Rodgers v. Preferred Carolinas Realty, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert V. Rodgers
Defendant: Preferred Carolinas Realty, Inc., James E. Allen, Jr., Jim Allen Group, Inc., Harry James Thorpe, Randall Eichorn, Lisa Eichorn, W. Sidney Aldridge and Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00764
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered March 8, 2016, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 3/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER regarding 35 First MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) to certify as appealable, First MOTION for Leave to Appeal under 28 USC 1292(b), First MOTION to Amend 34 Order to certify as appealable under 28 USC 1292(b) and Rule 54(b); 42 Motion for Implementation of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order regarding 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consent Order; and 45 Motion for Hearing - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/8/2016. (Baker, C.)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Enforcement of the Settlement Agreement and State Court Orders - The Contested Settlement Agreement is of no effect and do es not bar litigation of plaintiff's claims against defendants. Where the court's prior scheduling order (DE 28) addressed up to and including disposition of motions on this issue, the parties are hereby DIRECTED to confer and file with the court within 21 days a proposed schedule for disposition of the remaining case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/01/2015. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Preferred Carolinas Realty, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert V. Rodgers
Represented By: Ralph Hayes Hofler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Carolinas Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan T. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan T. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Allen Group, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan T. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry James Thorpe
Represented By: Bryan T. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Eichorn
Represented By: William P. Janvier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Eichorn
Represented By: William P. Janvier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Sidney Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?