Seal #229 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #226 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #228 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #227 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 229 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #221 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48-Brown II Deposition, #2 Exhibit 49-Apr. 22, 2008 Email and Attachments, #3 Exhibit 50-Waselewski Deposition Defendant's Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 51-Carlton Deposition, #5 Exhibit 52-UK Court Feb. 13, 2013 Order) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 04/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #235 ORDER.
April 14, 2014 Filing 228 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #221 Declaration.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20-Waselewski Deposition Defendant's Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 21-Sparkes Statement, #3 Exhibit 22-Sparkes Statement Exhibit SS-1, #4 Exhibit 23-Robinson Deposition Plaintiff's Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 24-Claim Form, #6 Exhibit 25-UK Interim Judgment, #7 Exhibit 26-Re-Re-Amended Particulars of Claim, #8 Exhibit 27-UK Court Apr. 16, 2010 Order, #9 Exhibit 28-UK Court July 28, 2010 Order, #10 Exhibit 29-CJEU Nov. 29, 2011 Opinion, #11 Exhibit 30-CJEU May 2, 2012 Judgment, #12 Exhibit 31-UK Final Judgment, #13 Exhibit 32-UK Appellate Judgment, #14 Exhibit 33-UK Appellate Order, #15 Exhibit 35-July 25, 2010 Email Chain, #16 Exhibit 36-SAS Presentation, #17 Exhibit 37-Nov. 6, 2012 email chain, #18 Exhibit 39-Brown II Deposition Defendant's Exhibit 38, #19 Exhibit 41-Creech Deposition, #20 Exhibit 42-Brown I Deposition) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 04/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #235 ORDER.
April 14, 2014 Filing 227 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #221 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-Manning Statement, #2 Exhibit 4-P. Quarendon Statement, #3 Exhibit 5-Langston Deposition Day 2, #4 Exhibit 6-Waselewski Deposition, #5 Exhibit 7-Sommer et al., #6 Exhibit 11-T. Quarendon Deposition, #7 Exhibit 12-Robinson Statement, #8 Exhibit 13-T. Quarendon Statement, #9 Exhibit 14-Weekes Statement, #10 Exhibit 16-Robinson Deposition, #11 Exhibit 17-UK Trial Bundle K.1, #12 Exhibit 18-Bagshaw Statement) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 04/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #235 ORDER.
April 14, 2014 Filing 226 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 04/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #235 ORDER.
April 14, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE by World Programming Limited regarding #224 Memorandum in Support - Appendix of Unpublished Cases Cited in Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Tab 1-ACS Partners LLC v Americon Group Inc, #2 Tab 2-Bank of America NA v Old Republic Ins Co, #3 Tab 3-Champion Pro Consulting Group Inc v Impact Sports Football LLC, #4 Tab 4-Gillani Consulting Inc v Daewoo Heavy Industries America Corp, #5 Tab 5-In re Lear Corp, #6 Tab 6-Mecklenburg County v Nortel Government Solutions Inc, #7 Tab 7-Scott v Metropolitan Health Corp, #8 Tab 8-Stewart v US Corrections Corp, #9 Tab 9-Thee Dollhouse Productions NC Inc v Fairchild) (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 224 Memorandum in Support regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment - REDACTED VERSION filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 223 AFFIDAVIT in Support regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Affidavit of Anthony J. Barr filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-Transcript of Anthony Barr Testimony - June 24, 1983 pgs. 1 - 43 - Part I, #2 Exhibit A2-Transcript of Anthony Barr Testimony - June 24, 1983 pgs. 44-83 - Part II, #3 Exhibit A3-Transcript of Anthony Barr Testimony - June 24, 1983 pgs. 84 - Ex. 2- Part III, #4 Exhibit A4-Transcript of Anthony Barr Testimony - June 24, 1983 Exhibit 3 - Exhibit 9 - Part IV) (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 222 AFFIDAVIT in Support regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Affidavit of Samuel James Manning filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 221 Declaration regarding #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Dale & Lewis, #2 Exhibit 2-Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3-Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5-Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6-Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7-Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8-Bass, #9 Exhibit 9-Dallal, #10 Exhibit 10-Software History, #11 Exhibit 11-Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12-Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 13-Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 14-Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 15-Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Admission, #16 Exhibit 16-Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 17-Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 18-Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 19-Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 20-Filed Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 21-Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 22-Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 23-Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 24-Filed Under Seal, #25 Exhibit 25-Filed Under Seal, #26 Exhibit 26-Filed Under Seal, #27 Exhibit 27-Filed Under Seal, #28 Exhibit 28-Filed Under Seal, #29 Exhibit 29-Filed Under Seal, #30 Exhibit 30-Filed Under Seal, #31 Exhibit 31-Filed Under Seal, #32 Exhibit 32-Filed Under Seal, #33 Exhibit 33-Filed Under Seal, #34 Exhibit 34-Directive 2009 24 EC, #35 Exhibit 35-Filed Under Seal, #36 Exhibit 36-Filed Under Seal, #37 Exhibit 37-Filed Under Seal, #38 Exhibit 38-July 31, 1978 Final Report, #39 Exhibit 39-Filed Under Seal, #40 Exhibit 40-Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendant's First Interrogatories, #41 Exhibit 41-Filed Under Seal, #42 Exhibit 42-Filed Under Seal, #43 Exhibit 43-Filed Under Seal, #44 Exhibit 44-Oracle Waveset Website, #45 Exhibit 45-Microsoft Visual Studio & Licensing White Paper, #46 Exhibit 46-TokuDB Software License Agreement, #47 Exhibit 47-Microsoft Windows Activation White Paper, #48 Exhibit 48-Filed Under Seal, #49 Exhibit 49-Filed Under Seal, #50 Exhibit 50-Filed Under Seal, #51 Exhibit 51-Filed Under Seal, #52 Exhibit 52-Filed Under Seal, #53 Exhibit 53-Robinson II Deposition Plaintiff's Exhibit 57A, 57B, 57C, 57D) (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION for Summary Judgment by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 219 Memorandum in Support regarding #218 MOTION to Seal #215 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #217 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #214 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #213 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #216 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #212 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
April 14, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION to Seal #215 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #217 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #214 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #213 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #216 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #212 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
April 14, 2014 Filing 217 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #213 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3iii - PX 190 Email, #2 Exhibit 3jjj - PX 191 Email, #3 Exhibit 3kkk - PX 193 Email, #4 Exhibit 3lll - PX 200 Email, #5 Exhibit 3mmm - PX 201 Email, #6 Exhibit 3nnn - PX 202 Email, #7 Exhibit 3ooo - DX 25 Agreement, #8 Exhibit 4a - Bagshaw Statement, #9 Exhibit 4b - Vibert Statement, #10 Exhibit 4c - Weekes Statement) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 4/17/2014 (Baker, C.) Modified on 4/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #234 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
April 14, 2014 Filing 216 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #213 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3ss - PX 74 Bugzilla Report, #2 Exhibit 3tt - PX 77 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3uu - PX 79 Bugzilla Report, #4 Exhibit 3vv - PX 80 Bugzilla Report, #5 Exhibit 3ww - PX 87 Email, #6 Exhibit 3xx - PX 92 Email, #7 Exhibit 3yy - PX 100 Email, #8 Exhibit 3zz - PX 102 Email, #9 Exhibit 3aaa - PX 103 Email, #10 Exhibit 3bbb - PX 160 Email, #11 Exhibit 3ccc - PX 161 Email, #12 Exhibit 3ddd - PX 163 Email, #13 Exhibit 3eee - PX 165 Email, #14 Exhibit 3fff - PX 166 Email, #15 Exhibit 3ggg - PX 187 Bugzilla Report, #16 Exhibit 3hhh - PX 188 Email) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 4/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #234 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
April 14, 2014 Filing 215 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #213 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3bb - PX 47 Email, #2 Exhibit 3cc - PX 48 Email, #3 Exhibit 3dd - PX 49 Email, #4 Exhibit 3ee - PX 50 Email, #5 Exhibit 3ff - PX 51 Email, #6 Exhibit 3gg - PX 54 Email, #7 Exhibit 3hh - PX 58 Exhibit from Statement, #8 Exhibit 3ii - PX 59 Bugzilla Report, #9 Exhibit 3jj - PX 60 Bugzilla Report, #10 Exhibit 3kk - PX 61 Email, #11 Exhibit 3ll - PX 63 Log file, #12 Exhibit 3mm - PX 64 Email, #13 Exhibit 3nn - PX 65 Letter, #14 Exhibit 3oo - PX 66 Email, #15 Exhibit 3pp - PX 67 Email, #16 Exhibit 3qq - PX 69 Email, #17 Exhibit 3rr - PX 71 Email) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 4/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #234 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
April 14, 2014 Filing 214 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #213 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3i - PX 21 Email, #2 Exhibit 3j - PX23 - Email, #3 Exhibit 3k - PX 24 Email, #4 Exhibit 3l - PX25 Email, #5 Exhibit 3m - PX 26 Presentation, #6 Exhibit 3n - PX 27 Email, #7 Exhibit 3o - PX 28 Email, #8 Exhibit 3p - PX 31 Presentation, #9 Exhibit 3q - PX 32 Email, #10 Exhibit 3r - PX 34 Bugzilla Report, #11 Exhibit 3s - PX 35 Bugzilla Report, #12 Exhibit 3t - PX 36 Bugzilla Report, #13 Exhibit 3u - PX 37 Bugzilla Report, #14 Exhibit 3v - PX 38 Bugzilla Report, #15 Exhibit 3w - PX 39 Bugzilla Report, #16 Exhibit 3x - PX 40 Bugzilla Report, #17 Exhibit 3y - PX 44 Bugzilla Reportr, #18 Exhibit 3z - PX 45 Bugzilla Report, #19 Exhibit 3aa - PX 46 Email) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 4/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #234 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
April 14, 2014 Filing 213 SEALED Declaration of Pressly M. Millen (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2a - Excerpts of Manning transcript, #2 Exhibit 2b - Excerpts of Robinson transcript, #3 Exhibit 2c - Excerpts of Robinson transcript, #4 Exhibit 2d - Excerpts of Waselewski transcript, #5 Exhibit 2e - Excerpts of Rack transcript, #6 Exhibit 2f - Excerpts of Quarendon transcript, #7 Exhibit 3a - PX7 - Email, #8 Exhibit 3b - PX 8 Email, #9 Exhibit 3c - PX 10 Email, #10 Exhibit 3d - PX 14 Email, #11 Exhibit 3e - PX 15 Presentation, #12 Exhibit 3f - PX 17 Email, #13 Exhibit 3g - PX 18 Email, #14 Exhibit 3h - PX 20 Email) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 4/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #234 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
April 14, 2014 Filing 212 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 4/17/2014 to remove 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #234 ORDER. (Baker, C.).
April 14, 2014 Filing 211 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Pat Brown) (Millen, Pressly)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Setting Hearing regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions - Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2014 at 2:30 PM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 04/08/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #208 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment - The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file briefs in support of motions for summary judgment due on April 14, 2014, opposition briefs due on May 19, 2014 and reply briefs due June 5, 2014 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/27/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 27, 2014 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #208 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (Baker, C.)
March 27, 2014 Filing 208 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment) (Cohen, Dennis)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Extension of Time - (Joint Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Page Limit and Briefing Schedule) - Memoranda in support of, and in opposition to, summary judgment motions shall be no longer than sixty (60) pages, excluding the certificate of service page. Responses and accompanying documents shall be filed with thirty (30) days after service of a motion for summary judgment. Reply briefs shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages in length, excluding the certificate of service page. Where potentially voluminous summary judgment filings are foreshadowed, the parties are DIRECTED to provide tabbed and indexed courtesy copies of all summary judgment briefing and accompanying documents to the case manager at New Bern. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/18/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 14, 2014 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #206 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Extension of Time - (Joint Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Page Limit and Briefing Schedule). (Baker, C.)
March 14, 2014 Filing 206 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, , MOTION for Extension of Time - (Joint Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Page Limit and Briefing Schedule) by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Unreported Case-Hillyard Enterprises, Inc. v Warren Oil Company, Inc., #2 Exhibit B-Unreported Case-Keith James Sears v. Debra Price, #3 Exhibit C-Unreported Case-Calvia Lynn Hill v. North Carolina Department of Correction, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #203 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Provision of Additional Discovery to Defendant - Plaintiff shall have until 17 march 2014 to produce the additional discovery required by the court's 3 March 2014 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 03/11/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 11, 2014 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #198 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and #203 Consent MOTION Upon Consent for Extension of One Week to Complete Provision of Additional Discovery to Defendant. (Baker, C.)
March 10, 2014 Filing 204 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #198 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited. (Gabriel, Jessie)
March 10, 2014 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #203 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Provision of Additional Discovery to Defendant. (Baker, C.)
March 10, 2014 Filing 203 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Provision of Additional Discovery to Defendant by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
March 4, 2014 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions. (Baker, C.)
March 4, 2014 Filing 202 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Patricia Brown, #2 Exhibit B - Emails dated December 6 2013 and August 27 2013) (Millen, Pressly)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #164 Second Motion to Compel - SAS shall serve a verification with its supplemental answers to Interrogatories Nos. 20 and 21, and shall serve with its supplemental production in response to Production Requests Nos. 33 to 36 a duly signed supplemental response to these requests identifying the documents being produced. Each party shall bear its own costs incurred on the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 03/03/2014. (Baker, C.)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER establishing requirements for the deposition of Thomas Quarendon. The deposition shall take place as scheduled. This order supersedes any contrary provisions of the Protective Order [D.E.197]. Counsel are directed to read this order in its entirety for additional instructions. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/27/2014. (Richards, J.)
February 25, 2014 Filing 199 Memorandum in Support regarding #198 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
February 25, 2014 Filing 198 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Fourth Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Plaintiff's Fourth Request for Production, #3 Exhibit C1 - Emails to and from SAS Counsel and WPL counsel, #4 Exhibit C2 - Letter to Dennis Cohen dated February 3, 2014, #5 Exhibit C3 - Letter to Raymond Bennett dated February 5, 2014, #6 Exhibit C4 - Email from Ray Bennett to Dennis Cohen dated February 13, 2014, #7 Exhibit C5 - Letter to Raymond Bennett dated February 18, 2014, #8 Exhibit C6 - Letter to Jessie Gabriel dated February 20, 2014, #9 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER - The court directs that any obligation defendant may have to produce documents or information it deems protected as confidential under the Protective Order (D.E. 29, amended at D.E. 106) is stayed pending resolution of defendant's motion to enforce the Protective Order and for sanctions (D.E. 178), which is not yet ripe for ruling. To the extent that the motion to compel plaintiff intends to file relates to the production of documents and information being withheld on the basis of such confidentiality, plaintiff's obligation to file such motion is similarly stayed. To the extent that plaintiff's intended motion to compel relates to the production of any other documents or information, plaintiff shall file its motion by 25 February 2014. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/24/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - The Amended Case Management Order [Dkt. #89, at II.C] is hereby AMENDED to extend the close of fact discovery through and including February 28, 2014. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/24/2014. (Baker, C.)
February 24, 2014 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #195 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Baker, C.)
February 24, 2014 Filing 195 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Period for an Additional Four Days by SAS Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
February 21, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE by World Programming Limited regarding #193 Notice-(other), in Response to Plaintiff's Notice of its Intention to File a Motion to Compel (Gabriel, Jessie)
February 20, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. Notice Regarding Discovery Conference Requirement in Section II.E of the Amended Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Response to Plaintiff's Fourth Request for Production, #2 Attachment 2 - Various Emails and Letters) (Bennett, Raymond)
February 20, 2014 Filing 192 *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #193 * - NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. regarding #174 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Response to Plaintiff's Fourth Request for Production, #2 Attachment 2 - Various emails and letters) (Bennett, Raymond) Modified on 2/21/2014 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions - Responses due by 3/4/2014. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/19/2014. (Baker, C.)
February 19, 2014 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #190 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions. (Baker, C.)
February 19, 2014 Filing 190 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bennett, Raymond)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions filed by World Programming Limited - Plaintiffs' response to motion filed February 12, 2014, to enforce protective order and for sanctions, shall be due Tuesday, February 25, 2014. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/18/2014. (Baker, C.)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #181 Motion to Seal #184 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #185 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #186 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #187 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, and #188 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/18/2014 (Baker, C.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 188 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (Exhibit E to Declaration of Dennis Cohen) (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #180 Declaration. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/18/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #189 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 187 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (Exhibit D to Declaration of Dennis Cohen) (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #180 Declaration. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/18/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #189 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 186 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (Exhibit B to Declaration of Dennis Cohen) (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #180 Declaration. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/18/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #189 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 185 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (Exhibit A to Declaration of Dennis Cohen) (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #180 Declaration. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/18/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #189 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 184 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by World Programming Limited (available to: Plaintiff SAS Institute Inc., Defendant World Programming Limited) regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/18/2014 to removed 'proposed' from docket text pursuant to #189 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
February 13, 2014 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #181 Motion to Seal - Counsel has failed to follow the court's policy in Section T(1)(a)5 of the CM/ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual which dictates filing first the proposed sealed document(s) relating to the underlying motion. Counsel is directed to file those items now using the appropriate sealed civil filing events available. (Baker, C.)
February 12, 2014 Filing 183 Memorandum in Support regarding #181 MOTION to Seal #184 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #185 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #186 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #187 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #188 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/14/2014 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
February 12, 2014 Filing 182 Proposed Order regarding #181 MOTION to Seal #184 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #185 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #186 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #187 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #188 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/14/2014 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
February 12, 2014 Filing 181 MOTION to Seal #184 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, #185 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #186 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #187 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #188 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/14/2014 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
February 12, 2014 Filing 180 Declaration regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions of Dennis O. Cohen by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - September 6, 2013 Email from Pressly Millen to Dennis Cohen, #4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 2/13/2014 to provisionally seal docket entry. (Baker, C.)
February 12, 2014 Filing 179 Memorandum in Support regarding #178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
February 12, 2014 Filing 178 MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and for Sanctions by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enforce Protective Order and for Sanctions) (Cohen, Dennis)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Period for Two Business Days or Alternatively, to Allow One Deposition to Occur After the Close of Fact Discovery - The Amended Case Management Order [Dkt. #89, at II.C] is hereby AMENDED to extend the close of fact discovery through and including February 24, 2014. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/10/2014. (Baker, C.)
February 7, 2014 Filing 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Period for Two Business Days or Alternatively, to Allow One Deposition to Occur After the Close of Fact Discovery by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
February 6, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie M. Gabriel on behalf of World Programming Limited. (Gabriel, Jessie)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - All fact discovery shall be commenced or served in time to be completed by 20 February 2014. All other deadlines in the existing Amended Case Management Order remain ineffect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 01/09/2014. (Baker, C.)
January 8, 2014 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #171 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Baker, C.)
January 7, 2014 Filing 173 Declaration regarding #171 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Dennis O. Cohen by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1/2/14 Letter from Pressely Millen to Dennis Cohen, #2 Exhibit B - 12/17/13 Letter from Jesse Gabriel to Pressly Millen, #3 Exhibit C - Supplemental Initial Disclosures of SAS Institute, #4 Exhibit D - Supplemental Disclosure of World Programming Limited, #5 Exhibit E -12/12/13 Letter from Dennis Cohen to Pressly Millen, #6 Exhibit F - 12/16/13 Letter from Pressly Millen to Dennis Cohen, #7 Exhibit G - Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
January 7, 2014 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #171 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
January 6, 2014 Filing 171 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Dennis Cohen dated January 3, 2014, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and denying as moot in part #124 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/04/2013. (Baker, C.)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part #147 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents - Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 11/26/2013. (Baker, C.)
November 18, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #164 Second MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. (Baker, C.)
November 18, 2013 Filing 168 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #164 Second MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Second Request for Production, #3 Exhibit C - Email dated October 2, 2013, #4 Exhibit D - Letter dated October 14, 2013, #5 Exhibit E - Email dated November 1, 2013) (Millen, Pressly)
November 4, 2013 Filing 167 Proposed Order regarding #164 Second MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
November 4, 2013 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #164 Motion to Compel - Pursuant to the judge's practice preferences on the court's website, counsel must submit a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Baker, C.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 166 Memorandum in Support regarding #164 Second MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
November 1, 2013 Filing 165 Declaration regarding #164 Second MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Dennis O. Cohen by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Second Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Second Request for Production, #3 Exhibit C - September 18, 2013 Letter from Dennis Cohen to Pressly Millen, #4 Exhibit D - September 30, 2013 Letter from Pressly Millen to Dennis Cohen, #5 Exhibit E - October 18, 2013 Email from Dennis Cohen to Pressly Millen, #6 Exhibit F - Email Chain Between Dennis Cohen, Pressly Millen, and Raymond Bennett, Between October 18-31, 2013) (Cohen, Dennis)
November 1, 2013 Filing 164 Second MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
November 1, 2013 Filing 163 NOTICE by World Programming Limited of Filing of Letter to Judge Flanagan Regarding Their Intent to File a Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Second Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Second Request for Production, #3 Exhibit C - September 18, 2013 letter to Pressly M. Millen, #4 Exhibit D - September 30, 2013 letter from Pressly M. Millen) (Cohen, Dennis)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel - The time in which defendant may file a motion to compel discovery with respect to alleged deficiencies in plaintiff's written responses to defendant's Second Set of Discovery Requests is extended until 1 November 2013. All other deadlines in the existing Case Management Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 10/17/2013. (Baker, C.)
October 17, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #161 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
October 16, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #161 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
October 15, 2013 Filing 161 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Dennis)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel - The time in which defendant may file a motion to compel discovery with respect to alleged deficiencies in plaintiff's written responses to defendant's Second Set of Discovery Requests is extended until 18 October 2013. All other deadlines in the existing Amended Case Management Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 10/04/2013. (Baker, C.)
October 4, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #159 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
October 4, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #159 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 159 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For Extension of Time) (Cohen, Dennis)
September 18, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #147 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. (Baker, C.)
September 18, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #147 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. (Baker, C.)
September 16, 2013 Filing 158 Declaration regarding #147 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by World Programming Limited filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Re-Amended Particulars of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2-World Programming Limited's Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production) (Cohen, Dennis)
September 16, 2013 Filing 157 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #147 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #152 MOTION to Seal Attachment 1 to #151 Memorandum in Support and #150 MOTION to Seal - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/10/2013. (Baker, C.)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #150 MOTION to Seal Attachment 2 to #141 Notice - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/11/2013. (Baker, C.)
September 11, 2013 Filing 154 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #150 MOTION to Seal Document #141 Notice filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
September 11, 2013 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagagn - #150 MOTION to Seal Attachment 2 to #141 Notice and #152 MOTION to Seal Attachment 1 to #151 Memorandum in Support and #150 MOTION to Seal. (Baker, C.)
September 10, 2013 Filing 153 Memorandum in Support regarding #152 MOTION to Seal Attachment 1 to #151 Memorandum in Support and #150 MOTION to Seal filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 9/11/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
September 10, 2013 Filing 152 MOTION to Seal Attachment 1 to #151 Memorandum in Support and #150 MOTION to Seal by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Seal) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 9/11/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
September 10, 2013 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #151 Memorandum in Support and #150 Motion to Seal Document - Pursuant to Section (L)(2) of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, attachments and exhibits must be identified with a clear and complete description of the document in the docket text (e.g. 'Exhibit 1' is insufficient. 'Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Jane Doe' would meet the requirement.) Future filings must comply with this policy to avoid need for refiling. The clerk's office has corrected the deficiency in this instance. (Baker, C.)
September 10, 2013 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding #151 Memorandum in Support and #150 Motion to Seal Document - The clerk's office has provisionally sealed Exhibit 1 to each of these filings where counsel appears to have publicly filed without redaction the document already under consideration for sealing originally noted as an attachment to docket entry #141 . Counsel is directed to file the appropriate motion to also maintain the sealing of these entries. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2013 Filing 151 Memorandum in Support regarding #150 MOTION to Seal Attachment 2 to #141 Notice filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 9/10/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.) Modified on 9/11/2013 to permanently seal Attachment 1 pursuant to #156 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2013 Filing 150 MOTION to Seal Attachment 2 to #141 Notice by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* - Exhibit 1 - Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Seal) (Cohen, Dennis) Modified on 9/10/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.) Modified on 9/11/2013 to permanently seal Attachment 1 pursuant to #156 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
September 3, 2013 Filing 149 ANSWER to #143 Amended Complaint by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
August 28, 2013 Filing 148 Memorandum in Support regarding #147 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Higher Education - Course and Qualifications) (Millen, Pressly)
August 28, 2013 Filing 147 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit A-2 Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit B-1 Redacted Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit B-2 Response to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - For good cause shown, the motion is ALLOWED and the Amended Case Management Order is modified as follows: (1) All fact discovery shall be commenced or served in time to be completed by 1/20/2014 and (2) All other deadlines in the existing Amended Case Management Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 8/20/2013. (Tripp, S.)
August 20, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates: #145 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Period. (Tripp, S.)
August 20, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: #145 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Period. (Tripp, S.)
August 20, 2013 Filing 145 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Period by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
August 14, 2013 Filing 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates: Telephone Conference held on 14 August 2013. Pressly M. Millen for plaintiff; Dennis O. Cohen for defendant. Court heard from parties regarding status of discovery proceedings. Parties to file joint motion to extend the deadline for fact discovery in amended case management order by 23 August 2013. The motion to compel which is the subject of the order at D.E. 142 may be filed without any further telephone conference. See Am. CMO II.E. (D.E. 89). (CHAM, MB)
August 14, 2013 Filing 143 AMENDED COMPLAINT against World Programming Limited filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #140 Corrected Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel - For good cause shown, the motion is ALLOWED and the Amended Case Management Order is modified as follows: The time in which plaintiff may file a motion to compel discovery with respect to alleged deficiencies in defendant's written responses to plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Third Request for Production is extended until 8/28/2013. All other deadlines in the existing Amended Case Management Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 8/12/2013. (Tripp, S.)
August 12, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE by SAS Institute Inc. LETTER TO JUDGE FLANAGAN (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT 1 - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD REQUEST TO PRODUCE, #2 *SEALED* - ATTACHMENT 2 - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES, #3 ATTACHMENT 3 - LETTER TO DENNIS COHEN ON 072513) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 9/11/2013 to permanently seal Attachment 2 pursuant to #155 ORDER. (Baker, C.)
August 12, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #140 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
August 9, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #140 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
August 9, 2013 Filing 140 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
August 9, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flangan #139 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. (Baker, C.)
August 9, 2013 Filing 139 *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #140 * - Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 8/9/2013 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint - Plaintiff may file its amended pleading in the form proposed at D.E. 130-1 by 14 August 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 08/07/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #122 Motion to Compel Production of Documents - Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 08/06/2013. (Baker, C.)
July 3, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #130 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (Baker, C.)
June 18, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #130 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (Baker, C.)
June 17, 2013 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #130 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - All discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by 20 September 2013. All other deadlines in the existing Amended Case Management Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 06/14/2013. (Baker, C.)
May 31, 2013 Filing 134 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #130 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Unpublished Case Montgomery v. Anne Arundel Cnty., Md., #2 Exhibit B: Unpublished Case Stanley v. Huntington Natl Bank, #3 Exhibit C: Unpublished Case Julian v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.) (Cohen, Dennis)
May 10, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Baker, C.)
May 9, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Baker, C.)
May 9, 2013 Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
May 7, 2013 Filing 132 Proposed Order regarding #130 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
May 7, 2013 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #130 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint - Pursuant to the judge's practice preferences on the court's website, counsel must submit a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Baker, C.)
May 7, 2013 Filing 131 Memorandum in Support regarding #130 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
May 7, 2013 Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - redlined proposed First Amended Complaint) (Millen, Pressly)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #107 Motion to Amend #89 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER and denying #111 Motion to Bifurcate the Proceedings - Section I.G of the Amended Case Management Order is hereby AMENDED to allow each party to take a total of five depositions. All other provisions in the existing Amended Case Management Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 04/25/2013. (Baker, C.)
April 23, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #122 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and #124 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff. (Baker, C.)
April 22, 2013 Filing 128 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #122 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 22, 2013 Filing 127 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #124 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Peter Brown dated 041513, #2 Exhibit B - Manual Comparison Tables, #3 Exhibit C - Descriptive Comparisons between SAS and WPL Manuals) (Millen, Pressly)
April 16, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #111 MOTION to Bifurcate the Proceedings. (Baker, C.)
April 15, 2013 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #111 MOTION to Bifurcate the Proceedings filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
April 10, 2013 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - #107 MOTION to Amend #89 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Baker, C.)
April 3, 2013 Filing 125 Memorandum in Support regarding #124 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
April 3, 2013 Filing 124 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis Cohen in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit A to Cohen Declaration - Defendant's First Request for Production, #3 Exhibit B to Cohen Declaration - Defendant's First Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit C to Cohen Declaration - Plaintiff's Response to Defendnat's First Request for Production, #5 Exhibit D to Cohen Declaration - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit E to Cohen Declaration - Peter Brown's 2/25/13 Letter to Pressly Millen, #7 Exhibit F to Cohen Declaration - Pressly Millen's 3/11/13 Letter to Peter Brown, #8 Exhibit G to Cohen Declaration - Pressly Millen's 3/26/13 Letter to Peter Brown, #9 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff) (Cohen, Dennis)
April 3, 2013 Filing 123 Memorandum in Support regarding #122 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents) (Millen, Pressly)
April 3, 2013 Filing 122 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pressly M. Millen, #2 Exhibit A - Letter regarding Objections qnd Responses, #3 Exhibit B - Letter regarding meet and confer, #4 Exhibit C - Email regarding Request No 10, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly)
March 29, 2013 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition regarding #111 MOTION to Bifurcate the Proceedings (Declaration of Dennis O. Cohen) filed by World Programming Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - judgment of the England and Wales High Court) (Cohen, Dennis)
March 29, 2013 Filing 120 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #111 MOTION to Bifurcate the Proceedings filed by World Programming Limited. (Cohen, Dennis)
March 25, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis O. Cohen on behalf of World Programming Limited (Cohen, Dennis)
March 14, 2013 Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #107 MOTION to Amend #89 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pressly Millen, #2 Exhibit A - January 29 2013 Email) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 3/18/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
March 13, 2013 Filing 117 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates: Telephone Conference held on 13 March 2013. Pressly Millen, Raymond Bennett for plaintiff; Mark Sigmon, Dennis Cohen for defendant. Court heard from parties regarding pending discovery disputes. Counsel directed to meet and confer in good faith by 27 March 2013 in an attempt to resolve all pending discovery disputes (including but not limited to those relating to plaintiff's responses to defendant's first request for production and to defendant's first interrogatories). Any motion to compel relating to unresolved disputes shall be filed within one week after counsel's final meet and confer session, but in no event later than 3 April 2013. Any motion to compel shall state the dates on which counsel met and conferred. (CHAM, MB)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER - This case comes before the court at the direction of presiding District Judge Louise W. Flanagan for the scheduling of a telephone conference with counsel before the undersigned concerning the pending dispute about the sufficiency of plaintiff's responses to defendant's requests for admissions and interrogatories. The undersigned shall conduct this telephone conference on Wednesday, 13 March 2013, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for defendant is directed to call plaintiff's counsel, and once counsel for both parties are on the line, defendant's counsel shall call Judge Gates' chambers at the telephone number provided in the attached order to begin the telephone conference. The telephone conference will be recorded. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 03/12/2013. (Baker, C.)
March 12, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Burley Bayard Mitchell, Jr. on behalf of SAS Institute Inc. (Mitchell, Burley)
March 12, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Pressly M. Millen on behalf of SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
March 12, 2013 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (Pressly M. Millen and Burley Bayard Mitchell, Jr.) - A review of the court's docket indicates not all participating counsel in this case have filed Notices of Appearance. All counsel must file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Baker, C.)
March 11, 2013 Filing 113 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #107 MOTION to Amend #89 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by World Programming Limited. (Brown, Peter)
March 7, 2013 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding #111 Motion to Bifurcate Proceedings. Abbreviations used to identiy exhibits. For future reference, counsel should avoid using abbreviations to identify exhibits in the Electronic Case Filing System. Clerk's Office corrected the abbreviations "First RTP" and "Interr." to reflect properly on the docket. (Heath, D.)
March 5, 2013 Filing 112 Memorandum in Support regarding #111 MOTION to Bifurcate the Proceedings filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Bennett, Raymond)
March 5, 2013 Filing 111 MOTION to Bifurcate the Proceedings by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's First Request for Prodcution of Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant's First Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Bennett, Raymond)
March 5, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond M. Bennett on behalf of SAS Institute Inc. (Bennett, Raymond)
February 20, 2013 Filing 109 Declaration of Pressly M. Millen regarding #107 MOTION to Amend #89 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12/19/12 Email Chain, #2 Exhibit B - 12/20/12 to 011513 Email Chain) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 2/21/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
February 20, 2013 Filing 108 Memorandum in Support regarding #107 MOTION to Amend #89 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 2/21/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
February 20, 2013 Filing 107 MOTION to Amend #89 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by SAS Institute Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's 1st Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 12/11/12 Third Party Subpoena to LPS, #3 Exhibit 3 - 122012 Third Party Subpoena to LPS, #4 Exhibit 4 - LPS Objections to Subpoena, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's 2nd Request for Production of Documents, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (Millen, Pressly) Modified on 2/21/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/28/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 22, 2013 Filing 105 Proposed Order regarding #104 Joint MOTION to Amend #29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by World Programming Limited. (Brown, Peter)
January 22, 2013 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding #104 Motion to Amend #29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (as to Certificate of Service) - For future filings, counsel is referred to FORM A of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual for proper formatting. (Baker, C.)
January 22, 2013 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #104 Joint MOTION to Amend #29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Counsel is directed to refile the proposed order only related to this underlying motion to correct the date lines under the stipulated signature area to reflect the year of 2013 instead of 2012. There is no need to refile the motion. (Baker, C.)
January 18, 2013