Provident Financial Services, Inc. v. BB&H Enterprises, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Provident Financial Services, Inc.
Defendant: BB&H Enterprises, LLC and William C. Butler
Case Number: 5:2012cv00135
Filed: March 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: HARNETT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT in favor of Provident Financial Services, Inc. against BB&H Enterprises, LLC and William C. Butler - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 03/19/2013. (Baker, C.)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part 13 Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment - The court awards damages in the amount of $110,428.38, plus $2,159.50 in attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/13/2013. (Tripp, S.)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Entry of Default - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/14/2012. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provident Financial Services, Inc. v. BB&H Enterprises, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&H Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda G. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?