Gerber Life Insurance Company v. Montgomery-Caudle, et al
Plaintiff: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Latonya W. Montgomery-Caudle and Terrance Mason
Case Number: 5:2013cv00327
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered September 23, 2013, for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that plaintiff is dismissed from this action. Defendant Latonya W. Montgomery- Caudle is awarded the amount of Seven Thousand Six Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and 66/100 Cents ($7,659.66). Defendant Terrance Mason shall have and recover nothing. Plaintiff shall bear the costs of the action. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 09/26/2013. (Baker, C.)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Entry of Default and granting (to the extend described in the attached order) 19 Motion to Deposit Funds - Plaintiff's request for entry of default (DE 23) is allowed, and its motion to deposit funds into the co urt's registry also is allowed. In accordance with this order, the clerk shall enter judgment dismissing plaintiff, and awarding defendant those proceeds to be paid into the court's registry by plaintiff in the amount of $7,659.66. Defendant Terrance Mason shall have and recover nothing. Plaintiff shall bear the costs of the action. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/23/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 MOTION for Exemption From Participation in the Rule 26(f) Conference and From Filing Initial Disclosures - Upon expiration of the time to make any response to the request for entry of default now pending, the court will take up and decide that request in tandem with plaintiff's motion to deposit funds (DE 19), where it could appear that plaintiff then would also be entitled to a dismissal from the action involving address of the proceeds of the insurance policy which has multiple and adverse claimants named as defendants herein. The clerk shall re-refer to the undersigned the motion to deposit, together with the request for entry of default, when the latter ripens. If there is any cause known to plaintiff why, i n the event of default being made also against defendant Terrance Mason, why it should not then be dismissed upon allowance of the motion to deposit proceeds, plaintiff shall show that cause in filing due by September 13, 2013. If no cause is known, no further response by plaintiff need be made. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/28/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant Latonya W. Montgomery-Caudle - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/21/2013. (Tripp, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerber Life Insurance Company v. Montgomery-Caudle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latonya W. Montgomery-Caudle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenan G. Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?