Johnson et al v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Plaintiff: Rosa H Johnson and Edgar W Johnson
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, The Law Firm of Hutchens, Senter & Britton, P.A., Substitute Trustee Services, Inc., Bullhead Investments, LLC, Deborah N. Hooker, C.T. Salyer, John a. Mundulak and State of North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2010cv00271
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 88 Motion for Reconsideration. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/18/2012. (Edwards, S.)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 JUDGMENT in favor of BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bullhead Investments, LLC, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, State of North Carolina, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc., The Law Firm of Hutchens, Senter & Britton, P.A., C.T. Salyer, Deborah N. Hooker, John a. Mundulak against Edgar W Johnson, Rosa H Johnson. The parties are reminded to read the judgment in its entirety for further detailed information. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 9/29/2011. (Edwards, S.)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting 35 Motion to Dismiss; granting 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 40 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. The time for effecting service of process on Defendants BAC, Hooker, Salyer and Mandulak is extended until 3/1/2011. Defendants Hutchens, Senter & Britton and Substitute Trustee Services have 21 days from the filing date of this Order to respond to the Amended Complaint. Defendants BAC, Hooker, Salyer and Mandulak may respond to the Amended Complaint under the time period set forth in the applicable Federal Rules of Civil Procedure once proper service upon them is effected by Plaintiffs. (See order for particulars) Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/21/2011. Copies served as listed in this matter. (Edwards, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa H Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of Hutchens, Senter & Britton, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullhead Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah N. Hooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.T. Salyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John a. Mundulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?