Raleigh Offset, Inc v. McNamara et al
Plaintiff: Raleigh Offset, Inc
Defendant: Harold McNamara
Case Number: 5:2011cv00738
Filed: December 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees and Costs. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $39,155.00 in attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $2,488.04. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 5/24/2013. (Edwards, S.)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, defendant is liable to plaintiff for $95,670.69 plus interest, and plaintiff is AWARDED treble damages pursuant to N.C. Gen.Sta.§ 75-16. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 4/12/2013. Copy sent to defendant via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/1/2012. A copy of the order was mailed to the pro se plaintiff to his address of record. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raleigh Offset, Inc v. McNamara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raleigh Offset, Inc
Represented By: Donald J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?