Sauer Incorporated v. Lexington Insurance Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Sauer Incorporated |
Defendant: |
Lexington Insurance Agency Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2013cv00180 |
Filed: |
March 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
CUMBERLAND |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Fox |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
145
ORDER regarding 144 Joint Motion to Vacate Status Conference. The September 6, 2016 status conference is CANCELLED. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 8/31/2016. (Grady, B.)
|
November 13, 2015 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Lexington Insurance Company's Objection to Magistrate Judge Jones Jr.'s 6/14/2015 order. The court denies the motion except to allow the parties additional discovery time to resolve any ling ering amended disclosure issues. The parties are DIRECTED to confer with each other and to provide a status report to the court, no later than November 20, 2015, regarding how much additional time and discovery, within reason, is necessary to resolv e those issues. The parties are also advised to move the court to continue the trial date for this matter if they feel that such a motion is necessary. The parties should further advise the court of whether they wish to extend the exhibit list and expert witness list deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 11/13/2015. (Grady, B.)
|
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
106
ORDER denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to set this case for trial at least ninety (90) days after entry of this order. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/14/2015. (Grady, B.)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
105
ORDER denying 77 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of Court isDIRECTED to continue management in this case. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 8/11/2015. (Edwards, S.)
|
June 4, 2015 |
Filing
99
ORDER denying 79 Motion to Strike and denying 83 Motion to Compel.. Defendant shall have until July 17, 1015 to conduct discovery regarding Plaintiff's supplemental damages disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/4/2015. (Grady, B.)
|
October 31, 2014 |
Filing
76
ORDER denying 65 Motion to Compel; granting 71 Motion to Quash. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/31/2014. (Edwards, S.)
|
April 1, 2014 |
Filing
45
ORDER denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 34 Lexington's Rule 56(d) Motion. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 4/1/2014. (Edwards, S.)
|
November 4, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw, therefore, withdrawing 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William A. Webb on 11/4/2013. (Edwards, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?