Moody-Williams v. LipoScience, et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Moody-Williams
Defendant: Louvenia Clemons, Ronald Bess and LipoScience
Case Number: 5:2012cv00104
Filed: March 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/2/2014. (Tripp, S.)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Compel; denying 59 Motion for Sanctions; and Resetting Case Scheduling Deadlines - The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for critical case deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/10/2013. (Baker, C.)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Compel - Defendant shall produce and deliver to plaintiff phone records for all incoming and outgoing calls, including local calls, between January and August 2011, within fourteen (14) days from date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/10/2013. (Baker, C.)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER adopting 32 Memorandum and Recommendations and granting 13 Partial Motion to Dismiss - Defendants Clemons and Bess are DISMISSED from this action where no claims remain against them. The stay of discovery proceedings is hereby LIFTED for plaintiff to proceed against defendant LipoScience. An order directing the parties' pre-trial activities will follow. The court of its own initiative, to further the efficient administration of the action, restyles the case caption to exclude reference to those defendants now dismissed, and directs plaintiff and the remaining defendant to take note of this in their further case filings. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/17/2013. (Baker, C.)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 34 Motion to Remand and Motion for Reimbursement; denying 38 Motion to Strike; and denying 40 Motion to Strike - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/26/2013. (Baker, C.)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 19 REQUEST FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE and granting 20 Motion to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference and Entry of Scheduling Order - The court hereby orders that the Rule 26(f) conference, the entry of a Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, the deadline for Rule 26(a) initial disclosures and the conduct of discovery in this matter is continued until after the court rules on Defendants' pending partial motion to dismiss the claims in Plaintiff's complaint. The court will issue its initial order on case planning and scheduling after having ruled on the pending dispositive motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 05/18/2012. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody-Williams v. LipoScience, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Moody-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louvenia Clemons
Represented By: Gretchen W. Ewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Bess
Represented By: Gretchen W. Ewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LipoScience
Represented By: Gretchen W. Ewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?