Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc. et al v. Hayward Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc. and Danfoss Drives A/S
Defendant: Hayward Industries, Inc. and Hayward Pool Products, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00459
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER: The 317 Motion to Stay and the 347 Joint Motion to Stay are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 343 Motion for a Protective Order Staying All Discovery Pending Resumption of Litigation or, in the Alternative, to Compel Depositions of Defendants and Their Personnel and to Modify Discovery Schedule is withdrawn without prejudice. All other pending motions 305 , 339 , 341 are DENIED without prejudice and may be renewed once the stay is lifted. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for all other deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/18/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER: The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Hayward's renewed motion to stay 317 . Additionally, the court GRANTS Pentair's motion to seal 331 and DENIES Hayward's motion to supplement 322 . Furthermore, for good cause sho wn, the court GRANTS Pentair's motion to amend the scheduling order to permit filing an amended reply to defendant's and counter-claim plaintiffs' second amended counterclaims 313 . Pentair shall file the amended reply not later than February 7, 2014. The parties shall confer on any proposed changes to the schedule to meet the trial date of August 4, 2014. The parties shall file a joint proposal on any proposed changes to the schedule not later than February 14, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 1/31/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting 285 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/4/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 302 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/10/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER: The court DENIES Hayward's motion to stay 168 , GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Pentair's motion to compel 190 , and DENIES as moot Hayward's motion for reconsideration 216 . The court sets trial to begi n on May 12, 2014, and GRANTS the parties' joint motion to set deadlines and a pretrial schedule 227 . The parties shall meet and confer to create a proposed schedule of deadlines in accordance with the trial date and shall submit a proposed schedule by December 21, 2012. The court will issue a new schedule in due course. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/18/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER: Hayward's motion for leave to amend 223 is GRANTED. Hayward shall file the first amended answer not later than November 16, 2012. Hayward's motion for suspension of existing deadlines and for status conference 225 is GRANTED. T he court will hold a status conference concerning this case at 11:00 a.m. on December 7, 2012, in Courtroom 1, Seventh Floor, Terry Sanford Federal Building, Raleigh, North Carolina. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for all information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/12/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 187 MOTION TO PRECLUDE DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION TO HAMID A. TOLIYAT. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 7/18/2012. (Edwards, S.)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 201 Motion to Seal. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 7/17/2012. (Edwards, S.)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying 165 Motion to Seal. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/12/2012. (Edwards, S.)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying 125 Motion for Reconsideration. The parties are directed to begin discussing alternative dates after September 2012, for their Markman hearing on claim construction. They are DIRECTED to confer and to submit a joint statement of proposed agreed dates for the court's consideration on or before July 2, 2012. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 4/3/2012. (Edwards, S.)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 146 Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 4/3/2012. (Edwards, S.)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Seal Document. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 2/2/2012. (Edwards, S.)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court is also DIRECTED to terminate the motion at 77 , in light of docket entry 90 . Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further instructions. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/30/2012. (Edwards, S.)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/23/2012. (Edwards, S.)
January 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - It is ORDERED that Pentair's Motion for Extension of Time 75 to respond to Hayward's Amended Answer and Counterclaims is ALLOWED. Pentair shall file such response, if appropriate, within fourteen (14) days after entry of an order on Pentair's Motion to Strike 72 . It further is ORDERED that Hayward's Motion to Compel Production 90 is DENIED insofar as it seeks such production for the court's consideration in rendering a decision on the preliminary injunctio n motion before January 24, 2012. However, Hayward may narrow and renew its requests and interrogatories to Pentair concerning Danfoss VLT 8000 manual cover pages and foreign-language translations, and alleged "joint research agreements" during regular discovery, and may file another motion to compel if the circumstances so demand. SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/20/2012. (Foell, S.)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Designate Certain Access to Sealed Documents. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/6/2012. (Edwards, S.)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Seal; granting 26 Motion to Seal. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/3/2012. (Edwards, S.)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Scheduling Order, Expedited Discovery, and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time Until Resolution of Defendants' Motion for Scheduling Order, Expedited Discovery and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 41 Motion to Strike. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and instructions. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel on 10/26/2011. (Edwards, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc. et al v. Hayward Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc.
Represented By: John Bailie Scherling
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danfoss Drives A/S
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Represented By: John Bailie Scherling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward Pool Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?