Mitchell v. Colvin

Plaintiff: James Marcell Mitchell
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2013cv00477
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/1/2015. (Baker, C.)
December 22, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/22/2014. (Baker, C.)
September 9, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and adopting 26 Memorandum and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/9/2014. (Castania, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Marcell Mitchell
Represented By: Stephen Neal Camak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Christian M. Vainieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?